Grimes v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-03923 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 03, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 01, 2022 5:18 AM EDT |
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Patrick Grimes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, July 30, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 07/30 9:51 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gene Walters, Jeanette Walters, Curt Wasserman, Shannon Wasserman, Ronald K Dancy, Dexter A Dobson, Regina Dobson, Anthony Pulli, Mary Pulli, James Tucker, Marianne Tucker, Dawn Platek, Eric Platek, Alfred Valdez, Robyn Valdez, Nicholas Allen, Savannah Allen, Jennifer Sutton, Michael Sutton, Jackie Moon, Keishaun Moon, Joseph Canfill, Patrick Williams, Jana L Joyner, Phillip J Joyner, Bruce Cavallari, Patrick Grimes, Ernest Harris, Jessica Richardson, Roger Richardson, Edward Weller, Kelly Diane Weller, Brian Wade, Genevelyn Wade, Roderick Nelson, Paul Mears, Rebecca Mears, Shane York Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Vasquez, James) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 12/01 8:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AGC Chemicals Americas Inc (O'Reilly, Paul) |
|
4 | 4
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 12/01 8:24 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ChemDesign Products Inc (O'Reilly, Paul) |
|
Friday, December 03, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Grimes v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-3923-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Arizona (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 12/03 1:32 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/03 1:14 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10216733.), filed by Patrick Grimes. Service due by 3/3/2022(sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 12/03 1:56 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Grimes v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-3923-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Arizona (sshe, ) |