Bradford Realty Svc v. Hartford Fire
Original Case: 3:20-cv-01659
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcd-11047 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Oct 18, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday May 12, 2022 3:31 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Hartford Fire Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Bradford Realty Services, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 11 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-11047 Affirmed ] Judge: DRW , Judge: KDE , Judge: CTW. Mandate issue date is 06/02/2022 [21-11047] |
Docket last updated: 05/12/2022 3:31 AM CDT |
Monday, October 18, 2021 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Bradford Realty Services, Incorporated 21-11047 (RAJ) |