Illinois Central District Court
Judge:Colleen R Lawless
Referred: Karen L Mcnaught
Case #: 3:21-cv-03223
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 19, 2021
Terminated:Oct 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 17, 2022 3:47 AM CDT
Defendant
The Pointe of Jacksonville
Represented By
Lisa Handler Ackerman
Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & Dicker LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Meaka Anne Knight
636 S. Fayette Street
Jacksonville, IL 62650


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, November 04, 2024
32 32 misc Letter Tue 11/05 2:01 PM
Letter to the Court from Meaka Anne Knight (JJK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter,
Att: 2 emails,
Att: 3 emails,
Att: 4 emails,
Att: 5 emails,
Att: 6 emails,
Att: 7 emails,
Att: 8 emails,
Att: 9 emails,
Att: 10 emails,
Att: 11 emails,
Att: 12 emails,
Att: 13 emails,
Att: 14 emails,
Att: 15 emails,
Att: 16 emails,
Att: 17 emails,
Att: 18 emails,
Att: 19 emails,
Att: 20 instructions re email attachments,
Att: 21 emails,
Att: 22 instructions re email attachments
Thursday, October 24, 2024
31 31 misc Judgment Thu 10/24 3:14 PM
JUDGMENT entered. (RAH)
Related: [-]
30 30 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution Order Dismissing Case ~Util - Terminate Motions Thu 10/24 1:06 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL entered by Judge Colleen R. Lawless on 10/24/2024. Defendant The Pointe of Jacksonville's Amended Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution23 is GRANTED. The Clerk will terminate as moot Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution22 . This case is hereby dismissed with prejudice. See written Order. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
29 29 notice Notice of Change of Address Tue 10/01 8:39 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Meaka Anne Knight. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Mon 08/12 9:31 AM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 8/12/2024: The motion of defendant to amend or correct the record28 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss22 and amendment to the motion to dismiss23 by 9/3/2024. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
28 28 motion Amend/Correct Fri 08/09 1:23 AM
MOTION to Amend/Correct the Record (ECF Doc. No. 27) by Defendant The Pointe of Jacksonville. Responses due by 8/23/2024(Ackerman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 08/06 8:34 AM
TEXT ORDER by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 8/6/2024: Before the Court is plaintiff's motion for an extension of time in which to respond to defendant's motion to dismiss. In support of the motion, plaintiff states she still has not receive a copy of the motion. Plaintiff's motion for extension of time to file a response to the motion to dismiss is27 is GRANTED. The Clerk is directed to serve a copy of defendant's Motion to Dismiss22 ; Amended Motion to Dismiss23 ; and Exhibit A [23-1] and a copy of this text order by United States Mail to plaintiff's address (636 S. Fayette Street, Jacksonville, IL 62650) as indicated on the docket in this case. If plaintiff's address has changed, she is ordered to contact the Clerk of the Court in writing with any new mailing address. Plaintiff shall respond to the motion to dismiss and amended motion to dismiss by 9/3/2024. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 08/05 3:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by Plaintiff Meaka Anne Knight. Responses due by 8/15/2024 (JJK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
order Order on Motion to Stay 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Wed 07/17 8:43 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 7/17/2024: The motion to stay26 is GRANTED. The Scheduling Order is amended as follows: motions for summary judgment are due 10/31/2024. The final pre-trial conference set on 12/10/2024 and the trial scheduled on 12/17/2024 are vacated. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
26 26 motion Stay Mon 07/15 11:30 PM
MOTION to Stay Deadline to File Dispositive Motion Pending Court's Ruling on Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Defendant The Pointe of Jacksonville. Responses due by 7/29/2024 (Ackerman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 26, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 06/26 9:18 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colleen R. Lawless on 6/26/2024: Before the Court is Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time in which to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution. In support of the motion, Plaintiff states that while she received a Rule 12(c) Notice24 from the Court advising her that a case-dispositive motion had been filed, she did not receive a copy of the motion. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss22 and Amended Motion to Dismiss23 both include a certificate of service stating that counsel filed the motion using the Court's ECF system, which will send notification of such filing to all ECF participants. However, the pro se Plaintiff is not an ECF participant. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time in which to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution25 is GRANTED. Plaintiff's response deadline is extended to 7/26/2024. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(b)(2)(C), Defendant is Directed to serve a copy of its Motion to Dismiss22 , Amended Motion to Dismiss23 , and Exhibit A [23-1] by mailing the documents to Plaintiff. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 06/20 10:19 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by Plaintiff Meaka Anne Knight. Responses due by 7/2/2024 (JJK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
24 24 notice Notice Rule 12(C) entered Tue 06/04 2:54 PM
RULE 12(C) NOTICE entered re22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution,23 Exhibit. (RAH)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Exhibit Tue 06/04 3:03 AM
Exhibit re22 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution Amended by The Pointe of Jacksonville.(Ackerman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, June 03, 2024
22 22 motion Dismiss/Lack of Prosecution Mon 06/03 11:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Prosecution by Defendant The Pointe of Jacksonville. Responses due by 6/17/2024 (Ackerman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
21 21 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Request Counsel Thu 05/16 4:27 PM
ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 5/16/2024 denying20 Motion to Request Counsel. See written order. (RAH)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 14, 2024
20 20 motion Request Counsel Tue 05/14 2:25 PM
MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Meaka Anne Knight. Responses due by 5/28/2024.(RAH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, February 01, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Thu 02/01 8:21 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Alex Jacob Levin on behalf of The Pointe of Jacksonville (Levin, Alex)
Related: [-]
minutes Status Conference - Referral Judge Thu 02/01 9:53 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught: Status Conference held 2/1/2024 via telephone. Pro se Plaintiff Meaka Knight present. Attorney Alex Levin present on behalf of Defendant. Order to enter. (GL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
18 18 order Scheduling Order Tue 08/22 12:45 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught on 8/22/2023. SEE WRITTEN ORDER. (JPL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent to Magistrate Packet
minutes Scheduling Conference - Rule 16 Tue 08/22 10:01 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught: Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held 8/22/2023 via telephone. Pro se Plaintiff Meaka Knight present. Attorney Lisa Ackerman present on behalf of Defendant. Order to enter. Parties are reminded of their option to consent to the Magistrate Judge and are to advise the Court if a Settlement Conference is needed. (GL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 17, 2023
17 17 misc Status Report Thu 08/17 2:24 PM
STATUS REPORT Proposed Rule 16(b) Scheduling Order by The Pointe of Jacksonville. (Ackerman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 31, 2023
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/31 2:00 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught on 7/31/2023: A Rule 16 conference is set for August 22, 2023, at 9:30 a.m. by telephone. The Court will place the call. The parties shall jointly prepare a proposed scheduling order and file the proposed order by August 17, 2023. If the parties are unable to reach an agreement, they shall file a notification explaining the nature of the disagreement. (JPL)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 24, 2023
16 16 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Mon 07/24 5:00 PM
ANSWER to5 Amended Complaint by The Pointe of Jacksonville.(Ackerman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 14, 2023
utility Set/Reset Deadlines (including Answer ddl) Fri 07/14 2:19 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by Judge Colleen R. Lawless on 7/14/2023: In a Text Order entered on 3/26/2023, the Court granted Defendant's Second Motion for Extension of Time to File an Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint and ordered Defendant to answer by 3/24/2023. Defendant has not filed an answer. Defendant shall answer by 7/24/2023, or the Court will deem the allegations of the Amended Complaint admitted (HS)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 20, 2023
order Order Reassigning Case to Judge Lawless Mon 03/20 12:29 PM
TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT: This case and the corresponding hearings are reassigned to Judge Colleen R. Lawless for further proceedings due to her recent appointment as U.S. District Judge for the Central District of Illinois. Entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 3/20/2023. (JRK)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 06, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 03/06 12:46 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught: Defendant's motion for an extension of time15 to answer plaintiff's amended complaint is ALLOWED. Defendant is to answer by March 24, 2023. Entered on 3/6/2023. (JPS)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 03, 2023
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 03/03 9:15 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Amended Complaint by Defendant The Pointe of Jacksonville. Responses due by 3/17/2023 (Ackerman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 27, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 02/27 1:39 PM
TEXT ORDER entered by US Magistrate Judge Karen McNaught: Defendant's motion for extension of time14 is ALLOWED. Defendant is to respond to plaintiff's complaint by March 3, 2023. Entered on 2/27/2023. (JPS)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 17, 2023
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 02/17 4:58 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re13 Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim,, Set/Reset Deadlines: by Defendant The Pointe of Jacksonville. Responses due by 3/3/2023 (Ackerman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 02, 2023
13 13 15 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/03 9:27 AM
OPINION denying9 Motion to Dismiss. Defendant is directed to answer the Amended Complaint within 14 days of the entry of this Order. SEE WRITTEN OPINION. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 2/3/2023. (JPS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 04, 2022
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Thu 08/04 8:28 AM
TEXT ORDER: Before the Court are Defendant The Pointe of Jacksonville, LLC's Motion to Dismiss9 and Pro Se Plaintiff Meaka Anne Knight's "Affidavit"12 requesting an extension of time so that she can obtain counsel or the appointment of counsel. The Plaintiff's Affidavit is neither signed nor notarized. The Court previously granted an extension to enable the Plaintiff to research how to properly respond to the motion to dismiss. See Text Order of May 9, 2022. The Plaintiff now states she needs legal assistance in order to understand the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Following the commencement of the lawsuit, the Court denied Plaintiff's motion to request counsel. See Text Order of December 3, 2021. The Court finds no basis to depart from its prior ruling. Based on the Plaintiff's pro se status, the Court will grant one further extension for Plaintiff to respond to the motion to dismiss. Any response is now due on September 6, 2022. The Clerk will send a copy of this Text Order to Pro Se Plaintiff Meaka Anne Knight, 636 S. Fayette Street, Jacksonville, IL 62650. Entered by United States District Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 08/04/2022. (DM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
12 12 misc Affidavit Mon 06/06 1:10 PM
AFFIDAVIT by Meaka Anne Knight. (MAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 05/09 10:45 AM
TEXT ORDER: Before the Court is Pro Se Plaintiff Meaka Anne Knight's Motion for an Extension of Time in which to file a Response to the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. In support of the motion, the Plaintiff states she did not receive the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiff further states she is attempting to find an attorney and is researching how to properly respond to the motion. The Plaintiff seeks an extension of the Response deadline to May 31, 2022. The Court notes that the Certificate of Service on the Motion to Dismiss states that the Court's ECF system will send notification to all ECF participants. Because the Pro Se Plaintiff is not an ECF participant, however, the Pro Se Plaintiff is entitled to a paper copy of the Motion to Dismiss. See CDIL-LR 5.4(C). For good cause shown, the Pro Se Plaintiff's Motion for an Extension of Time11 is GRANTED. The Pro Se Plaintiff's Response to the Motion to Dismiss is now due on May 31, 2022. The Clerk is Directed to mail a copy of the Defendant's Motion to Dismiss9 to Pro Se Plaintiff Meaka Anne Knight, 636 S. Fayette Street, Jacksonville, IL 62650. Entered by Judge Sue E. Myerscough on 5/9/2022. (MAS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 04, 2022
order Order Reassigning Case to Judge Myerscough ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 05/04 11:46 AM
TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 5/4/2022. This case is reassigned to Judge Sue E. Myerscough for further proceedings. (LN)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
order Order Reassigning Case to Chief Judge Darrow Fri 04/29 3:47 PM
TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on 4/29/2022. This case and the corresponding hearings are reassigned to Chief Judge Sara Darrow pending reassignment.(MC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 05/02 12:27 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Plaintiff Meaka Anne Knight. Responses due by 5/10/2022 (MAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 11, 2022
order Order Reassigning Case to Magistrate Judge McNaught Tue 04/12 7:30 PM
TEXT ORDER OF REASSIGNMENT entered by Chief Judge Sara Darrow on April 11, 2022. Due to Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins's retirement, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Karen L. McNaught for further proceedings.(LN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 31, 2022
10 10 notice Notice Rule 56 entered Thu 03/31 2:40 PM
RULE 56 NOTICE entered re9 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (JRK)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
9 9 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 03/25 8:28 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant The Pointe of Jacksonville. Responses due by 4/8/2022 (Ackerman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/11 11:12 AM
TEXT ORDER entered by U.S. Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time to File its Response to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint8 is ALLOWED. Extension granted to 3/25/2022. (LB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 09, 2022
8 8 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/09 3:12 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re5 Amended Complaint by Defendant The Pointe of Jacksonville. Responses due by 3/25/2022 (Ackerman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance of Attorney Wed 02/09 2:46 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Attorney by Lisa Handler Ackerman on behalf of The Pointe of Jacksonville (Ackerman, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
6 6 service Request for Waiver of Service & Notice of Lawsuit Fri 12/10 3:55 PM
REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF SERVICE and Notice of Lawsuit sent to The Pointe of Jacksonville on 12/10/2021. (MAS) (MAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 03, 2021
order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Order on Motion to Request Counsel Fri 12/03 3:09 PM
TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Before the Court is the pro se Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs3 . For good cause shown, motion ALLOWED. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send notice of lawsuit waiver of service forms to the Defendant at the address provided by Plaintiff along with a copy of the Complaint, two copies of the waiver form, and a prepaid envelope to return the form by first class mail to the Clerk. If the Defendant fails to sign and return a waiver within 30 days from the date said forms were sent, the Court will direct personal service by the U.S. Marshal at the Defendant's expense. Also before the Court is pro se Plaintiff's Motion to Request Counsel4 . The Court notes that civil litigants have no constitutional or statutory right to be represented by counsel in federal court. Zarnes v. Rhodes, 64 F.3d 285, 288 (7th Cir., 1995). The decision to appoint counsel lies within the broad discretion of the Court. Jackson v. County of McLean, 953 F.2d 1070, 1071 (7th Cir., 1992). The Court concludes that appointment of counsel is not warranted in this case at this time. The Plaintiff has not shown any attempt to retain counsel. The Court grants pro se litigants wide latitude in the handling of their lawsuits. Therefore, Plaintiff's Motion to Request Counsel4 is DENIED at this time. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 12/3/2021. (MAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/18 9:53 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against The Pointe of Jacksonville, filed by Meaka Anne Knight. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit)(MAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 25, 2021
order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 10/25 1:41 PM
TEXT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins. Before the Court is pro se Plaintiff's Complaint for Employment Discrimination1 (Complaint). Clerk is directed to STRIKE Plaintiff's Complaint as it is unsigned as required by Rule 11, Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Plaintiff is directed to file a fully executed and signed Amended Complaint on or before 11/15/2021 or risk her case being dismissed for want of prosecution. Entered by Magistrate Judge Tom Schanzle-Haskins on 10/25/2021. (MAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
4 4 motion Request Counsel Thu 10/21 5:02 PM
MOTION to Request Counsel by Plaintiff Meaka Anne Knight. Responses due by 11/4/2021 (MAS)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 10/21 5:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Meaka Anne Knight. Responses due by 11/4/2021 (MAS)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Exhibit Thu 10/21 4:59 PM
Exhibits to1 Complaint by Meaka Anne Knight. (Attachment: #1 Exhibit - EEOC Complaint)(MAS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/19 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT (not signed) against The Pointe of Jacksonville, filed by Meaka Anne Knight.(MAS)
Related: [-]