Omega Capital Management Partn v. Leonard Schrage
Original Case: 1:20-cv-01735
Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-02924 |
Type | civil / private / diversity |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 22, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Dec 23, 2022 3:28 AM EST |
Defendant - Appellee
LEONARD SCHRAGE
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
OMEGA CAPITAL MANAGEMENT PARTNERS LLC
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Dec 22 2022
NOT PRECEDENTIAL OPINION. Coram: AMBRO, RESTREPO and FUENTES, Circuit Judges. Total Pages: 6. Judge: RESTREPO, Authoring. |
Docket last updated: 12/23/2022 3:28 AM EST |
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (CND) | ||
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Omega Capital Management Partners LLC in District Court No. 1-20-cv-01735. (CND) | ||
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Case Docketed | ||
Att: 2 7 pgs District Court Opinion 05/21/21 | ||
Att: 3 1 pgs District Court Order 05/21/21 | ||
Att: 4 3 pgs District Court Order 09/20/21 | ||
Att: 5 1 pgs Case Caption | ||
Att: 6 3 pgs Case Opening Letter | ||
17 pgs Appendix Citation Notice sent to Beau B. Brogdon, Esq., Aman K. Sharma, Esq., and E. Jordan Teague, Esq.. If unable to comply you must respond on or before 11/01/2021. (CND) |