Missouri Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen N Limbaugh, Jr
Case #: 1:21-cv-00167
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2021
Terminated:Mar 09, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 15, 2022 4:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Gordonville Grill
Represented By
Erin Christopher Bradley
Statler Law Firm Lc
contact info
Plaintiff
Reno Jones
622 Napa Circle
Cape Girardeau, MO 63703
Represented By
David Mark Remley
Remley Law Firm
contact info

GPO Dec 01 2021
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Reno Jones (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 12/30/2021.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide to plaintiff, along with a copy of this Memorandum and Order, a Court form Employment Discrimination Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, in accordance with the instructions set forth above, no later than thirty (30) days from the date ofthis Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff must re-attach copies of his EEOC right-to-sue letter and charge of discrimination with his amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to timely file an amended complaint or fails to comply with the instructions set forth above relating to the filing of the amended complaint, the Court shall dismiss this action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/01/2021. (CMH)
GPO Jan 19 2022
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to issue process or cause process to issue upon the amended complaint as to defendant Gordonville Grill at 829 State Highway Z, Cape Girardeau, Missouri 63701. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 01/19/2022. (CMH)

Docket last updated: 29 minutes ago
Thursday, March 09, 2023
29 29 2 pgs order Order of Dismissal (case ) or (Stipulation of Dismissal of case) Thu 03/09 3:11 PM
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL. SO ORDERED. Case terminated. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 3/9/2023. (KXS)
Related: [-]
28 28 misc Stipulation Thu 03/09 11:13 AM
STIPULATION Stipulation for Dismissal by Plaintiff Reno Jones. Related [+]
Related: [-] mley, David
Friday, August 26, 2022
27 27 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 08/26 5:10 PM
Defendants Gordonville Grill and Andrew Hancock's ANSWER to20 Amended Complaint by Gordonville Grill, Andrew P. Hancock.(Bradley, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 28, 2022
order A Docket Text Order with Schedules Thu 07/28 11:00 AM
Docket Text ORDER: Re:25 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Andrew P. Hancock. (Bradley, Erin) filed by Andrew P. Hancock ; ORDERED GRANTED; Gordonville Grill answer due 8/29/2022; Andrew P. Hancock answer due 8/29/2022. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 07/28/22. (CMH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 07/27 4:45 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Andrew P. Hancock. (Bradley, Erin)
Related: [-]
24 24 misc Entry of Appearance Wed 07/27 4:43 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Erin Christopher Bradley for Defendant Andrew P. Hancock. (Bradley, Erin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
23 23 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/15 4:40 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Reno Jones. Andrew P. Hancock served on 7/8/2022, answer due 7/29/2022. Related [+]
Related: [-] mley, David
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
22 22 service Summons Issued Tue 06/21 4:14 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Andrew P. Hancock. The summons was emailed to : remleylaw16@gmail.com. (JMC)
Related: [-]
21 21 service Notice of Process Server Tue 06/21 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Reno Jones Process Server: Scott Brown Related [+]
Related: [-] mley, David
Att: 1 Summons Notice of intent to use Scott Brown as process server.
Monday, June 20, 2022
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 06/20 2:34 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Reno Jones against defendant Gordonville Grill Jury demand, Reno Jones , filed by Reno Jones Related [+]
Related: [-] mley, David
Monday, April 18, 2022
19 19 order Case Management Order Mon 04/18 4:31 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER This case is assigned to Track: 2: Standard Motion to Join Parties due by 6/22/2022. Discovery Completion due by 11/30/2022. Dispositive Motions due by 1/3/2023. Jury Trial set for 6/5/2023 09:00 AM in Courtroom 4B - Cape before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Pretrial Compliance due by 5/16/2023. Motion in Limine due by 5/26/2023. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 04/18/22. (CMH)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 15, 2022
18 18 misc Joint Scheduling Plan Fri 04/15 1:14 PM
JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Defendant Gordonville Grill. . (Bradley, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
17 17 order Scheduling Order Thu 04/14 4:41 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Rule 16 scheduling conference is reset on Monday, April 18, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. by telephone. The parties should call in to the Courts conference call phone number: 1-866-434-5269, access code 2082948. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 4/14/2022. (JMC)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Entry of Appearance Thu 04/14 4:18 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by David Mark Remley for Plaintiff Reno Jones. Related [+]
Related: [-] mley, David
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Continue Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 03/16 12:00 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion to Continue Scheduling Conference; granting14 Motion for Extension of Time to File : Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan: This matter is before the Court on the defendant's Motion for Extension of Time for Filing Joint Proposed Scheduling Plain, [ECF 14]. The motion is GRANTED, and this matter is reset for Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 on Monday, April 18, 2022, at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 4B at the Rush Hudson Limbaugh, Sr. United States Courthouse. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 03/16/22. (CMH)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 03/16 12:04 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 15. Wed Mar 16 12:04:26 CDT 2022 (Hency, Christy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 15, 2022
14 14 motion Continue Extension of Time to File Document Tue 03/15 2:57 PM
First MOTION to Continue Joint Proposed Scheduling Order, MOTION for Extension of Time to File by Defendant Gordonville Grill. (Bradley, Erin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
13 13 misc Disclosure of Organizational Interests Tue 02/22 11:17 AM
DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Gordonville Grill.. (Bradley, Erin)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 14, 2022
11 11 order Rule 16 Order Mon 02/14 1:46 PM
RULE 16 ORDER. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/14/2022. Rule 16 Conference set for 3/21/2022 10:30 AM in Courtroom 4B - Cape before District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 02/14/2022. (CMH)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Mon 02/14 1:46 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 11. Mon Feb 14 13:46:44 CST 2022 (Hency, Christy)
Related: [-]
notice Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Mon 02/14 1:57 PM
Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendant Gordonville Grill. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 2/24/2022. (CMH)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 11, 2022
10 10 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 02/11 6:05 PM
ANSWER to4 Amended Complaint by Gordonville Grill.(Bradley, Erin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 03, 2022
misc Order Receipt Thu 02/03 9:09 AM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 9. Thu Feb 3 09:09:24 CST 2022 (Hency, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 02/03 8:48 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed Gordonville Grill served on 1/25/2022, answer due 2/15/2022. (CMH)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 01/19 1:09 PM
Summons Issued as to defendant Gordonville Grill. The summons was hand delivered to U.S. Marshal for service. (CMH)
Related: [-]
7 7 4 pgs order Memorandum & Order Wed 01/19 11:58 AM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to issue process or cause process to issue upon the amended complaint as to defendant Gordonville Grill at 829 State Highway Z, Cape Girardeau, Missouri 63701. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 01/19/2022. (CMH)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 01/19 2:10 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 7-8. Wed Jan 19 14:10:32 CST 2022 (Hency, Christy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
6 6 misc Supplemental (NON-MOTION EVENT) Tue 01/11 2:48 PM
SUPPLEMENTAL re4 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Reno Jones. Right to Sue letter submitted (MRS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
5 5 2 pgs order Order (will rule a motion and set/satisfy a schedule) Wed 01/05 3:49 PM
ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff shall supplement his amended complaint by submitting a copy of his charge of discrimination and notice of right-to-sue letter within twenty-one (21) days of the date of this Order.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiffs failure to comply with this Court's Order may result in a dismissal of this action, without prejudice. Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 1/26/2022. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 01/05/2022. (CMH)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 01/05 3:50 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 5. Wed Jan 5 15:50:12 CST 2022 (Hency, Christy)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 20, 2021
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 12/20 1:38 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Gordonville Grill Amendment to1 Complaint Jury demand, filed by Reno Jones. Related document:1 Complaint filed by Reno Jones.(CSG)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
3 3 5 pgs order Memorandum & Order Wed 12/01 2:11 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re:2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Plaintiff Reno Jones (Amended/Supplemental Pleadings due by 12/30/2021.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis [ECF No. 2] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall provide to plaintiff, along with a copy of this Memorandum and Order, a Court form Employment Discrimination Complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall file an amended complaint, in accordance with the instructions set forth above, no later than thirty (30) days from the date ofthis Memorandum and Order. Plaintiff must re-attach copies of his EEOC right-to-sue letter and charge of discrimination with his amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if plaintiff fails to timely file an amended complaint or fails to comply with the instructions set forth above relating to the filing of the amended complaint, the Court shall dismiss this action without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh, Jr on 12/01/2021. (CMH)
Related: [-]
misc Order Receipt Wed 12/01 2:15 PM
ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 3. Along with a Court form Employment Discrimination Complaint as ordered by the Court. Wed Dec 1 14:15:42 CST 2021 (Hency, Christy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Tue 11/16 4:00 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Reno Jones. (CMH)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/16 3:58 PM
COMPLAINT against defendant Gordonville Grill, filed by Reno Jones.(CMH) (CMH)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Original Filing Form,
Att: 3 EEOC Form 5
Att: 4 (11/16/2021) Case Assignment Label
misc Case Opening Notification Tue 11/16 4:18 PM
Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Stephen N. Limbaugh Jr.. All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . (CMH)
Related: [-]
misc Complaint Letter Created (Case Opening Event ONLY) Tue 11/16 4:20 PM
***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (CMH)
Related: [-]
misc Complaint Letter Processed (Case Opening Event ONLY) Tue 11/16 5:01 PM
***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Tue Nov 16 17:01:08 CST 2021 (admin,)
Related: [-]