Thompson v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-82146 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Nov 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 16, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Louisiana Eastern, 2:21-cv-02109 |
Last checked: Sunday May 29, 2022 4:27 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline P.L.C.
|
|
Defendant
Glaxosmithkline LLC
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Cherrian Thompson
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 16, 2021 | ||
12 | 12
order
Administrative Order
Fri 12/17 11:18 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Tuesday, November 30, 2021 | ||
11 | 11 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Louisiana. Case Number 2:21-cv-02109 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82146-RLR Thompson v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 11/30/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 84. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) | |
10 | 10 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) | |
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Tue 11/30 4:03 PM
Case transferred in from Louisiana Eastern; Case Number 2:21-cv-02109. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
8 | 8
order
MDL Conditional Transfer Order
Tue 11/30 1:39 PM
Order of MDL Transfer to Southern District of Florida. MDL case number is 2924. Electronic file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent.(pp) |
|
Att: 1 Transmittal Letter 1, | ||
Att: 2 Transmittal Letter 2 | ||
7 | 7
order
MDL Conditional Transfer Order
Tue 11/30 10:47 AM
Notice of Conditional Transfer Order from MDL Panel regarding MDL 2924. (pp) |
|
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 11/30 4:06 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
||
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Tue 11/30 4:10 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Louisiana. Case Number 2:21-cv-02109 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82146-RLR Thompson v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 11/30/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 84. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) |
||
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem Inc, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, GlaxoSmithKline PLC, Pfizer Inc, Sanofi, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(pp) | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons | ||
5 | 5 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re4 Request for Summons Issued. **Page 2 of summons not provided. For future filings, page 2 should be attached to page 1 of summons. Clerk has attached 2nd page of summons. Please use both pages when filing returns of service. No further action necessary.** (pp) | |
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 Request of Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline PLC, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC filed by All Plaintiffs re1 Complaint,.(Moore, Timothy) | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons, | ||
Att: 4 Summons, | ||
Att: 5 Summons, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons | ||
Tuesday, November 16, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re1 Complaint. Filing attorney did not properly format the pdf of Civil Cover Sheet. The pdf should not have the pink header nor the 3 red buttons at the bottom. When using a FORM, fill in the applicable fields then click the red PRINT button at the bottom to print the document to pdf format. Clerk has taken corrective action. Additionally, attachment has duplicate description. For attachments, select either a category OR enter a description. Selecting both will result in duplicate docket text. Clerk took corrective action. (cwa) | |
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
2 | 2 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Ivan L.R. Lemelle and Magistrate Judge Donna Phillips Currault. (go) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand against Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline PLC, GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, Pfizer, Inc., Sanofi, Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC (Filing fee $402 receipt number ALAEDC-9107828) filed by Cherrian Thompson.Attorney Timothy B. Moore added to party Cherrian Thompson(pty:pla).(Moore, Timothy) (Attachment 1 replaced on 11/16/2021) (cwa). Modified text on 11/16/2021 (cwa). | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |