DeWalt v. United States
Original Case: 1:20-cv-02681
Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01358 |
Type | civil / usa as party |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 01, 2022 2:29 AM MDT |
Defendant - Appellee
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
RODNEY DEWALT
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/01/2022 2:29 AM MDT |
Friday, October 15, 2021 | ||
[10865366] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 10/15/2021. Fee or ifp forms due 11/15/2021 for Rodney DeWalt (pending in district court). Notice of appearance due on 11/15/2021 for Rodney DeWalt, and Notice of appearance due on 10/29/2021 for United States of America. 21-1358 | ||
Att: 1 40 pgs Main Document | ||
Att: 2 2 pgs General Docketing Letter - Pro Se |