Oregon District Court
Case #: 6:21-mj-00214
Case Filed:Nov 11, 2021
Terminated:Nov 18, 2021
Last checked: Friday Dec 10, 2021 11:35 PM PST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Gavin W. Bruce
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Daniel Andrew McGee (1)
Terminated: 11/18/2021
Represented By
Irina Hughes
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info


Docket last updated: 12/11/2021 12:24 AM PST
Thursday, November 11, 2021
1 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Mustafa T. Kasubhai as to Daniel Andrew McGee (1). (bd) Unsealed on 11/15/2021 (plb).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support of Criminal Complaint