Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-14099

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Natalie M Cox
Case #: 2:21-ap-01235
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2021
Terminated:Jun 10, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
REAL WATER, INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION
1180 CENTER POINT DRIVE
HENDERSON, NV 89074
Represented By
REAL WATER, INC.
contact info
Defendant
KEHE DISTRIBUTORS, INC., Third-Party Defendants
LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD SMITH/D. DENNIS 6385 S RAINBOW BLVD, STE 600
LAS VEGAS, NV 89118
Represented By
KEHE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.
contact info
Defendant
REAL WATER US, LLC, Third-Party Defendant
LARSON & ZIRZOW, LLC / MATTHEW C ZIRZOW 850 E BONNEVILLE
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
Represented By
REAL WATER US, LLC
contact info
Defendant
WHOLE FOODS MARKET, A TEXAS CORPORATION
LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAAR & SMITH/L FRISTER 6385 RAINBOW BLVD, STE. 600
LAS VEGAS, NV 89118
Represented By
WHOLE FOODS MARKET
contact info
Defendant
UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION
2394 E CAMELBACK RD, STE 600
PHOENIX, AZ 85016
Represented By
ANTHONY W. AUSTIN
Fennemore Craig
contact info
Defendant
SPROUTS, A FOREIGN CORPORATION
BACKUS, CARRANZA & BURDEN/ JACK BURDEN 3050 S DURANGO DR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89117
Represented By
SPROUTS
contact info
Defendant
KEHE DISTRIBUTORS OF NEVADA, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD SMITH /D. DENNIS 6385 S RAINBOW BLVD
LAS VEGAS, NV 89118
Represented By
KEHE DISTRIBUTORS OF NEVADA, LLC
contact info
Defendant
REAL WATER OF TENNESSEE, LLC, Third-Party Defendant
1180 CENTER POINT DR.
HENDERSON, NV 89074
Represented By
REAL WATER OF TENNESSEE, LLC
contact info
Defendant
MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS, A FOREIGN CORPORATION
KRING & CHUNG, LLP/ ROBERT P MOUGIN 7575 VEGAS DR, STE 150G
LAS VEGAS, NV 89128
Represented By
MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS
contact info
Defendant
AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION
WOOD, SMITH, HENNING & BERMAN LLP 2881 BUSINESS PARK CT, #200
LAS VEGAS, NV 89128
Represented By
AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM, INC.
contact info
Plaintiff
STEVEN WADKINS, INDIVIDUALLY
3800 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY 17TH FLOOR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
STEVEN WADKINS
contact info
Plaintiff
MONICA BRANCH NOTO, INDIVIDUALLY
WELLS FARGO TOWERS, 17TH FLR 3800 HOWARD HUGHES PKWY
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
MONICA BRANCH NOTO
contact info
Plaintiff
ADIR ITTAH, INDIVIDUALLY
3800 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY 17TH FLOOR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
ADIR ITTAH
contact info
Plaintiff
KARLA MORENO, INDIVIDUALLY
3800 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY 17TH FLOOR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
KARLA MORENO
contact info
Plaintiff
PAMELA BROWN, INDIVIDUALLY
3800 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY 17TH FLOOR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
PAMELA BROWN
contact info
Plaintiff
HUNTER BROWN, INDIVIDUALLY
WELLS FARGO TOWER, 17TH FLR 3800 HOWARD HUGHES PKWY
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
HUNTER BROWN
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, June 10, 2022
36 36 court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/10 10:09 AM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case 21-1235 (dcl)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 22, 2022
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sun 05/22 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Remand Documents Forwarded to BNC for Noticing (BNC)
Friday, May 20, 2022
34 34 court Remand Documents Forwarded to BNC for Noticing (BNC) Fri 05/20 12:34 PM
Remand Documents, with docket, Forwarded to BNC for Noticing to 8th Judicial. Related [+] (dcl)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff PAMELA BROWN, Plaintiff ADIR ITTAH, Plaintiff KARLA MORENO, Plaintiff STEVEN WADKINS, Plaintiff HUNTER BROWN, Plaintiff MONICA BRANCH NOTO,31 Order on Motion For Remand,32 Notice of Entry of Order filed by Plaintiff PAMELA BROWN, Plaintiff ADIR ITTAH, Plaintiff KARLA MORENO, Plaintiff STEVEN WADKINS, Plaintiff HUNTER BROWN, Plaintiff MONICA BRANCH NOTO,33 Transmittal Form (Remand).
33 33 court Remand Transmittal Form (BNC) Fri 05/20 12:28 PM
Transmittal Form Related [+] (dcl)
Related: [-] mand1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff PAMELA BROWN, Plaintiff ADIR ITTAH, Plaintiff KARLA MORENO, Plaintiff STEVEN WADKINS, Plaintiff HUNTER BROWN, Plaintiff MONICA BRANCH NOTO,31 Order on Motion For Remand,32 Notice of Entry of Order filed by Plaintiff PAMELA BROWN, Plaintiff ADIR ITTAH, Plaintiff KARLA MORENO, Plaintiff STEVEN WADKINS, Plaintiff HUNTER BROWN, Plaintiff MONICA BRANCH NOTO.
Thursday, April 28, 2022
32 32 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Thu 04/28 3:28 PM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment Granting Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand with Certificate of Service Filed by ERIC PEPPERMAN on behalf of MONICA BRANCH NOTO, HUNTER BROWN, PAMELA BROWN, ADIR ITTAH, KARLA MORENO, STEVEN WADKINS Related [+](PEPPERMAN, ERIC)
Related: [-] 31 Order on Motion For Remand.
31 31 order Remand (Bk) Thu 04/28 10:02 AM
Order Granting Motion For Remand Related [+] Remand Follow up 5/12/2022. (mmm)
Related: [-] 11
Saturday, March 19, 2022
30 30 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sat 03/19 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 16. Notice Date 03/19/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv)
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sat 03/19 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 16. Notice Date 03/19/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv)
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
28 28 court Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv) Wed 03/16 11:10 PM
Notice of Filing Official Transcript. Related document(s) 26 . (admin)
Related: [-]
27 27 court Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv) Wed 03/16 11:10 PM
Notice of Filing Official Transcript. Related document(s) 25 . (admin)
Related: [-]
26 26 trmis Transcript Wed 03/16 4:31 PM
Amended Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/3/22. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, you may contact the Transcriber Access Transcripts, Telephone number (855) 873-2223. Purchasing Party: Jessica Lopez. Redaction Request Due By 04/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/18/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/14/2022. (ACCESS TRANSCRIPTS, LLC)
Related: [-]
25 25 trmis Transcript Wed 03/16 4:03 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/3/22. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, you may contact the Transcriber Access Transcripts, Telephone number 8558732223. Purchasing Party: Jessica Lopez. Redaction Request Due By 04/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/18/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/14/2022. (ACCESS TRANSCRIPTS, LLC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
24 24 adv_misc Notice of Appearance (Adv) Thu 03/03 12:05 PM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by LAUREEN P. FRISTER on behalf of KEHE DISTRIBUTORS OF NEVADA, LLC, KEHE DISTRIBUTORS, INC. (FRISTER, LAUREEN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 02, 2022
23 23 ans Response Wed 03/02 5:57 PM
First Response to Defendants' Notice of Ruling with Certificate of Service Filed by ERIC PEPPERMAN on behalf of MONICA BRANCH NOTO, HUNTER BROWN, PAMELA BROWN, ADIR ITTAH, KARLA MORENO, STEVEN WADKINS Related [+] (PEPPERMAN, ERIC)
Related: [-] 22 Notice filed by Defendant UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., Defendant WHOLE FOODS MARKET, 3rd Party Plaintiff UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, Cross-Claimant UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, Cross Defendant UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION.
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
22 22 notice Notice (Adv) Tue 03/01 9:31 AM
Notice NOTICE OF RULING BY DISTRICT COURT with Certificate of Service Filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN on behalf of UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, WHOLE FOODS MARKET (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
21 21 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Mon 02/28 4:07 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 01/12/2022 09:30 am. Set for Ruling. Related [+] (Hearing scheduled 03/03/2022 at 09:30 AM at NMC Teleconference Line. (brr)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Remand filed by PAMELA BROWN, ADIR ITTAH, KARLA MORENO, STEVEN WADKINS, HUNTER BROWN, MONICA BRANCH NOTO
Friday, January 07, 2022
20 20 notice Notice (Adv) Fri 01/07 1:49 PM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by JOAN S. DINSMORE on behalf of UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, WHOLE FOODS MARKET (DINSMORE, JOAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
19 19 answer Reply Wed 01/05 7:37 PM
First Reply Consolidated Reply In Support of Motion to Remand with Certificate of Service Filed by ERIC PEPPERMAN on behalf of MONICA BRANCH NOTO, HUNTER BROWN, PAMELA BROWN, ADIR ITTAH, KARLA MORENO, STEVEN WADKINS Related [+] (PEPPERMAN, ERIC)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff PAMELA BROWN, Plaintiff ADIR ITTAH, Plaintiff KARLA MORENO, Plaintiff STEVEN WADKINS, Plaintiff HUNTER BROWN, Plaintiff MONICA BRANCH NOTO.
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
18 18 adv_misc Declaration (ADV) Wed 12/29 3:02 PM
Declaration Of: JOAN S. DINSMORE DECLARATION OF JOAN S. DINSMORE IN SUPPORT OF CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO REMAND with Certificate of Service Filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN on behalf of UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., WHOLE FOODS MARKET Related [+] (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-] 17 Opposition filed by Defendant UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., Defendant WHOLE FOODS MARKET.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-4
17 17 answer Opposition Wed 12/29 2:58 PM
Opposition CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR REMAND with Certificate of Service Filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN on behalf of UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., WHOLE FOODS MARKET Related [+] (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff PAMELA BROWN, Plaintiff ADIR ITTAH, Plaintiff KARLA MORENO, Plaintiff STEVEN WADKINS, Plaintiff HUNTER BROWN, Plaintiff MONICA BRANCH NOTO,15 Motion to Exceed Page Limit filed by Defendant UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., Defendant WHOLE FOODS MARKET.
16 16 notice Lodgment (Adv) Wed 12/29 2:52 PM
Notice of Lodgment NOTICE OF LODGING ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 9014(e)(1) RE: CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO REMAND Filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN on behalf of UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., WHOLE FOODS MARKET (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Exceed Page Limit Wed 12/29 2:49 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Exceed Page Limit EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 9014(e)(1) RE: CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO REMAND with Certificate of Service Filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN on behalf of UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., WHOLE FOODS MARKET (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 17, 2021
14 14 misc Notice of Appearance (BK) Fri 12/17 4:59 PM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by L. RENEE GREEN on behalf of AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM, INC., REAL WATER US, LLC, REAL WATER, INC. (GREEN, L.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
13 13 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Wed 12/15 11:57 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 1/12/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff PAMELA BROWN, Plaintiff ADIR ITTAH, Plaintiff KARLA MORENO, Plaintiff STEVEN WADKINS, Plaintiff HUNTER BROWN, Plaintiff MONICA BRANCH NOTO.
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
12 12 notice Hearing (BK) Tue 12/14 1:52 PM
First Notice of Hearing Motion to Remand Hearing Date: 01/12/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 am with Certificate of Service Filed by ERIC PEPPERMAN on behalf of MONICA BRANCH NOTO, HUNTER BROWN, PAMELA BROWN, ADIR ITTAH, KARLA MORENO, STEVEN WADKINS Related [+] (PEPPERMAN, ERIC)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff PAMELA BROWN, Plaintiff ADIR ITTAH, Plaintiff KARLA MORENO, Plaintiff STEVEN WADKINS, Plaintiff HUNTER BROWN, Plaintiff MONICA BRANCH NOTO
11 11 motion Remand (Bk) Tue 12/14 1:49 PM
First Motion for Remand ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND; PROOF OF SERVICE with Certificate of Service Filed by ERIC PEPPERMAN on behalf of MONICA BRANCH NOTO, HUNTER BROWN, PAMELA BROWN, ADIR ITTAH, KARLA MORENO, STEVEN WADKINS(PEPPERMAN, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Pepperman, Esq. in Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand
Monday, December 13, 2021
10 10 misc Document Mon 12/13 2:07 PM
Document Certificate of Interested Parties with Certificate of Service Filed by JOEL D. ODOU on behalf of AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM, INC., REAL WATER US, LLC, REAL WATER, INC. (ODOU, JOEL)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance (BK) Mon 12/13 12:47 PM
Amended Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by JOEL D. ODOU on behalf of AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM, INC., REAL WATER US, LLC, REAL WATER, INC. (ODOU, JOEL)
Related: [-]
8 8 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Mon 12/13 8:42 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 7 Notice of Appearance filed by Defendant REAL WATER, INC., Defendant REAL WATER US, LLC, Defendant AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM, INC..
Friday, December 10, 2021
7 7 misc Notice of Appearance (BK) Fri 12/10 10:35 AM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by JOEL D. ODOU on behalf of AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM, INC., REAL WATER US, LLC, REAL WATER, INC. (ODOU, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
6 6 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Wed 11/24 12:34 PM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 5 Notice filed by Defendant MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS.
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
5 5 notice Notice (Adv) Tue 11/23 11:54 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by ROBERT T. ROBBINS on behalf of MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS (ROBBINS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
4 4 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Wed 11/17 10:48 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/3/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff PAMELA BROWN, Plaintiff ADIR ITTAH, Plaintiff KARLA MORENO, Plaintiff STEVEN WADKINS, Plaintiff HUNTER BROWN, Plaintiff MONICA BRANCH NOTO.
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 11/16 7:32 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Corporate parents added to case: Amazon.com., Inc., Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc., WFM Southern Nevada, Inc.. with Certificate of Service Filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN on behalf of UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC. (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 11/16 7:29 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Corporate parents added to case: United Natural Foods, Inc.. with Certificate of Service Filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN on behalf of UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC. (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 11/16 7:24 PM
Adversary case 21-01235 Notice of Removal of HUNTER BROWN, PAMELA BROWN, KARLA MORENO, ADIR ITTAH, MONICA BRANCH NOTO, STEVEN WADKINS against AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM, INC. dba REAL WATER, LLC, REAL WATER, INC., MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS, REAL WATER OF TENNESSEE, LLC, KeHe Distributors of Nevada, LLC, Sprouts, UNITED NATURAL FOODS WEST, INC., Whole Foods Market, Real Water US, LLC, KEHE DISTRIBUTORS, INC.. Fee Amount $350. (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)(AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit