New Jersey District Court
Judge:Christine P O'Hearn
Referred: Ann Marie Donio
Case #: 1:22-cv-00030
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jan 04, 2022
Terminated:Mar 07, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Jul 03, 2022 5:24 AM EDT
Defendant
D.C. BATES EQUIPMENT CO., INC.
Plaintiff
RAIL TEK LLC
Represented By
JASON M. SARUYA
Lex Nova Law, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
8 8 appeal USCA Letter to District Court Clerk Wed 10/09 11:58 AM
USCA LETTER TO DISTRICT COURT CLERK re: forwarding Notice of Appeal filed by Hassan Childs to District Court(ca3ssp, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Letter
qc QC - Incorrect Entry made by Clerk's Office Staff Wed 10/09 12:19 PM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please note the USCA LETTER TO DISTRICT COURT CLERK attached to docket entry8 filed by the USCA on 10/9/2024 was docketed in error. Please disregard. This message is for informational purposes only. (js)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 07, 2022
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/07 9:21 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (abr, )
Related: [-]
Friday, March 04, 2022
7 7 misc Stipulation of Dismissal (aty) Fri 03/04 12:20 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by RAIL TEK LLC. (SARUYA, JASON)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
order Order Wed 01/12 9:34 AM
TEXT ORDER: Order in all cases in which the basis of jurisdiction is 28 U.S.C. § 1332, Diversity of Citizenship: Whether or not the Court issues an Order to Show Cause or other Order directing the filing of an amended pleading or removal petition on the issue of jurisdiction, the parties in all diversity cases are required to complete and file a Joint Certification of the Citizenship of the Parties,[LINK:click here] , within 30 days of the filing of a Notice of Removal, or where the Complaint is initially filed in this Court, 30 days after an answer, other responsive pleading, or motion has been filed.. So Ordered by Judge Christine P. O'Hearn on 1/12/2021. (db, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
5 5 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/10 12:29 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by RAIL TEK LLC. (SARUYA, JASON)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
4 4 misc Exhibit (to Document) Wed 01/05 11:42 AM
Exhibit to1 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet by RAIL TEK LLC. (SARUYA, JASON)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Wed 01/05 11:29 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by RAIL TEK LLC. (SARUYA, JASON)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 01/04 2:49 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to D.C. BATES EQUIPMENT CO., INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (pr, )
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 01/04 1:32 PM
COMPLAINT against D.C. BATES EQUIPMENT COMPANY INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-13082249) with JURY DEMAND, filed by Rail Tek, LLC.(SARUYA, JASON)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit,
Att: 8 Exhibit,
Att: 9 Exhibit,
Att: 10 Exhibit,
Att: 11 Exhibit,
Att: 12 Exhibit
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 01/04 2:13 PM
Judge Christine P. O'Hearn and Magistrate Judge Ann Marie Donio added. (dmw)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Tue 01/04 2:14 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dmw, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Lack of Disclosure Statement Tue 01/04 2:49 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Pro. 7.1, a disclosure statement is required to be filed by a nongovernmental corporate party. Please refer to the Court's website at www.njd.uscourts.gov for a form and filing instructions. (pr, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Tue 01/04 2:49 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: Cause of Action,Jury Demand,Party Information, . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (pr, )
Related: [-]