Minnesota District Court
Judge:John R Tunheim
Referred: Leo I Brisbois
Case #: 0:21-cv-02648
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Dec 10, 2021
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 08, 2022 4:05 AM CDT
Defendant
American Education Services
Represented By
Karl Joseph Johnson
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Defendant
Coronado Student Loan Trust
Represented By
Orin J Kipp
Wilford Geske & Cook, P.A.
contact info
Defendant
Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency
Represented By
Karl Joseph Johnson
Taft Stettinius & Hollister LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Ashley Theresa Goodman
Represented By
Timothy D Johnson
Smith Jadin Johnson PLLC
contact info
Amanda K Linden
Hellmuth & Johnson
contact info
Bryan M Wiley
Smith Jadin Johnson PLLC
contact info

GPO Sep 01 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting 4 Motion to Dismiss. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 9/1/2022. (HMA)

Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
22 22 order Scheduling Order Tue 09/13 7:51 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING NOTICE AND ORDER WHILE DISTRICT OF MINNESOTA IS UNDER GENERAL ORDER RELATED TO COVID-19: See Notice and Order for document submission deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 9/13/2022.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Consent Form
Thursday, September 08, 2022
21 21 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/08 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ashley Theresa Goodman (Wiley, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 01, 2022
20 20 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/General Thu 09/01 4:32 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER granting4 Motion to Dismiss. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge John R. Tunheim on 9/1/2022. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 01, 2022
notice Notice to Attorney Wed 06/01 4:32 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE TO ATTORNEY - Chief Judge Tunheim will hear Defendant's motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 4] on the papers submitted, without a hearing. A written order will be forthcoming. (HMA)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Cancelation/Rescheduling of Hearing Wed 06/01 4:33 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE of Cancelation of Hearing: Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2022 at 11:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim is CANCELED. (HMA)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
17 17 notice Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 03/24 4:14 PM
AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion:4 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 6/16/2022 at 11:00 AM in Video Conference (no courtroom) before Chief Judge John R. Tunheim. (Johnson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 11, 2022
16 16 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance/Substitution Fri 03/11 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY SUBSTITUTION for Ashley Theresa Goodman. (Wiley, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2022
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 03/04 11:42 AM
ORDER - 1. The parties' Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer [Docket No.14 ] is APPROVED; and 2. Defendant Coronado Student Loan Trust shall answer or otherwise respond to the Plaintiff's complaint by no later than twenty (20) days after the Court issues its Order on Defendants' Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency and American Education Services Motion to Dismiss [Docket No.4 ]. Signed by Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois on 3/4/2022.(JLB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 03, 2022
14 14 misc Stipulation Thu 03/03 1:32 PM
STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer by Coronado Student Loan Trust. Jointly Signed by Ashley Theresa Goodman. (Kipp, Orin)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/25 10:23 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Orin J Kipp on behalf of Coronado Student Loan Trust. (Kipp, Orin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 24, 2022
12 12 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Thu 02/24 4:23 PM
Second Declaration of Karl J. Johnson in Support of4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by American Education Services, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency.(Johnson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
11 11 respm Reply Thu 02/24 4:21 PM
REPLY re10 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion,, filed by American Education Services, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency.(Johnson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
10 10 12 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Tue 02/15 1:05 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition re4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by Ashley Theresa Goodman.(Linden, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Compliance with Local Rules 7.1(f) and 7.1(h),
Att: 2 Affidavit of Amanda K. Linden,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) 1 to Affidavit of Amanda K. Linden,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) 2 to Affidavit of Amanda K. Linden,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) 3 to Affidavit of Amanda K. Linden,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) 4 to Affidavit of Amanda K. Linden,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) 5 to Affidavit of Amanda K. Linden,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) 6 to Affidavit of Amanda K. Linden
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
9 9 respm Proposed Order to Judge re Motion Tue 01/25 10:57 AM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by American Education Services, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency.(Johnson, Karl)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Tue 01/25 10:56 AM
Declaration of Karl J. Johnson in Support of4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by American Education Services, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency.(Johnson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s)
7 7 misc Meet and Confer Statement Tue 01/25 10:54 AM
MEET and CONFER STATEMENT re4 Motion to Dismiss/General filed by American Education Services, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency.(Johnson, Karl)
Related: [-]
6 6 7 pgs respm Memorandum in Support of Motion Tue 01/25 10:53 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support re4 MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by American Education Services, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency.(Johnson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate
5 5 notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Tue 01/25 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION4 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Date and time to be determined. (Johnson, Karl)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Dismiss/General Tue 01/25 10:51 AM
MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by American Education Services, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (Johnson, Karl)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 10, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 12/10 2:24 PM
Summons Issued as to American Education Services, Coronado Student Loan Trust, Pennsylvania Higher Education Assistance Agency. (MMP)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Fri 12/10 2:23 PM
(Text-Only) CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge John R. Tunheim per 5th Division Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-2648 (JRT/LIB). (MMP)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 12/10 1:53 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-9200482) filed by Ashley Theresa Goodman. Filer requests summons issued. (Linden, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A-N,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) O-W,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) X-Z,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet