Harrell v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:21-cv-82174 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal |
Case Filed: | Dec 07, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 16, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Missouri Eastern, 4:21-cv-01119 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 05, 2022 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation
900 Ridgebury Road
Ridgefield, CT 06877 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim U.S.A. Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
GlaxoSmithKline LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patheon Manufacturing Services LLC
|
|
Defendant
Pfizer Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Schnuck Market, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Elaine Harrell
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, December 16, 2021 | ||
41 | 41
order
Administrative Order
Fri 12/17 11:18 AM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 12/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Tuesday, December 07, 2021 | ||
39 | 39 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) | |
38 | 38
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Tue 12/07 8:36 AM
Case transferred in from Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:21-cv-01119. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Tue 12/07 8:39 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
||
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Tue 12/07 11:21 AM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from Eastern District of Missouri. Case Number 4:21-cv-01119 with documents 1-37. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:21-cv-82174-RLR Harrell v. Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. et al on 12/7/2021. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Transfer Order dated 12/3/2021. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) |
||
Monday, December 06, 2021 | ||
37 | 37 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Southern District of Florida. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) | |
Friday, December 03, 2021 | ||
36 | 36 TRANSFER ORDER (with Schedule A) regarding MDL No. 2924 IN RE: ZANTAC (RANITIDINE) PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION signed by Karen K. Caldwell, Chair. (DJO) | |
Tuesday, September 28, 2021 | ||
35 | 35 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Stay all Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation (Doc.4 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all proceedings and deadlines in the above-captioned case are STAYED until 14 days after the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation determines whether to transfer this action to an MDL proceeding and completes any transfer of this action pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1407. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 9/28/2021. (KEK) | |
Thursday, September 23, 2021 | ||
34 | 34 Docket Text ORDER: Re:33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ashley C. Keller. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8882571) by Plaintiff Elaine Harrell.(Keller, Ashley) filed by Elaine Harrell ; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 9/23/21. (ARL) | |
Wednesday, September 22, 2021 | ||
33 | 33 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Ashley C. Keller. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $100 receipt number AMOEDC-8882571) by Plaintiff Elaine Harrell.(Keller, Ashley) | |
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing | ||
32 | 32 REPLY to Response to Motion re4 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Rankin, W.) | |
31 | 31 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc... (Shaw, Booker) | |
30 | 30 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant GlaxoSmithKline LLC.. (Shaw, Booker) | |
29 | 29 ENTRY of Appearance by Booker T. Shaw for Defendants GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC. (Shaw, Booker) | |
Tuesday, September 21, 2021 | ||
28 | 28 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. Parent companies: Boehringer Ingelheim International GmbH, Subsidiaries: none, Publicly held company: none,. (Strauss, Bettina) | |
27 | 27 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation. Parent companies: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Strauss, Bettina) | |
26 | 26 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Parent companies: Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation; Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Strauss, Bettina) | |
Monday, September 20, 2021 | ||
25 | 25 22 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re24 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) filed by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Rankin, W.) | |
24 | 24 MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 12(b)(6) by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Rankin, W.) | |
Friday, September 17, 2021 | ||
22 | 22 9 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition re4 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Plaintiff Elaine Harrell. (Holland, Eric) | |
21 | 21 4 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition re15 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Plaintiff Elaine Harrell. (Holland, Eric) | |
Thursday, September 16, 2021 | ||
20 | 20 19 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re19 Emergency MOTION to Remand Case to State Court filed by Plaintiff Elaine Harrell.(Holland, Eric) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 | ||
19 | 19 Emergency MOTION to Remand Case to State Court by Plaintiff Elaine Harrell.(Holland, Eric) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand | ||
18 | 18 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.. (Rankin, W.) | |
17 | 17 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Sanofi US Services, Inc... (Rankin, W.) | |
16 | 16 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Chattem, Inc... (Rankin, W.) | |
15 | 15 Emergency MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation.(Strauss, Bettina) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, September 15, 2021 | ||
14 | 14 RESPONSE to Motion re9 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Ruling on Plaintiff's Upcoming Motion to Remand filed by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (Strauss, Bettina) | |
13 | 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Bettina J. Strauss for Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation. (Strauss, Bettina) | |
12 | 12 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 9/25/2021. (KEK) | |
Tuesday, September 14, 2021 | ||
11 | 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Randall S. Crompton for Plaintiff Elaine Harrell. (Crompton, Randall) | |
10 | 10 6 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re9 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Ruling on Plaintiff's Upcoming Motion to Remand filed by Plaintiff Elaine Harrell.(Holland, Eric) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
9 | 9 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Ruling on Plaintiff's Upcoming Motion to Remand by Plaintiff Elaine Harrell.(Holland, Eric) | |
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Expedite Briefing Schedule on Motion to Remand | ||
8 | 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Eric D. Holland for Plaintiff Elaine Harrell. (Holland, Eric) | |
7 | 7 DISCLOSURE OF ORGANIZATIONAL INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Pfizer Inc... (Sullivan, Bart) | |
6 | 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Bart C. Sullivan for Defendant Pfizer Inc.. (Sullivan, Bart) | |
5 | 5 10 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re4 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation filed by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Rankin, W.) | |
4 | 4 MOTION to Stay all Proceedings Pending Transfer to Multidistrict Litigation by Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Chattem, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Pfizer Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Rankin, W.) | |
3 | 3 Petition Received From: Circuit Court, City of St Louis, filed by Elaine Harrell.(BAK) | |
Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk. (BAK) | ||
Monday, September 13, 2021 | ||
23 | 23 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate to Defendants Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation, Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc., GlaxoSmithKline LLC. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every non-governmental organizational party must file a Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate within ten (10) days of the party's first pleading or entry of appearance. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible[LINK:(moed-0001.pdf)] . Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate due by 9/24/2021. (CBL) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC Sent To: Plaintiff (Rankin, W.) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court City of St. Louis, State of Missouri, case number 2122-CC09044, with receipt number AMOEDC-8863460, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by GlaxoSmithKline Holdings (Americas) Inc., Chattem, Inc., boehringer ingelheim corporation, Pfizer Inc., Sanofi US Services, Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, GlaxoSmithKline LLC.(Rankin, W.) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E, | ||
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Original Filing Form |