Boyle v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-03899 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 01, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday May 30, 2022 5:32 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
Coporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Incorporated
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Ann Boyle
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/22 8:56 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs of certain claimsAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Feliciani, Joseph) Modified to edit docket text for clarification on 8/22/2024 (sshe, ) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit | ||
Monday, November 20, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Party
Mon 11/20 12:18 PM
ORDER This Order Relates to: Boyle v. 3M Co. et al. Case No. 2:21-cv-3899-RMG. The unopposed motion to substitute Anne Marie Krein as a Plaintiff for Decedent Ann Boyle (Dkt. No. 4003 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (4) in case 2:21-cv-03899-RMG) is granted. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 11/20/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03899-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, November 10, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
motion
Substitute Party
Fri 11/10 3:44 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party by Ann Boyle. Response to Motion due by 11/27/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.(Feliciani, Joseph)Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03899-RMG QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE Counsel/Attorney filing user: Please note correct filing procedures for future filings. Refiled correctly, as of original filing date, in management case AND SPREAD to applicable member case, to which the document relates as listed on document, per Judge's filing instructions/preferences per CMO No. 1.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, December 03, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Boyle v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-3899-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Pennsylvania (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 12/03 11:09 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 12/03 11:10 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Boyle v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-3899-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Eastern Pennsylvania (sshe, ) |
||
Wednesday, December 01, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/03 11:08 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10212473.), filed by Ann Boyle. Service due by 3/1/2022(sshe, ) |