Oliver et al v. 3M Company, The et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:21-cv-03976 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Dec 08, 2021 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 06, 2022 4:28 AM EDT |
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
|
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
EI Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
103 Fairview Park Drive
Elmsford, NY 10523 |
|
Defendant
Du Pont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company, The
|
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Oliver
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vickie Oliver
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/10 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jess Ackerman, Lana Horner, Norman Horner, Linda Kozlowski, Raymond Kozlowski, Ronald Oliver, Vickie Oliver Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03976-RMG, 2:21-cv-04124-RMG, 2:22-cv-00150-RMG, 2:22-cv-04689-RMG(Vasquez, James) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Issued
Fri 05/24 9:13 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, May 23, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
39
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Thu 05/23 1:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Vickie Oliver, Ronald Oliver. Service due by 8/21/2024 (Vasquez, James) |
|
Att: 1 Summons | ||
7 | 7
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
Thu 05/23 11:07 AM
ORDER This Order Relates to Case No. 2:21-cv-3976-RMG. The motion to amend (Dkt. No. 4907 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (6) in case 2:21-cv-03976-RMG) is GRANTED and Plaintiffs are directed to promptly file the amended complaint. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/23/2024.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03976-RMG(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Amend/Correct
Fri 03/01 12:19 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct by Ronald Oliver, Vickie Oliver. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-03976-RMG(Vasquez, James) Modified on 4/25/2024 to edit to original date filed, per Motion was refiled correctly in the lead and spread to the applicable member case per CMO No. 1 Filing instructions (sshe, ) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 12/01 9:44 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by AGC Chemicals Americas Inc (O'Reilly, Paul) |
|
4 | 4
service
Certificate of Service
Thu 12/01 9:42 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ChemDesign Products Inc (O'Reilly, Paul) |
|
Friday, December 10, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Oliver et al v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-3976-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western Missouri (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2
service
Summons Issued
Fri 12/10 3:08 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Fri 12/10 3:09 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-filed), Oliver et al v. 3M et al, as DSC case 2:21-cv-3976-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western Missouri (sshe, ) |
||
Wednesday, December 08, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 12/10 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10225320.), filed by Vickie Oliver, Ronald Oliver. Service due by 3/8/2022(sshe, ) |