Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-14099

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Natalie M Cox
Case #: 2:21-ap-01243
Nature of Suit1 null
Case Filed:Nov 17, 2021
Terminated:Nov 09, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
REAL WATER INC., A DELAWARE CORPORATION
LARSON & ZIRZOW/ MATTHEW C ZIRZOW 850 E BONNEVILLE AVE.
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
Represented By
REAL WATER INC.
contact info
Defendant
AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM INC., A NEVADA CORPORATION
LARSON & ZIRZOW, LLC / MATTHEW C ZIRZOW 850 E BONNEVILLE AVE.
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101
Represented By
AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM INC.
contact info
Defendant
MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS, A NORTH CAROLINA CORPORATION
KRING & CHUNG, LLP/ ROBERT P MOUGIN 7575 VEGAS DR, STE 150G
LAS VEGAS, NV 89128
Represented By
ROBERT T. ROBBINS
King & Chung, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
RYAN CARRIER
3800 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY 17TH FLOOR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
RYAN CARRIER
contact info
Plaintiff
ARIKA CARRIER, HUSBAND AND WIFE, INDIVIDUALLY AND ON BEHALF OF THEIR MINOR CHILDREN
3800 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY 17TH FLOOR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
ARIKA CARRIER
contact info
Plaintiff
HERA CARRIER
3800 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY 17TH FLOOR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
HERA CARRIER
contact info
Plaintiff
FINN CARRIER
3800 HOWARD HUGHES PARKWAY 17TH FLOOR
LAS VEGAS, NV 89169
Represented By
FINN CARRIER
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Saturday, November 11, 2023
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sun 11/12 9:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 11/11/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 30 Remand Documents Forwarded to BNC for Noticing (BNC)
32 32 court BNC Certificate of Notice Sun 11/12 9:00 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] No. of Notices: 8. Notice Date 11/11/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 29 Transmittal Form (Remand)
Thursday, November 09, 2023
31 31 court Close Adversary Case Thu 11/09 4:30 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case 21-1243 (dcl)
Related: [-]
30 30 court Remand Documents Forwarded to BNC for Noticing (BNC) Thu 11/09 4:27 PM
Remand Documents Forwarded Document to BNC for Noticing to 8TH JUDICIAL DISTRICT COURT; with docket sheet. Related [+] (dcl)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff RYAN CARRIER, Plaintiff ARIKA CARRIER, Plaintiff FINN CARRIER, Plaintiff HERA CARRIER,28 Order on Motion For Remand,29 Transmittal Form (Remand).
29 29 court Remand Transmittal Form (BNC) Thu 11/09 4:12 PM
Transmittal Form Related [+] Check Remanded Adv Case for Closing 11/24/2023. (dcl)
Related: [-] mand1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff RYAN CARRIER, Plaintiff ARIKA CARRIER, Plaintiff FINN CARRIER, Plaintiff HERA CARRIER,28 Order on Motion For Remand.
28 28 order Remand (Bk) Thu 11/09 12:17 PM
Order Granting Motion For Remand Related [+] Remand Follow up 11/24/2023. (mmm)
Related: [-] 7
Saturday, March 19, 2022
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sat 03/19 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 03/19/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 25 Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv)
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sat 03/19 9:30 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 7. Notice Date 03/19/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv)
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
25 25 court Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv) Wed 03/16 11:10 PM
Notice of Filing Official Transcript. Related document(s) 23 . (admin)
Related: [-]
24 24 court Notice of Filing Official Transcript (BNC-Adv) Wed 03/16 11:10 PM
Notice of Filing Official Transcript. Related document(s) 22 . (admin)
Related: [-]
23 23 trmis Transcript Wed 03/16 4:37 PM
Amended Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/3/22. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, you may contact the Transcriber Access Transcripts, Telephone number (855) 873-2223. Purchasing Party: Jessica Lopez. Redaction Request Due By 04/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/18/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/14/2022. (ACCESS TRANSCRIPTS, LLC)
Related: [-]
22 22 trmis Transcript Wed 03/16 4:18 PM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held on 3/3/22. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For additional information, you may contact the Transcriber Access Transcripts, Telephone number 8558732223. Purchasing Party: Jessica Lopez. Redaction Request Due By 04/6/2022. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 04/18/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/14/2022. (ACCESS TRANSCRIPTS, LLC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
21 21 court Minute Entry Continued (ADV) Mon 02/28 4:18 PM
Minute Entry Re: hearing on 01/12/2022 09:30 am. Set for Ruling. Related [+] (Hearing scheduled 03/03/2022 at 09:30 AM at NMC Teleconference Line. (brr)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Remand filed by RYAN CARRIER, ARIKA CARRIER, FINN CARRIER, HERA CARRIER
Monday, January 10, 2022
20 20 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Mon 01/10 9:39 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 1/12/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff RYAN CARRIER, Plaintiff ARIKA CARRIER, Plaintiff FINN CARRIER, Plaintiff HERA CARRIER.
19 19 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Mon 01/10 9:27 AM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff RYAN CARRIER, Plaintiff ARIKA CARRIER, Plaintiff FINN CARRIER, Plaintiff HERA CARRIER.
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
18 18 misc Stipulation Wed 01/05 10:03 AM
Stipulation By ARIKA CARRIER, FINN CARRIER, HERA CARRIER, RYAN CARRIER and Between Affinitylifestyles.com, Inc. dba Real Water, Real Water, Inc., and Milwaukee Instruments, Inc. Stipulation to Advance Hearing Date Regarding Plaintiffs' Motion To Remand In Consolidation With Adversary Proceedings To January 12, 2022 Filed by SAMUEL R MIRKOVICH on behalf of ARIKA CARRIER, FINN CARRIER, HERA CARRIER, RYAN CARRIER Related [+] (MIRKOVICH, SAMUEL)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff RYAN CARRIER, Plaintiff ARIKA CARRIER, Plaintiff FINN CARRIER, Plaintiff HERA CARRIER
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
17 17 order Exceed Page Limit Tue 01/04 8:25 AM
Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limit Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 14
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
16 16 adv_misc Declaration (ADV) Wed 12/29 8:37 PM
Declaration Of: Robert T. Robbins In Support of Consolidated Opposition with Certificate of Service Filed by ROBERT T. ROBBINS on behalf of MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS Related [+] (ROBBINS, ROBERT)
Related: [-] 15 Opposition filed by Defendant MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS.
15 15 answer Opposition Wed 12/29 8:36 PM
Opposition Consolidated Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motions for Remand with Certificate of Service Filed by ROBERT T. ROBBINS on behalf of MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS Related [+] (ROBBINS, ROBERT)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff RYAN CARRIER, Plaintiff ARIKA CARRIER, Plaintiff FINN CARRIER, Plaintiff HERA CARRIER.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-4
14 14 motion Exceed Page Limit Wed 12/29 8:34 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Exceed Page Limit with Certificate of Service Filed by ROBERT T. ROBBINS on behalf of MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS (ROBBINS, ROBERT)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 15, 2021
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance (BK) Wed 12/15 4:07 PM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by SAMUEL R MIRKOVICH on behalf of ARIKA CARRIER, FINN CARRIER, HERA CARRIER, RYAN CARRIER (MIRKOVICH, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Document Wed 12/15 12:36 PM
Document Defendants' Certificate of Interested Parties with Certificate of Service Filed by XHENI RISTANI on behalf of AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM INC. (RISTANI, XHENI)
Related: [-]
11 11 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Wed 12/15 10:44 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 9 Notice filed by Plaintiff RYAN CARRIER, Plaintiff ARIKA CARRIER, Plaintiff FINN CARRIER, Plaintiff HERA CARRIER.
10 10 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Wed 12/15 10:41 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 2/3/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff RYAN CARRIER, Plaintiff ARIKA CARRIER, Plaintiff FINN CARRIER, Plaintiff HERA CARRIER.
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
9 9 notice Notice (BK) Tue 12/14 11:34 AM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by SAMUEL R MIRKOVICH on behalf of ARIKA CARRIER, FINN CARRIER, HERA CARRIER, RYAN CARRIER (MIRKOVICH, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Hearing (BK) Tue 12/14 11:20 AM
First Notice of Hearing On Motion To Remand Hearing Date: 02/03/2022 Hearing Time: 9:30am with Certificate of Service Filed by SAMUEL R MIRKOVICH on behalf of ARIKA CARRIER, FINN CARRIER, HERA CARRIER, RYAN CARRIER Related [+] (MIRKOVICH, SAMUEL)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Remand filed by Plaintiff RYAN CARRIER, Plaintiff ARIKA CARRIER, Plaintiff FINN CARRIER, Plaintiff HERA CARRIER
7 7 motion Remand (Bk) Tue 12/14 11:14 AM
First Motion for Remand MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO REMAND with Certificate of Service Filed by SAMUEL R MIRKOVICH on behalf of ARIKA CARRIER, FINN CARRIER, HERA CARRIER, RYAN CARRIER(MIRKOVICH, SAMUEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration Of Samuel R. Mirkovich, Esq. In Support Of Plaintiffs' Motion To Remand.
Thursday, December 02, 2021
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance (BK) Thu 12/02 4:19 PM
Amended Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by XHENI RISTANI on behalf of AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM INC. (RISTANI, XHENI)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Thu 12/02 11:06 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 4 Notice of Appearance filed by Defendant AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM INC..
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance (BK) Wed 12/01 11:16 AM
Notice of Appearance with Certificate of Service Filed by XHENI RISTANI on behalf of AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM INC. (RISTANI, XHENI)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 18, 2021
3 3 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Thu 11/18 3:49 PM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 3/3/2022 at 09:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (mmm)
Related: [-] 1 Notice of Removal filed by Plaintiff RYAN CARRIER, Plaintiff ARIKA CARRIER, Plaintiff FINN CARRIER, Plaintiff HERA CARRIER.
Wednesday, November 17, 2021
2 2 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Wed 11/17 9:31 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement with Certificate of Service Filed by Robert T. Robbins on behalf of MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS (Robbins, Robert)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 11/17 4:35 PM
Adversary case 21-01243 Notice of Removal of RYAN CARRIER, ARIKA CARRIER, HERA CARRIER, FINN CARRIER against REAL WATER INC., AFFINITYLIFESTYLES.COM INC., MILWAUKEE INSTRUMENTS. Fee Amount $350. (01 (Determination of removed claim or cause)(Robbins, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit