Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-14099

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Natalie M Cox
Case #: 2:21-ap-01240
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2021
Terminated:Jun 10, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
REAL WATER INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION
LARSON & ZIRZOW/ MATTHEW C ZIRZOW 850 E BONNEVILLE AVE.
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
Represented By
REAL WATER INC.
contact info
Defendant
AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION
LARSON & ZIRZOW, LLC / MATTHEW C ZIRZOW 850 E BONNEVILLE AVE.
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
Represented By
AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM INC.
contact info
Defendant
MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS, A FOREIGN CORPORATION
7575 VEGAS DR., STE. 150G
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
Represented By
ROBERT T. ROBBINS
King & Chung, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, A MINOR CHILD, BY AND THROUGH HIS GUARDIAN AD LITEMS, CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN AND EMELY WREN HUSBAND AND WIFE
3800 HOWARD HUGHES PKWY, 17TH FLR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN
contact info
Plaintiff
CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN, ON HIS OWN BEHALF
3800 HOWARD HUGES PKWY, 17TH FLR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN
contact info
Plaintiff
EMELY WREN, ON HER OWN BEHALF
3800 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY 17TH FLOOR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
EMELY WREN
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, June 10, 2022
30 30 court Close Adversary Case Fri 06/10 10:13 AM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case 21-1240 (dcl)
Related: [-]
Sunday, May 22, 2022
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sun 05/22 9:31 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 05/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 28 Remand Documents Forwarded to BNC for Noticing (BNC)
Friday, May 20, 2022
28 28 court Remand Documents Forwarded to BNC for Noticing (BNC) Fri 05/20 1:06 PM
Remand Documents, with docket, Forwarded to BNC for Noticing to 8th Judicial. Related [+] (dcl)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, Plaintiff EMELY WREN, Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN,25 Order on Motion For Remand,26 Notice of Entry of Order filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, Plaintiff EMELY WREN, Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN,27 Transmittal Form (Remand).
27 27 court Remand Transmittal Form (BNC) Fri 05/20 1:01 PM
Transmittal Form Related [+] (dcl)
Related: [-] mand1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, Plaintiff EMELY WREN, Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN,25 Order on Motion For Remand,26 Notice of Entry of Order filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, Plaintiff EMELY WREN, Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN.
Thursday, April 28, 2022
26 26 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Thu 04/28 2:57 PM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand with Certificate of Service Filed by ERIC PEPPERMAN on behalf of CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN, CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, EMELY WREN Related [+](PEPPERMAN, ERIC)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Motion For Remand.
25 25 order Remand (Bk) Thu 04/28 10:33 AM
Order Granting Motion For Remand Related [+] Remand Follow up 5/12/2022. (mmm)
Related: [-] 7
Saturday, March 19, 2022
24 24 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sat 03/19 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 03/19/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 22 Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv)
23 23 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sat 03/19 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 6. Notice Date 03/19/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv)
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
22 22 court Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv) Wed 03/16 11:10 PM
Notice of Filing Official Transcript. Related document(s) 20 . (admin)
Related: [-]
21 21 court Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv) Wed 03/16 11:10 PM
Notice of Filing Official Transcript. Related document(s) 19 . (admin)
Related: [-]
20 20 trmis Transcript Wed 03/16 4:34 PM
Amended Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/3/22. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, you may contact the Transcriber Access Transcripts, Telephone number (855) 873-2223. Purchasing Party: Jessica Lopez. Redaction Request Due By 04/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/18/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/14/2022. (ACCESS TRANSCRIPTS, LLC)
Related: [-]
19 19 trmis Transcript Wed 03/16 4:14 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/3/22. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, you may contact the Transcriber Access Transcript, Telephone number 8558732223. Purchasing Party: Jessica Lopez. Redaction Request Due By 04/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/18/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/14/2022. (ACCESS TRANSCRIPTS, LLC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
18 18 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Mon 02/28 4:11 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 01/12/2022 09:30 am. Set for Ruling. Related [+] (Hearing scheduled 03/03/2022 at 09:30 AM at NMC Teleconference Line. (brr)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Remand filed by CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, EMELY WREN, CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN
Thursday, January 06, 2022
17 17 answer Reply Thu 01/06 11:59 AM
First Reply Consolidated In Support of Motion to Remand with Certificate of Service Filed by ERIC PEPPERMAN on behalf of CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN, CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, EMELY WREN Related [+] (PEPPERMAN, ERIC)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, Plaintiff EMELY WREN, Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN.
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
16 16 order Exceed Page Limit Tue 01/04 1:25 PM
Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limit Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 13
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
15 15 adv_misc Declaration (ADV) Wed 12/29 8:05 PM
Declaration Of: Robert T. Robbins In Support of Consolidated Opposition with Certificate of Service Filed by ROBERT T. ROBBINS on behalf of MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS Related [+] (ROBBINS, ROBERT)
Related: [-] 14 Opposition filed by Defendant MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS.
14 14 answer Opposition Wed 12/29 7:58 PM
Opposition Consolidated Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Remand with Certificate of Service Filed by ROBERT T. ROBBINS on behalf of MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS Related [+] (ROBBINS, ROBERT)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, Plaintiff EMELY WREN, Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-4
13 13 motion Exceed Page Limit Wed 12/29 7:47 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Exceed Page Limit with Certificate of Service Filed by ROBERT T. ROBBINS on behalf of MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS (ROBBINS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
12 12 misc Document Wed 12/15 12:25 PM
Document Defendants' Certificate of Interested Parties with Certificate of Service Filed by XHENI RISTANI on behalf of AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM INC. (RISTANI, XHENI)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Wed 12/15 9:29 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 1/12/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, Plaintiff EMELY WREN, Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN.
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
10 10 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Tue 12/14 11:06 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, Plaintiff EMELY WREN, Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN.
9 9 notice Hearing (BK) Tue 12/14 9:32 AM
Amended Notice of Hearing On Motion to Remand Hearing Date: 01/12/2021 Hearing Time: 9:30 am with Certificate of Service Filed by ERIC PEPPERMAN on behalf of CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN, CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, EMELY WREN Related [+] (PEPPERMAN, ERIC)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, Plaintiff EMELY WREN, Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN
Monday, December 13, 2021
8 8 notice Hearing (BK) Mon 12/13 5:14 PM
First Notice of Hearing On Motion to Remand Hearing Date: 01/12/2021 Hearing Time: 9:30 am with Certificate of Service Filed by ERIC PEPPERMAN on behalf of CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN, CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, EMELY WREN Related [+] (PEPPERMAN, ERIC)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, Plaintiff EMELY WREN, Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN
7 7 motion Remand (Bk) Mon 12/13 5:12 PM
First Motion for Remand MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND with Certificate of Service Filed by ERIC PEPPERMAN on behalf of CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN, CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, EMELY WREN(PEPPERMAN, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration of Eric Pepperman, Esq. In Support of Plaintiffs Motion to Remand
Thursday, December 02, 2021
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance (BK) Thu 12/02 4:07 PM
Amended Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by XHENI RISTANI on behalf of AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM INC. (RISTANI, XHENI)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Thu 12/02 11:37 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Defendant AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM INC..
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance (BK) Wed 12/01 11:22 AM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by XHENI RISTANI on behalf of AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM INC. (RISTANI, XHENI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
3 3 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Thu 11/18 3:46 PM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/3/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER NOAH WREN, Plaintiff EMELY WREN, Plaintiff CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN.
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 11/17 9:25 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement with Certificate of Service Filed by Robert T. Robbins on behalf of MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS (Robbins, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 11/17 4:01 PM
Adversary case 21-01240 Notice of Removal of CHRISTOPHER WREN, CHRISTOPHER BRIAN WREN, EMELY WREN against REAL WATER INC., AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM INC., MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS. Fee Amount $350. (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)(Robbins, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit