Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas W Thrash, Jr
Referred: Linda T Walker
Case #: 1:21-cv-04717
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000 Job Discrimination (Sex)
Case Filed:Nov 15, 2021
Terminated:Apr 07, 2022
Last checked: Saturday May 14, 2022 5:01 AM EDT
Defendant
Richard Pritchett
Represented By
Carey Elizabeth Olson
Mclaughlin Law Firm
contact info
Defendant
Styl Residential LLC
Represented By
Carey Elizabeth Olson
Mclaughlin Law Firm
contact info
Interested Party
MEP 2019 Trust
Interested Party
Skybox Realty, LLC
Plaintiff
Morgan Hall
Represented By
J. Stephen Mixon
The Mixon Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, April 07, 2022
misc Clerks Entry of Dismissal Thu 04/07 8:45 AM
Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING12 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(A)(ii) (jra)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 04/07 8:54 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker terminated from case. (jra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
12 12 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 04/06 4:06 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Morgan Hall. (Mixon, J.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
11 11 order Scheduling Order Tue 02/22 4:36 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: re:10 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Discovery ends on 6/13/2022. Motions due by 7/12/2022. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 7/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/22/22. (jra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
10 10 misc Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan Thu 02/17 11:45 AM
First JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Morgan Hall. (Mixon, J.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
9 9 1 pgs order Order Thu 02/17 8:23 AM
ORDER: The parties are ORDERED to file their JPRDP by February 23, 2022. The parties are WARNED that a failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions, including dismissal of the case or entry of a default judgment. N.D. Ga. Loc. R. 16.5. Signed by Magistrate Judge Linda T. Walker on 2/16/22. (jra)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Wed 02/02 1:36 PM
Clerks Notation re7 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by TWT. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
8 8 discov Initial Disclosures Tue 02/01 1:02 PM
First Initial Disclosures by Morgan Hall.(Mixon, J.)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 02/01 1:00 PM
First Certificate of Interested Persons by Morgan Hall. (Mixon, J.)
Related: [-]
misc Clerks Notation for LOA/CIP Tue 02/01 11:05 AM
Clerks Notation re6 Certificate of Interested Persons. Reviewed and approved by Judge Thrash. (jeh)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
6 6 misc Certificate of Interested Persons Mon 01/31 12:02 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Styl Residential LLC. (Olson, Carey)
Related: [-]
5 5 discov Certificate of Service Mon 01/31 10:57 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Early Discovery by Morgan Hall.(Mixon, J.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
4 4 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/13 12:11 PM
Defendants ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT with Jury Demand by Richard Pritchett, Styl Residential LLC. Discovery ends on 6/13/2022.(Olson, Carey)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11/29 3:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Morgan Hall. All Defendants. (Mixon, J.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 15, 2021
2 2 service Electronic Summons Issued Tue 11/16 11:52 AM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Styl Residential LLC. (anc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 11/16 11:51 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Morgan Hall. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-11397980)(anc) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. Summons not issued for Def Pritchett because no address listed Modified on 11/16/2021 in order to add text (anc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit B RTS,
Att: 3 Summons Proposed,
Att: 4 Summons Proposed,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet