Utah District Court
Judge:Robert J Shelby
Referred: Cecilia M Romero
Case #: 2:21-cv-00709
Nature of Suit896 Other Statutes - Arbitration
Cause18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Dec 01, 2021
Re-opened:Apr 10, 2024
Terminated:Jun 13, 2022
Last checked: Monday May 30, 2022 3:30 AM MDT
Petitioner
Nu Skin Enterprises
Represented By
Elizabeth Mary Butler
Jones Waldo Holbrook & Mcdonough
contact info
Lewis M. Francis
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
James B. Saylor
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Craig R. Mariger
Jones Waldo Holbrook & Mcdonough
contact info
Christian Andrew Vanderhooft
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Lauri A. Mazzuchetti
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Petitioner
Pharmanex
Represented By
Elizabeth Mary Butler
Jones Waldo Holbrook & Mcdonough
contact info
Lewis M. Francis
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
James B. Saylor
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Craig R. Mariger
Jones Waldo Holbrook & Mcdonough
contact info
Christian Andrew Vanderhooft
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Lauri A. Mazzuchetti
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Respondent
Amy L. Matecki
Represented By
John M. Macfarlane
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Pearson McKay Corbett
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Richard C. Eymann
Eymann Allison Jones Ps
contact info
Respondent
Wayne Matecki
Represented By
John M. Macfarlane
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Pearson McKay Corbett
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Richard C. Eymann
Eymann Allison Jones Ps
contact info
Respondent
Earnest L. Raab
Represented By
John M. Macfarlane
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Pearson McKay Corbett
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Richard C. Eymann
Eymann Allison Jones Ps
contact info
Respondent
Toni Ragsdale
Represented By
John M. Macfarlane
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Pearson McKay Corbett
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Richard C. Eymann
Eymann Allison Jones Ps
contact info
Respondent
Debra Robbins
Represented By
John M. Macfarlane
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Pearson McKay Corbett
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Richard C. Eymann
Eymann Allison Jones Ps
contact info
Respondent
Max Robbins
Represented By
John M. Macfarlane
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Pearson McKay Corbett
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Richard C. Eymann
Eymann Allison Jones Ps
contact info
Respondent
Michael Ulrick
Represented By
John M. Macfarlane
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Pearson McKay Corbett
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Richard C. Eymann
Eymann Allison Jones Ps
contact info
Respondent
Larry C. Wieber
Represented By
John M. Macfarlane
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Pearson McKay Corbett
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Richard C. Eymann
Eymann Allison Jones Ps
contact info
Respondent
Rose Wieber
Represented By
John M. Macfarlane
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Pearson McKay Corbett
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Richard C. Eymann
Eymann Allison Jones Ps
contact info

GPO Jun 13 2022
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 29 Respondents' Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 6/13/22. (dla)

Docket last updated: 04/27/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
72 72 order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 02/11 3:48 PM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER TERMINATING COUNSEL OF RECORD - Because Mr. Vanderhooft is not licensed to practice law in Utah, the court directs the Clerk of Court to terminate his status as counsel of record in this matter. If Mr. Vanderhooft corrects the licensure issue, he may file a Notice of Appearance to become counsel of record again. Attorney Christian Vanderhooft terminated. No attached document. Signed by Judge Robert J. Shelby on 2/11/2025. (mh)
Related: [-]