Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Carlos E Mendoza
Referred: Leslie R Hoffman
Case #: 6:21-cv-01920
Nature of Suit220 Real Property - Foreclosure
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2021
Terminated:Jul 06, 2022
Case in other court:18th Judicial Circuit Court, 05-2015-CA-011763
Last checked: Sunday May 15, 2022 5:09 AM EDT
Defendant
Rachel M. Sadoff
Represented By
Michael J. Roper
Roper, P.A.
contact info
Dale Alan Scott
Bell & Roper, PA
contact info
Defendant
Office of Clerk of Circuit Court Brevard County, Florida
Represented By
Dale Alan Scott
Bell & Roper, PA
contact info
Defendant
Michelle L. Naberhaus
Represented By
Brittany Koptis Quinlan
Florida Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
18th Judicial Circuit Court of Florida
Represented By
Brittany Koptis Quinlan
Florida Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Interested Party
Wilmington Trust, National Association
Represented By
Jason Duggar
Ghidotti Berger LLC
contact info
Chase Adam Berger
Ghidotti Berger LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Debra Annette Hirsch
c/o 125 Macaw Lane
Merritt Island, FL 32952
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
In the Circuit Court of the 18th Judicial Circuit in and For Brevard County
Terminated: 02/02/2022
Defendant
The United States
Terminated: 02/02/2022
Defendant
Judiciary Courts of the State of Florida
Terminated: 02/02/2022
Defendant
In the Circuit Court, Eighteenth Judicial Circuit, Brevard County, Florida
Terminated: 02/02/2022
Defendant
In the Circuit Court of the 18th Judicial Circuit in and For Brevard County, Florida
Terminated: 02/02/2022
Defendant
Eighteenth Judicial Circuit Court of Florida
Terminated: 02/02/2022
Defendant
Eighteenth Circuit Courts
Terminated: 02/02/2022
Defendant
Clerk of Court Scott Ellis Brevard County
Terminated: 02/02/2022
Defendant
Brevard County
Terminated: 02/02/2022
Defendant
18th Judicial Circuit
Terminated: 02/02/2022


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 18, 2022
75 75 service Certificate of service Mon 07/18 11:59 AM
CERTIFICATE of service by Debra Annette Hirsch re74 Verified Due Process NOTICE. (SPM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 14, 2022
74 74 notice Notice (Other) Thu 07/14 4:14 PM
Verified Due Process NOTICE by Debra Annette Hirsch (SPM)
Related: [-]