Charmaine Prater v. City of Philadelphia, et al
Original Case: 2:19-cv-06218
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-02906 |
Type | civil / private / civil rights |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 28, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 29, 2022 4:54 AM EDT |
Defendant
CITY OF PHILADELPHIA
|
|
Defendant
ANTHONY DISABATO, (DEMOLITION) CITY OF PHILADELPHIA CONTRACTUAL SERVICES INSPECTOR
|
|
Defendant
SUPERVISOR S. DOUGHERTY, STEPHEN/STEVEN GALLAGHER CITY OF PHILADELPHIA CONTRACTUAL SUPERVISOR
|
|
Defendant
PAUL PELOSSI, (SUPERVISOR) CITY OF PHILADELPHIA CONTRACTUAL SERVICES INSPECTORS
|
|
Defendant
RAYMOND MARTINEZ, (DEMOLITION) CITY OF PHILADELPHIA CONTRACTUAL SERVICES INSPECTORS
|
|
Defendant
SUPERVISOR TYREE GARY, FOR VACANT LICENSE, BUSINESS LICENSE, AND PERMITS CITY OF PHILADELPHIA LICENSE AND INSPECTION
|
|
Defendant
DAVID PERRI, CITY OF PHILADELPHIA LICENSE AND INSPECTION COMMISSIONER
|
|
Defendant
CARLEEN WYTCHE, JANE DOE AND HIS ASSISTANT
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHARMAINE PRATER, FORMERLY EZENGWA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
CHARMAINE PRATER-CUSTIS, FORMERLY EZENGWA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2022 4:54 AM EDT |
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (JK) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Ms. Charmaine Prater in District Court No. 2-19-cv-06218. (JK) | ||
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 1 pgs District Court Order 03/03/2020 | ||
Att: 3 8 pgs District Court Memorandum 01/14/2020 | ||
Att: 4 2 pgs District Court Order 01/14/2020 | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 6 1 pgs Standing Order Excess Pagination | ||
Att: 7 2 pgs Case Opening Letter |