Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-14099

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Natalie M Cox
Case #: 2:21-ap-01237
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Nov 16, 2021
Terminated:Jun 10, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM, INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION
WOOD, SMITH, HENNING & BERMAN LLP 2881 BUSINESS PARK CT, #200
LAS VEGAS, NV 89128
Represented By
AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM, INC.
contact info
Defendant
REAL WATER INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION
LARSON & ZIRZOW/ MATTHEW C ZIRZOW 850 E BONNEVILLE AVE.
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
Represented By
REAL WATER INC.
contact info
Defendant
MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS, A FOREIGN CORPORATION
KRING & CHUNG, LLP/ ROBERT P MOUGIN 7575 VEGAS DR, STE 150G
LAS VEGAS, NV 89128
Represented By
MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS
contact info
Defendant
WHOLE FOODS MARKET, A TEXAS CORPORATION
LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAAR & SMITH/L FRISTER 6385 RAINBOW BLVD, STE. 600
LAS VEGAS, NV 89118
Represented By
ANTHONY W. AUSTIN
Fennemore Craig
contact info
Defendant
ETT 1, LLC, A NEVADA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY
COZEN O'CONNOR / MICHAEL MELENDEZ 3753 HOWARD HUGHES PKWY, STE 200
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
ETT 1, LLC
contact info
Defendant
COSTCO WHOLESALE, A WASHINGTON CORPORATION
P.O. BOX 34912
SEATTLE, WA 98124
Represented By
COSTCO WHOLESALE
contact info
Defendant
NEVADA BEVERAGE, CO., Third-Party Defendant
WILSON ELSER MOSKOWITZ EDELMAN &........ 6689 LAS VEGAS BLVD, STE 200 ATTN: KAREN L BASHOR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89119
Represented By
NEVADA BEVERAGE, CO.
contact info
Plaintiff
MYLES HUNWARDSEN, INDIVIDUALLY
WELLS FARGO TOWER, 17TH FLR 3800 HOWARD HUGHES PKWY
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
MYLES HUNWARDSEN
contact info
Plaintiff
JAZMIN SCHAFFER, INDIVIDUALLY
3800 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY 17TH FLOOR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
JAZMIN SCHAFFER
contact info
Plaintiff
TINA HARTSHORN, INDIVIDUALLY
3800 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY 17TH FLOOR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
TINA HARTSHORN
contact info
Plaintiff
MIRIAM BRODY, INDIVIDUALLY
3800 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY 17TH FLOOR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
MIRIAM BRODY
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTINA SOSA, INDIVIDUALLY
3800 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY 17TH FLOOR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
CHRISTINA SOSA
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, June 10, 2022
48 48 court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/10 10:11 AM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case 21-1237 (dcl)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 22, 2022
47 47 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sun 05/22 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 45 Remand Documents Forwarded to BNC for Noticing (BNC)
46 46 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 05/22 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 44 Transmittal Form (Remand)
Friday, May 20, 2022
45 45 30+ pgs court Remand Documents Forwarded to BNC for Noticing (BNC) Fri 05/20 12:51 PM
Remand Documents, with docket, Forwarded to BNC for Noticing to 8th Judicial. Related [+] (dcl)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff MIRIAM BRODY, Plaintiff TINA HARTSHORN, Plaintiff JAZMIN SCHAFFER, Plaintiff CHRISTINA SOSA, Plaintiff MYLES HUNWARDSEN,42 Order on Motion For Remand,43 Notice of Entry of Order filed by Plaintiff MIRIAM BRODY, Plaintiff TINA HARTSHORN, Plaintiff JAZMIN SCHAFFER, Plaintiff CHRISTINA SOSA, Plaintiff MYLES HUNWARDSEN,44 Transmittal Form (Remand).
44 44 court Remand Transmittal Form (BNC) Fri 05/20 12:45 PM
Transmittal Form Related [+] (dcl)
Related: [-] mand1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff MIRIAM BRODY, Plaintiff TINA HARTSHORN, Plaintiff JAZMIN SCHAFFER, Plaintiff CHRISTINA SOSA, Plaintiff MYLES HUNWARDSEN,42 Order on Motion For Remand,43 Notice of Entry of Order filed by Plaintiff MIRIAM BRODY, Plaintiff TINA HARTSHORN, Plaintiff JAZMIN SCHAFFER, Plaintiff CHRISTINA SOSA, Plaintiff MYLES HUNWARDSEN.
Thursday, April 28, 2022
43 43 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Thu 04/28 3:03 PM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand with Certificate of Service Filed by ERIC PEPPERMAN on behalf of MIRIAM BRODY, TINA HARTSHORN, MYLES HUNWARDSEN, JAZMIN SCHAFFER, CHRISTINA SOSA Related [+](PEPPERMAN, ERIC)
Related: [-] 42 Order on Motion For Remand.
42 42 order Remand (Bk) Thu 04/28 10:28 AM
Order Granting Motion For Remand Related [+] Remand Follow up 5/12/2022. (mmm)
Related: [-] 11
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
utility Remark (Adv) Tue 04/26 8:47 AM
Refund of Filing Fee to James Olson for $250.00, Receipt #A20510299, dated 1/10/2022. Related [+] (lgb)
Related: [-] 41 Order for Refund.
Friday, April 08, 2022
41 41 1 pgs order Order for Refund Fri 04/08 2:22 PM
Order for Refund. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] (s)40
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
40 40 motion Motion for Refund of Filing Fee Wed 03/30 2:48 PM
Motion For Refund Filing Fee with Certificate of Service Filed by MICHAEL A FEDERICO on behalf of COSTCO WHOLESALE (FEDERICO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 19, 2022
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sat 03/19 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 03/19/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 35 Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv)
38 38 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sat 03/19 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 13. Notice Date 03/19/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 34 Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv)
Friday, March 18, 2022
37 37 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Fri 03/18 10:24 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 36 Motion for Refund of Filing Fee filed by Defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE.
Thursday, March 17, 2022
36 36 motion Motion for Refund of Filing Fee Thu 03/17 3:13 PM
Motion For Refund Filing Fee with Certificate of Service Filed by MICHAEL A FEDERICO on behalf of COSTCO WHOLESALE (FEDERICO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
35 35 court Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv) Wed 03/16 11:10 PM
Notice of Filing Official Transcript. Related document(s) 33 . (admin)
Related: [-]
34 34 court Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv) Wed 03/16 11:10 PM
Notice of Filing Official Transcript. Related document(s) 32 . (admin)
Related: [-]
33 33 trmis Transcript Wed 03/16 4:33 PM
Amended Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/3/22. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, you may contact the Transcriber Access Transcripts, Telephone number (855) 873-2223. Purchasing Party: Jessica Lopez. Redaction Request Due By 04/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/18/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/14/2022. (ACCESS TRANSCRIPTS, LLC)
Related: [-]
32 32 trmis Transcript Wed 03/16 4:06 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/3/22. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, you may contact the Transcriber Access Transcripts, Telephone number 8558732223. Purchasing Party: Jessica Lopez. Redaction Request Due By 04/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/18/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/14/2022. (ACCESS TRANSCRIPTS, LLC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 01, 2022
31 31 notice Notice (Adv) Tue 03/01 9:49 AM
Notice NOTICE OF RULING BY DISTRICT COURT with Certificate of Service Filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN on behalf of WHOLE FOODS MARKET (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 01/13 9:39 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 01/13/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Order Approving Verified Petition
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
30 30 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Mon 02/28 4:09 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 01/12/2022 09:30 am. Set for Ruling. Related [+] (Hearing scheduled 03/03/2022 at 09:30 AM at NMC Teleconference Line. (brr)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Remand filed by MIRIAM BRODY, TINA HARTSHORN, JAZMIN SCHAFFER, CHRISTINA SOSA, MYLES HUNWARDSEN
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
28 28 orderad Approving Verified Petition (Adv) Tue 01/11 11:06 AM
Order Approving Verified Petition Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 25 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE.
Monday, January 10, 2022
27 27 misc Designation of Local Counsel (BK) Mon 01/10 11:15 AM
Designation of Local Counsel Filed by MICHAEL A FEDERICO on behalf of COSTCO WHOLESALE Related [+] (FEDERICO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-] 25 Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice filed by Defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE
26 26 misc Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/10 11:02 AM
Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. Fee Amount $250. VP Follow-up Date 01/24/2022 Filed by MICHAEL A FEDERICO on behalf of COSTCO WHOLESALE (FEDERICO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/10 10:58 AM
Verified Petition for Permission to Practice in this Case Only by Attorney Not Admitted to the Bar of this Court. Fee Amount $250. VP Follow-up Date 01/24/2022 Filed by MICHAEL A FEDERICO on behalf of COSTCO WHOLESALE (FEDERICO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-docket of online payment Mon 01/10 10:59 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice([LINK 21-01237 nmc] ) [misc,verpeta] ( 250.00). Receipt number A20510289, fee amount $ 250.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#25
crditcrd Auto-docket of online payment Mon 01/10 11:03 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Verified Petition/Pro Hac Vice([LINK 21-01237 nmc] ) [misc,verpeta] ( 250.00). Receipt number A20510299, fee amount $ 250.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#26
Friday, January 07, 2022
24 24 notice Notice (Adv) Fri 01/07 1:51 PM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by JOAN S. DINSMORE on behalf of WHOLE FOODS MARKET (DINSMORE, JOAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 06, 2022
23 23 misc Notice of Appearance (BK) Thu 01/06 4:51 PM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by MICHAEL A FEDERICO on behalf of COSTCO WHOLESALE (FEDERICO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
22 22 answer Reply Thu 01/06 12:04 PM
First Reply Consolidated In Support of Motion to Remand with Certificate of Service Filed by ERIC PEPPERMAN on behalf of MIRIAM BRODY, TINA HARTSHORN, MYLES HUNWARDSEN, JAZMIN SCHAFFER, CHRISTINA SOSA Related [+] (PEPPERMAN, ERIC)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MIRIAM BRODY, Plaintiff TINA HARTSHORN, Plaintiff JAZMIN SCHAFFER, Plaintiff CHRISTINA SOSA, Plaintiff MYLES HUNWARDSEN.
21 21 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Thu 01/06 9:42 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 20 Notice of Appearance filed by Defendant COSTCO WHOLESALE.
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
20 20 misc Notice of Appearance (BK) Wed 01/05 12:13 PM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by MICHAEL A FEDERICO on behalf of COSTCO WHOLESALE (FEDERICO, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
19 19 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Mon 01/03 11:36 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 15 Motion to Exceed Page Limit filed by Defendant WHOLE FOODS MARKET,17 Opposition filed by Defendant WHOLE FOODS MARKET,18 Declaration filed by Defendant WHOLE FOODS MARKET.
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
18 18 adv_misc Declaration (ADV) Wed 12/29 4:30 PM
Declaration Of: JOAN S. DINSMORE DECLARATION OF JOAN S. DINSMORE IN SUPPORT OF CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO REMAND with Certificate of Service Filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN on behalf of WHOLE FOODS MARKET Related [+] (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-] 17 Opposition filed by Defendant WHOLE FOODS MARKET.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-4
17 17 answer Opposition Wed 12/29 4:27 PM
Opposition CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO REMAND with Certificate of Service Filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN on behalf of WHOLE FOODS MARKET Related [+] (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MIRIAM BRODY, Plaintiff TINA HARTSHORN, Plaintiff JAZMIN SCHAFFER, Plaintiff CHRISTINA SOSA, Plaintiff MYLES HUNWARDSEN,15 Motion to Exceed Page Limit filed by Defendant WHOLE FOODS MARKET.
16 16 notice Lodgment (Adv) Wed 12/29 4:23 PM
Notice of Lodgment NOTICE OF LODGING ORDER GRANTING EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 9014(e)(1) RE: CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO REMAND Filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN on behalf of WHOLE FOODS MARKET (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Exceed Page Limit Wed 12/29 4:22 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Exceed Page Limit EX PARTE MOTION FOR LEAVE OF COURT TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 9014(e)(1) RE: CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTIONS TO REMAND with Certificate of Service Filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN on behalf of WHOLE FOODS MARKET (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
14 14 misc Document Wed 12/15 12:32 PM
Document Defendants' Certificate of Interested Parties with Certificate of Service Filed by XHENI RISTANI on behalf of AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM, INC. (RISTANI, XHENI)
Related: [-]
13 13 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Wed 12/15 10:50 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 1/12/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MIRIAM BRODY, Plaintiff TINA HARTSHORN, Plaintiff JAZMIN SCHAFFER, Plaintiff CHRISTINA SOSA, Plaintiff MYLES HUNWARDSEN.
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
12 12 notice Hearing (BK) Tue 12/14 11:18 AM
First Notice of Hearing for Motion to Remand Hearing Date: 01/12/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30 am with Certificate of Service Filed by ERIC PEPPERMAN on behalf of MIRIAM BRODY, TINA HARTSHORN, MYLES HUNWARDSEN, JAZMIN SCHAFFER, CHRISTINA SOSA Related [+] (PEPPERMAN, ERIC)
Related: [-] 11 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff MIRIAM BRODY, Plaintiff TINA HARTSHORN, Plaintiff JAZMIN SCHAFFER, Plaintiff CHRISTINA SOSA, Plaintiff MYLES HUNWARDSEN
11 11 motion Remand (Bk) Tue 12/14 11:15 AM
First Motion for Remand ; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND; PROOF OF SERVICE with Certificate of Service Filed by ERIC PEPPERMAN on behalf of MIRIAM BRODY, TINA HARTSHORN, MYLES HUNWARDSEN, JAZMIN SCHAFFER, CHRISTINA SOSA(PEPPERMAN, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Pepperman, Esq. In Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand
Monday, December 06, 2021
10 10 adv_misc Notice of Appearance (Adv) Mon 12/06 1:12 PM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by COLT B. DODRILL on behalf of NEVADA BEVERAGE, CO. (DODRILL, COLT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance (BK) Wed 12/01 11:20 AM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by XHENI RISTANI on behalf of AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM, INC. (RISTANI, XHENI)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 29, 2021
8 8 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Mon 11/29 8:39 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 6 Notice filed by Defendant NEVADA BEVERAGE, CO..
Wednesday, November 24, 2021
7 7 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Wed 11/24 12:45 PM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 5 Notice filed by Defendant MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS.
6 6 notice Notice (Adv) Wed 11/24 12:10 PM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by COLT B. DODRILL on behalf of NEVADA BEVERAGE, CO. (DODRILL, COLT)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
5 5 notice Notice (Adv) Tue 11/23 11:59 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by ROBERT T. ROBBINS on behalf of MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS (ROBBINS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
4 4 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Wed 11/17 11:23 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/3/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff MIRIAM BRODY, Plaintiff TINA HARTSHORN, Plaintiff JAZMIN SCHAFFER, Plaintiff CHRISTINA SOSA, Plaintiff MYLES HUNWARDSEN.
3 3 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Wed 11/17 11:22 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff MIRIAM BRODY, Plaintiff TINA HARTSHORN, Plaintiff JAZMIN SCHAFFER, Plaintiff CHRISTINA SOSA, Plaintiff MYLES HUNWARDSEN.
Tuesday, November 16, 2021
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 11/16 8:41 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Corporate parents added to case: Amazon.com., Inc., Mrs. Gooch's Natural Food Markets, Inc., WFM Southern Nevada, Inc.. with Certificate of Service Filed by ANTHONY W. AUSTIN on behalf of Whole Foods Market (AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 11/16 8:36 PM
Adversary case 21-01237 Notice of Removal of MYLES HUNWARDSEN, JAZMIN SCHAFFER, TINA HARTSHORN, MIRIAM BRODY, CHRISTINA SOSA against AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM, INC. dba REAL WATER, LLC, Real Water Inc., MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS, Whole Foods Market, ETT 1, LLC dba TERRIBLE HERBST, COSTCO WHOLESALE, NEVADA BEVERAGE, CO.. Fee Amount $350. (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)(AUSTIN, ANTHONY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit