Shaffer v. PriorityOneBank
Original Case: 3:15-cv-00304
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcf-60802 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 09, 2023 |
Last checked: Sunday Mar 12, 2023 3:28 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
PriorityOneBank
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
PriorityOne Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Eileen N. Shaffer, Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of Debtors Danny & Judy Hall
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 09 2023
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-60802 Affirmed ] Judge: WED , Judge: JWE , Judge: CH. Mandate issue date is 03/31/2023 [21-60802] |
Docket last updated: 03/12/2023 3:28 AM CDT |
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant PriorityOneBank. 21-60802 (SEP) |