Ohio Southern District Court
Judge:James L Graham
Referred: Kimberly A Jolson
Case #: 2:22-cv-00004
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jan 03, 2022
Terminated:Oct 06, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Jul 02, 2022 4:43 AM EDT
Defendant
Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Kent Hushion
Reminger Co., Lpa
contact info
D Patrick Kasson
Reminger Co., Lpa
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Schnipke
Represented By
Paul Filippelli
The Spitz Law Firm, LLC
contact info
Trisha M. Breedlove
The Spitz Law Firm
contact info
Gregory T. Shumaker
The Spitz Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Thursday, October 06, 2022
20 20 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 10/06 3:55 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff Eric Schnipke. (Breedlove, Trisha)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 10/07 4:42 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per20 Stipulation of Dismissal. (sem)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
motion Continue Fri 09/09 2:13 PM
Paperless MOTION to Continue Status Conference. (jr)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Continue Fri 09/09 2:14 PM
NOTATION ORDER granting 18 Paperless Motion to Continue. Status Conference reset for 10/18/2022 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 9/9/22. (jr)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 19, 2022
order Order Fri 08/19 9:31 AM
NOTATION ORDER - This case has been reported as settled. A Telephonic Status Conference will be held on September 22, 2022 at 10:00 am, unless the dismissal entry is received prior to that time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 8/19/22. (jr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
15 15 med Mediator's Notice of Changing Mediation Date Thu 07/21 10:23 AM
Mediator's Notice of Changing Mediation Date. Mediator Kevin M. McDermott II to conduct mediation.Mediation will be held at via Zoom. Mediation Hearing set for 8/17/2022 at 10:00 AM. (McDermott, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
14 14 med Notice Setting Mediation Fri 07/15 1:02 PM
Notice of Mediation Conference: Mediator Kevin M. McDermott II to conduct mediation in Via Zoom (arrangements to be circulated to counsel). Mediation Hearing set for 7/21/2022 at 10:00 AM. (McDermott, Kevin)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
med Notice Designating Mediator Tue 07/05 11:13 AM
NOTICE DESIGNATING MEDIATOR: Kevin M McDermott II assigned as mediator to this case. Within 14 days, the mediator and parties will confer to set a date, time, and location for mediation in August 2022, or within 60 days of this notice . The mediator will then file a Notice Setting Mediation. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 21, 2022
13 13 notice Notice Determining Readiness of Mediation (Columbus) Tue 06/21 10:15 AM
NOTICE: Counsel shall confer and notify the Court at[LINK:ADR@ohsd.uscourts.gov] within 10 days if this case should NOT proceed with mediation in August 2022 . If the case should not proceed, counsel shall indicate whether the case should be continued to another month and, if so, which one. Deadline for notifying the court is 4:00pm on 7/1/2022 . (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 15, 2022
12 12 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 06/15 9:23 AM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Eric Schnipke by Defendant Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc.. (Kasson, D)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 03, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 06/03 1:10 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory T. Shumaker for Plaintiff Eric Schnipke (Shumaker, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 28, 2022
10 10 13 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Mon 03/28 11:29 AM
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 3/28/2022. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
9 9 misc Stipulation Fri 03/25 4:45 PM
STIPULATION Protective Order by Defendant Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc.. (Kasson, D)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
8 8 order Columbus Preliminary Pretrial Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 02/17 2:11 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2022 is VACATED. Initial Disclosures due by 3/18/2022; Joinder of Parties & Motions to Amend due by 3/18/2022; Discovery due by 12/22/2022; Protective Order or Clawback Agreement due by 3/25/2022; Dispositive motions due by 1/20/2023; Case is referred to Mediation in 8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 2/17/2022. (kk2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
7 7 misc Rule 26(f) Report Wed 02/16 3:44 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc.. (Hushion, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 07, 2022
6 6 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 02/07 2:33 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2022 10:30 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson. (jr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 01/27 10:50 AM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc.. (Hushion, Michael)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/27 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Kent Hushion for Defendant Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc. (Hushion, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 01/24 2:39 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc. answer due 3/7/2022. (er)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 01/21 9:21 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Hushion, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 01/04 9:24 AM
Summons Issued as to Kemba Financial Credit Union, Inc. (ds)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/03 3:38 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8656766), filed by Eric Schnipke. (Filippelli, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Form Summons x2,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit A Right to Sue