Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:21-bk-52892

Ohio Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Jeffery P Hopkins
Case #: 2:21-ap-02060
Nature of Suit68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Nov 23, 2021
Terminated:Oct 14, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ben H. Cook, Sr.
3380 Hamburg Rd. SW
Lancaster, OH 43130
Represented By
Ben H. Cook, Sr.
contact info
Plaintiff
Reliable One Resources, Inc.
707 West Corsicana Street
Athens, TX 75751
Represented By
Khadine L. Ritter
Theisen Brock
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Friday, October 14, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/14 2:58 PM
Adversary Case 2:21-ap-2060 Closed (pjr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 11, 2022
15 15 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Fri 08/12 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 08/11/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)14 Judgment
Tuesday, August 09, 2022
14 14 order Judgment Tue 08/09 12:00 PM
Consent to Entry of Final Judgment Related [+]. (kmf)
Related: [-] f. to Doc #1
Monday, June 27, 2022
court Hearing Canceled Mon 06/27 6:53 PM
Proceeding Memo: 06/27/2022. Hearing canceled due to: Agreed order forthcoming. Related [+] Order Due: 7/5/2022. (rjh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Reliable One Resources, Inc.
Thursday, June 02, 2022
13 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Fri 06/03 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 06/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)11 Transmission of Document to BNC for Service
12 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing - BNC Fri 06/03 12:07 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/02/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)10 Hearing (Adv Other) Set
Tuesday, May 31, 2022
11 11 court Transmission of Document to BNC for Service Tue 05/31 3:44 PM
Transmission of Document to BNC for Service Related [+] (2rh)
Related: [-] 10 Hearing (Adv Other) Set
10 10 court Hearing Set (Other) Tue 05/31 3:33 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+]. Status hearing to be held on 6/27/2022 at 01:00 PM Columbus Telephone for1 . (2rh) (Main Document 10 replaced on 5/31/2022) (2rh). Modified on 5/31/2022 to correct the method of hearing (2rh)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Reliable One Resources, Inc.
Saturday, May 21, 2022
9 9 misc Pretrial Statement Sat 05/21 9:37 PM
Pretrial Statement Filed by Defendant Ben H. Cook Sr. Related [+]. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Monday, May 16, 2022
8 8 misc Pretrial Statement Mon 05/16 4:46 PM
Pretrial Statement Filed by Plaintiff Reliable One Resources, Inc. Related [+]. (Ritter, Khadine)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, April 01, 2022
7 7 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Sat 04/02 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 04/01/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)5 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, March 30, 2022
6 6 BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document - BNC Thu 03/31 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 03/30/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] related documents(s)4 Order Transferring Judge
Tuesday, March 29, 2022
5 5 order Scheduling Order Wed 03/30 7:29 AM
Order Governing Pretrial and Trial Procedures in Adversary Proceedings and Ordering Preliminary Pretrial Statements. Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 5/16/2022. Related [+]. (2kf)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Reliable One Resources, Inc.
Monday, March 28, 2022
4 4 order Transferring Judge Mon 03/28 12:01 PM
Order Directing Reassignment of Case. (2pr)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 21, 2022
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 03/22 12:00 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Ben H. Cook Sr.. (Coutinho, James)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
2 2 misc Summons Issued and Served Tue 02/15 4:07 PM
Summons(es) on Ben H. Cook Sr. Issued On 2/15/2022, and Answer Due On 03/17/2022 (Ritter, Khadine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Wednesday, December 01, 2021
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Wed 12/01 9:03 AM
Receipt of Amended Schedules([LINK:2:21-ap-02060] ) ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt Number A40377917, amount $ 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Tuesday, November 23, 2021
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 11/29 3:29 PM
Adversary case 2:21-ap-02060. (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)) , (68 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury)): Complaint by Reliable One Resources, Inc. against Ben H. Cook Sr.. Fee Amount $350 (3me) Modified on 11/29/2021 to correct the date filed (3me)
Related: [-]