Charles Kinford v. Inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc. et al
Utah District Court | |
Judge: | Brooke C Wells |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-00585 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal- Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2014 |
Terminated: | Sep 02, 2014 |
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 8:40 AM MDT |
Defendant
Inthinc Technology Solutions
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Kinford
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Tuesday, September 02, 2014 | ||
Civil Case Terminated per filing of21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (tls) | ||
Friday, August 29, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Charles Kinford (Scott, Robert) | |
20 | 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert H. Scott on behalf of Charles Kinford (Scott, Robert) | |
Monday, August 11, 2014 | ||
19 | 19 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Carissa M. Beecham, for Defendant Inthinc Technology Solutions (jwt) | |
18 | 18 NOTICE OF REQUIREMENTS for appearance phv mailed to attorney Daniel J. Spielfogel, for Plaintiff Charles Kinford (jwt) | |
17 | 17 Case transferred in from USDC of California Central; Case Number 2:14-cv-04465. File electronically transferred. | |
Friday, August 08, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO TRANSFER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Defendant INTHINC Technology Solutions, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer10 is GRANTED. This action is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Utah. Case electronically transferred. ( MD JS-6. Case Terminated. ) Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
Att: 1 CV-22 Transmittal Letter | ||
Thursday, July 31, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court finds that Defendants Motion to Transfer, Or, in the Alternative, to Stay Action10 presently scheduled for hearing on August 1, 2014, is appropriate for decision without oral argument. Fed. R. Civ. P. 78(b); C.D. L.R. 7-15. Accordingly, the motion is taken UNDER SUBMISSION and the hearing is vacated. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (kti) TEXT ONLY ENTRY [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
Friday, July 18, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 REPLY In Support of Motion MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S District Court for the District of Utah 10 filed by Defendant inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc..(Beecham, Carissa) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration of Jeff Harvey | ||
Friday, July 11, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Charles Kinford, identifying MIx Telematics North America, Inc.. (Spielfogel, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
12 | 12 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S District Court for the District of Utah 10 filed by Plaintiff Charles Kinford.(Spielfogel, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice | ||
11 | 11 30+ pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition to MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S District Court for the District of Utah 10 filed by Plaintiff Charles Kinford.(Spielfogel, Daniel) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of Charles Kinford, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Charles Kinford, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Denying Motion | ||
Thursday, June 26, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S District Court for the District of Utah filed by Defendant inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 8/1/2014 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee.(Beecham, Carissa) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Todd Follmer, | ||
Att: 3 Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, June 11, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc., re Complaint - (Discovery), Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18)4 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8)5 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint6 , Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive-form only-no proceeding held7 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 served on June 11, 2014. (Beecham, Carissa) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
8 | 8 NOTICE of Compliance with 28 USC 1446(d) filed by defendant inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc.. (Beecham, Carissa) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
7 | 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS: PILOT PROJECT RE SEALED DOCUMENTS by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (im) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
6 | 6 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (im) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
Tuesday, June 10, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Victor B. Kenton. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc., identifying no other interested parties. (Beecham, Carissa) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc.. (Beecham, Carissa) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior, case number BC546829 Receipt No: 0973-13942266 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc.. (Attorney Carissa M Beecham added to party inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc.(pty:dft))(Beecham, Carissa) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] | |
Att: 1 Complaint and Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration of Todd W. Follmer | ||
COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1-100, inclusive, inthinc Technology Solutions, Inc., filed in State Court on 5/28/14 by plaintiff Charles Kinford. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 8/11/2014.] |