Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:21-bk-31576

Minnesota Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:William J Fisher
Case #: 3:21-ap-03037
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2021
Terminated:Jan 18, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
LEONARD QAVINCI YOUNG
8796 SPRINGWOOD ALCOVE
WOODBURY, MN 55125
Defendant
BRITTNEY B YOUNG
8796 SPRINGWOOD ALCOVE
WOODBURY, MN 55125
Plaintiff
Ideal Credit Union
Wilford Geske & Cook, P.A. 7616 Currell Blvd Suite 200
Woodbury, MN 55125
Represented By
Orin J. Kipp
Wilford Geske & Cook P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 1:08 PM CDT
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
20 20 misc MNB Stipulation or agreement Tue 01/18 10:12 AM
Stipulation filed by Ideal Credit Union and Leonard Qavinci Young and Britteny B. Young. Nature of stipulation: Stipulation for Dismissal Without Prejudice (Kipp, Orin)
Related: [-]
utility MNB Disposition of adversary Tue 01/18 11:25 AM
Disposition of adversary 3:21-ap-3037. Disposition: DISMISSED. (Kristin MNBS)
Related: [-]
court MNB Close adversary case Tue 01/18 11:30 AM
Adversary case 3:21-ap-3037 closed (Kristin MNBS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
19 19 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Thu 01/13 3:01 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 1/13/2022 2:00:00 PM ]. File Size [ 5271 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:10:59 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order Thu 01/13 2:45 PM
Minutes re: Related [+] Orin Kipp appeared for the Plaintiff. Nathan Hansen appeared for the Defendants. Parties to submit stipulation to Chambers by the end of next week as discussed on the record. (ErikaM)
Related: [-] 18 Order for status conference
Monday, January 10, 2022
18 18 order MNB Order for status conference Mon 01/10 4:45 PM
Order for telephonic status conference. Status Conference set for 1/13/2022 at 02:00 PM at *TELEPHONIC HEARING* with Judge William J. Fisher (St Paul). (Kristin MNBS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 23, 2021
17 17 misc MNB Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor Thu 12/23 1:21 PM
Disclosure of compensation of attorney for debtor. (Hansen, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Wed 12/15 11:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 12/15/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 13, 2021
15 15 order MNB Order (Generic) Mon 12/13 10:36 AM
Order for Appearance at Mediation Re: Related [+] (LindaO MNBS)
Related: [-] 14 Order to/for
Friday, December 03, 2021
14 14 order MNB Order (Generic) Fri 12/03 3:50 PM
Order Referring Matter to Mediation (Erika M MNB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 30, 2021
13 13 audio MNB PDF with attached Audio file of hearing Tue 11/30 11:01 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/24/2021 9:00:00 AM ]. File Size [ 13395 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:09:18 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 26, 2021
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 11/26 11:26 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Notice Date 11/26/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
11 11 order MNB Scheduling order Wed 11/24 4:05 PM
Scheduling order Motions to be heard by 2/28/2022. Discovery due by 1/31/2022. Trial date set for 3/28/2022 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 2A, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Kristin MNBS)
Related: [-]
10 10 order MNB Dismiss adversary proceeding - motion Wed 11/24 3:43 PM
Order Denying Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding Related [+] (Erika M MNB)
Related: [-] 6
9 9 misc MNB Corporate ownership statement Reference: Fed. R. Bankr.Proc. 7007.1 Wed 11/24 11:45 AM
Corporate ownership statement filed by Ideal Credit Union.(Kipp, Orin)
Related: [-]
court MNB CHAP Minutes re hrg,fnlhrg,evhrg set by motion, aplc or order Wed 11/24 9:22 AM
Minutes re: Related [+] Orin Kipp appeared for the Plaintiff. Nathan Myrum Hansen appeared for the Defendants. Court denied the motion. Plaintiff consented on the record to final orders and judgment by the bankruptcy court pursuant to Rule 7008. Defendants consented on the record to final orders and judgments by the bankruptcy court pursuant to Rule 7012. Plaintiff to file a Rule 7007.1 statement within one week. Discovery due end of January; motions due end of February; and trial to be held in mid-March. Parties can request a status conference at any time if issues arise. Matter to be referred to mediation. (ErikaM)
Related: [-] 6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by BRITTNEY B YOUNG, LEONARD QAVINCI YOUNG
Monday, November 22, 2021
8 8 misc MNB Substitution of attorney Mon 11/22 1:32 PM
Substitution of attorney filed by Nathan Myrum Hansen. Signed by original attorney, Signed by substituted attorney, Signed by client. New attorney: Nathan M. Hansen. Original attorney: Elaine D.W. Wise (Hansen, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
7 7 answer MNB Response Thu 11/18 10:14 AM
Response to6 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Ideal Credit Union. Memorandum of law, Proof of service. (Kipp, Orin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 04, 2021
6 6 motion MNB Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding Thu 11/04 2:35 PM
Motion to dismiss adversary proceeding filed by BRITTNEY B YOUNG, LEONARD QAVINCI YOUNG. An affidavit or verification, Memorandum of law. Hearing scheduled 11/24/2021 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 2A, 2nd floor, 316 North Robert Street, St. Paul, Judge William J. Fisher. (Wise, Elaine)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 24, 2021
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/24 11:28 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Notice Date 10/24/2021. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 22, 2021
4 4 misc MNB Certificate of service Fri 10/22 11:26 AM
Certificate of service Related [+] filed by Ideal Credit Union. (Kipp, Orin)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons for adversary proceeding
3 3 court MNB Pro bono notice to defendants Fri 10/22 10:15 AM
Pro bono notice to defendants re:1 Complaint. (KariAnn MNBS)
Related: [-]
2 2 court MNB Summons for adversary proceeding Fri 10/22 10:14 AM
Summons issued on BRITTNEY B YOUNG Date Issued 10/22/2021, Answer Due 11/22/2021; LEONARD QAVINCI YOUNG Date Issued 10/22/2021, Answer Due 11/22/2021 (KariAnn MNBS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
crditcrd none Thu 10/21 12:06 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 21-03037 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A12296683. Fee amount 350.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
1 1 cmp MNB Complaint (fee) Tue 10/19 10:16 AM
Adversary case 21-03037 (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)), (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)), Complaint without demand for jury trial by Ideal Credit Union against LEONARD QAVINCI YOUNG, BRITTNEY B YOUNG. Fee Amount $350 (Kipp, Orin)
Related: [-]