District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Colleen Kollar-Kotelly
Case #: 1:22-cv-00023
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2022
Terminated:Jan 22, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court for the District of Columbia, 2019 CA 006118 B
Last checked: Monday Jul 04, 2022 5:35 AM EDT
Defendant
ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP.
Represented By
Alan S. Block
Kiernan Trebachllp
contact info
Andrew Bassan, I
Kiernan Trebach, LLP
contact info
William H. White, Jr.
Kiernan Trebach LLP
contact info
Defendant
FLORENTINO GREGORIO
7026 Hector Road
McLean, VA 22101
Represented By
Alan S. Block
Kiernan Trebachllp
contact info
Andrew Bassan, I
Kiernan Trebach, LLP
contact info
William H. White, Jr.
Kiernan Trebach LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSE ANTONIO COREAS
Represented By
Geoffrey Martin Bohn
Bohn & Battey, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSE ELVARADO
Represented By
Geoffrey Martin Bohn
Bohn & Battey, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
PAZ GARCIA
Represented By
Geoffrey Martin Bohn
Bohn & Battey, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
GERMAN GUARDADO
Represented By
Geoffrey Martin Bohn
Bohn & Battey, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
EFRAIN MARCIA PORTILLO
Represented By
Geoffrey Martin Bohn
Bohn & Battey, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
NARCISO RAMIREZ
Represented By
Geoffrey Martin Bohn
Bohn & Battey, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ELIAS REQUENO
Represented By
Geoffrey Martin Bohn
Bohn & Battey, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JUAN F. RUBIO
Represented By
Geoffrey Martin Bohn
Bohn & Battey, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
NOE PAZ SALINAS
Represented By
Geoffrey Martin Bohn
Bohn & Battey, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
ALBERT E. TAPIA
Represented By
Geoffrey Martin Bohn
Bohn & Battey, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
JOSE ABEL ALVARADO SANCHEZ
Represented By
Geoffrey Martin Bohn
Bohn & Battey, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
CARLOS LIMA, JR.
Represented By
Geoffrey Martin Bohn
Bohn & Battey, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
RONIS E. MENDOZA PEREZ
Represented By
Geoffrey Martin Bohn
Bohn & Battey, PLC
contact info

GPO Apr 14 2022
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying Plaintiffs' 15 Renewed Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/14/22. (lcckk3)

Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, January 22, 2024
38 38 order .Order Mon 01/22 12:33 PM
ORDER dismissing case. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/22/24. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
37 37 notice Notice (Other) Fri 01/19 12:31 PM
NOTICE re Request for Dismissal of First Amended Complaint with Prejudice by JOSE ABEL ALVARADO SANCHEZ, JOSE ANTONIO COREAS, JOSE ELVARADO, PAZ GARCIA, GERMAN GUARDADO, CARLOS LIMA, JR, RONIS E. MENDOZA PEREZ, EFRAIN MARCIA PORTILLO, NARCISO RAMIREZ, ELIAS REQUENO, JUAN F. RUBIO, NOE PAZ SALINAS, ALBERT E. TAPIA (Bohn, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
36 36 19 pgs order Order on Motion for Declaratory Judgment Thu 01/04 5:54 PM
MENORAMDUM OPINION & ORDER granting33 Unopposed Motion for Judgment and Final Approval of Settlement and34 Unopposed Motion for Attorneys Fees, Reimbursement of Expenses, and Incentive Awards to Representative Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/4/24. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
35 35 misc Declaration Fri 11/03 2:19 PM
DECLARATION of Geoffrey M. Bohn, Amended, by JOSE ABEL ALVARADO SANCHEZ, JOSE ANTONIO COREAS, JOSE ELVARADO, PAZ GARCIA, GERMAN GUARDADO, CARLOS LIMA, JR, RONIS E. MENDOZA PEREZ, EFRAIN MARCIA PORTILLO, NARCISO RAMIREZ, ELIAS REQUENO, JUAN F. RUBIO, NOE PAZ SALINAS, ALBERT E. TAPIA re33 Unopposed MOTION for Judgment and Final Approval of Settlement ,34 Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses and Incentive Awards to Representative Plaintiffs . (Bohn, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
minutes Fairness Hearing Fri 11/03 3:08 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly: Fairness Hearing held on 11/3/2023. (Court Reporter Lisa Moreia.) (dot)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 20, 2023
34 34 motion Attorney Fees Fri 10/20 10:35 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Attorney Fees , Reimbursement of Expenses and Incentive Awards to Representative Plaintiffs by JOSE ABEL ALVARADO SANCHEZ, JOSE ANTONIO COREAS, JOSE ELVARADO, PAZ GARCIA, GERMAN GUARDADO, CARLOS LIMA, JR, RONIS E. MENDOZA PEREZ, EFRAIN MARCIA PORTILLO, NARCISO RAMIREZ, ELIAS REQUENO, JUAN F. RUBIO, NOE PAZ SALINAS, ALBERT E. TAPIA.(Bohn, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
33 33 motion Judgment Fri 10/20 10:32 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Judgment and Final Approval of Settlement by JOSE ABEL ALVARADO SANCHEZ, JOSE ANTONIO COREAS, JOSE ELVARADO, PAZ GARCIA, GERMAN GUARDADO, CARLOS LIMA, JR, RONIS E. MENDOZA PEREZ, EFRAIN MARCIA PORTILLO, NARCISO RAMIREZ, ELIAS REQUENO, JUAN F. RUBIO, NOE PAZ SALINAS, ALBERT E. TAPIA.(Bohn, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, October 17, 2023
order .Order Tue 10/17 3:36 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Due to scheduling conflicts, the Court RESCHEDULES the class action fairness hearing set for 11:00 am until 1:30 pm the same day, NOVEMBER 3, 2023, via Zoom videoconference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/17/23. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Wed 10/18 11:30 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Fairness Hearing set for 11/3/2023 at 1:30 PM via Telephonic/VTC before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
32 32 misc Declaration Wed 10/11 3:16 PM
DECLARATION Of Class Counsel Listing All Persons Who Have Served Written Request for Exclusion Or Objection To The Settlement by RONIS E. MENDOZA PEREZ. (Bohn, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 22, 2023
31 31 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 08/22 12:17 PM
ORDER granting30 Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. See Order for more details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 8/22/23. (lcckk3) (Main Document 31 replaced on 8/22/2023) (zdot)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/24 12:37 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Motion for Judgment and Final Approval due by 10/20/2023. Fairness Hearing set for 11/3/2023 at 11:00 AM via Telephonic/VTC before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
30 30 motion Miscellaneous Relief Wed 06/14 5:46 PM
Consent MOTION For Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement by RONIS E. MENDOZA PEREZ.(Bohn, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
Friday, May 26, 2023
order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 05/26 11:07 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the29 Joint Motion for Stay. The parties have been engaged in mediation before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey and "have reached an agreement on the terms of a classwide settlement in this case;" since the last update, the parties "have prepared, and exchanged comments with respect to, a draft settlement agreement and release, as well as a draft motion for preliminary approval of the settlement." They explain that they "seek the Court's indulgence for a few additional weeks so that they can finalize everything for filing on or before June 14, 2023" and that they do not believe they require the continued assistance of Judge Harvey. Accordingly, per the parties' request, the Court GRANTS the29 Motion and ORDERS that this case be stayed until JUNE 14, 2023 and ORDERS that the parties file a Motion for Preliminary Approval of a Class Settlement on or before June 14, 2023. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/26/23. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 05/30 10:13 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Motion for Preliminary Approval of a Class Settlement on or before 6/14/2023. (dot)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 25, 2023
29 29 motion Stay Thu 05/25 12:45 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay in Light of Settlement by ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP..(Bassan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, April 14, 2023
28 28 motion Extension of Time to Fri 04/14 10:28 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Reaching Settlement Agreement by ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP..(Bassan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Fri 04/14 2:04 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the28 Joint Motion for Extension of Time. The parties are engaged in mediation before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey and indicate that since the parties' last update, they "have reached an agreement on the terms of a classwide settlement in this case" and are finalizing paperwork; they therefore request more time for mediation. The Court GRANTS the28 Motion. At the parties' request, the Court AMENDS the22 Order referring the case for mediation to Magistrate Judge Harvey, which has been since amended by previous Minute Orders, to extend the mediation period through MAY 29, 2023. The parties shall file a motion requesting a further extension of the referral or a Joint Status Report, whichever is more appropriate, by no later than MAY 29, 2023. This matter remains STAYED pending the expiration of the referral of mediation before Magistrate Judge Harvey. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/14/23. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 04/17 4:01 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Mediation to conclude by 5/29/2023. (dot)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 28, 2023
27 27 motion Extension of Time to Complete Mediation Tue 02/28 2:00 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation by 45 Days by ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP., FLORENTINO GREGORIO.(Bassan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation Tue 02/28 3:27 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the27 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation. The parties are engaged in mediation before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey and indicate that since the parties' last update, they now "believe they are entering the final stages of settlement negotiations to determine if the gap can be closed and an agreement can be reached," and therefore, they request more time for mediation. The Court GRANTS the27 Motion. At the parties' request, the Court AMENDS the22 Order referring the case for mediation to Magistrate Judge Harvey, which has been since amended by previous Minute Orders, to extend the mediation period through APRIL 14, 2023. The parties shall file a motion requesting a further extension of the referral or a Joint Status Report, whichever is more appropriate, by no later than APRIL 14, 2023. This matter remains STAYED pending the expiration of the referral of mediation before Magistrate Judge Harvey. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/28/23. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 17, 2023
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation Tue 01/17 11:05 AM
The Court is in receipt of the26 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation. The parties are engaged in mediation before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey and indicate that since the parties' last update, they "have continued settlement negotiations and have made further progress," but because "discussions slowed a bit during the holidays," they request more time for mediation. The Court GRANTS the26 Joint Motion. At the parties' request, the Court AMENDS the22 Order referring the case for mediation to Magistrate Judge Harvey, which was previously amended by the Court's Nov. 28, 2022 Minute Order, to extend the referral through FEBRUARY 28, 2023. On or before the expiration of the referral, the Court ORDERS the parties to file either a motion requesting a further extension of the referral or a Joint Status Report, whichever is more appropriate. This matter remains STAYED pending the expiration of the referral of mediation before Magistrate Judge Harvey. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/17/23. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 13, 2023
26 26 motion Extension of Time to Complete Mediation Fri 01/13 2:44 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation to Februrary 28, 2023 by ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP., FLORENTINO GREGORIO.(Bassan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Monday, November 28, 2022
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Complete Mediation Mon 11/28 3:10 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation with Judge G. Michael Harvey by ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP..(Bassan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation Mon 11/28 5:05 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the25 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation. The parties are engaged in mediation before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey and indicate that since the Settlement Conference on October 4, 2022, they "have continued to make significant progress in negotiations" and "expect to continue settlement discussions and the exchange of offers and demands with the continued assistance of Magistrate Judge Harvey." The Court has previously amended the mediation referral, see October 12, 2022 Minute Order, and ordered the parties to either request a further extension or file a Joint Status Report, prompting this25 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Mediation. The Court GRANTS the 25 Joint Motion. At the parties' request, the Court AMENDS the 22 Order referring the case for mediation to Magistrate Judge Harvey to extend the referral through JANUARY 14, 2023. On or before the expiration of the referral, the Court ORDERS the parties to file either a motion requesting a further extension of the referral or a Joint Status Report, whichever is more appropriate. This matter remains STAYED pending the expiration of the referral of mediation before Magistrate Judge Harvey. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 11/28/22. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 28, 2022
minutes Telephone Conference Fri 10/28 12:10 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: Telephone Conference held on 10/28/2022. (MFB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 12, 2022
order .Order Wed 10/12 10:19 AM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the Parties'24 Joint Status Report in which they represent that they remain in mediation before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. The referral to Magistrate Judge Harvey expired October 7, 2022. The Court sua sponte AMENDS the22 Order referring the case for mediation to Magistrate Judge Harvey to extend the referral through NOVEMBER 28, 2022. On or before the expiration of the referral, the Court ORDERS the parties to file either a motion requesting a further extension of the referral or a Joint Status Report, whichever is more appropriate. This matter is STAYED pending the expiration of the referral of mediation before Magistrate Judge Harvey. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 10/12/22. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
24 24 misc Status Report Tue 10/11 1:09 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT RE: SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE by ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP., FLORENTINO GREGORIO. (Bassan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 04, 2022
minutes Settlement Conference Wed 10/05 11:51 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey: Settlement Conference held on 10/4/2022. (MFB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 29, 2022
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 09/29 2:24 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 10/4/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6- In Person before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. (MFB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 27, 2022
order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings Wed 07/27 3:53 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The settlement conference currently set for October 5, 2022, is hereby RESCHEDULED for October 4, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. Settlement Conference set for 10/4/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. A location will be determined at a later date. SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 7/27/22. (MFB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 21, 2022
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 07/21 3:24 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 10/5/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey. A location will be determined at a later date. (MFB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
23 23 order .Order Tue 07/05 12:40 PM
MEDIATION STANDING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey on 7/5/22. (MFB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 30, 2022
22 22 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Thu 06/30 11:10 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE for mediation to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey; vacating ISC and other deadlines in Court's May 11, 2022 minute order; directing parties to file Joint Status Report by OCTOBER 11, 2022. Please see order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 6/30/22. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Tue 07/05 11:36 AM
CASE DIRECTLY REFERRED to Magistrate Judge G. Michael Harvey for mediation from July 5, 2022, through October 7, 2022. (znmg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
21 21 motion Continue Wed 05/11 3:03 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue Initial Scheduling Conference by JOSE ABEL ALVARADO SANCHEZ, JOSE ANTONIO COREAS, JOSE ELVARADO, PAZ GARCIA, GERMAN GUARDADO, CARLOS LIMA, JR, RONIS E. MENDOZA PEREZ, EFRAIN MARCIA PORTILLO, NARCISO RAMIREZ, ELIAS REQUENO, JUAN F. RUBIO, NOE PAZ SALINAS, ALBERT E. TAPIA. (Bohn, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 05/11 10:09 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to the Court's20 Order for Initial Scheduling Conference, the parties were directed to meet and confer at least 21 days prior to the Initial Scheduling Conference scheduled for May 17, 2022 (i.e. by no later than April 26, 2022) and to submit their Local Civil Rule 16.3(c) Joint Statement by no later 14 days following their meet and confer (i.e. by no later than May 10, 2022). As of the date of this Minute Order, the parties have not filed their Joint Statement in accordance with the Court's20 Order.The Court ORDERS that by no later than 5:00 pm on MAY 12, 2022, the parties must either (1) submit their joint statement addressing the topics indicated in the Court's 9 Order; or (2) file an appropriate motion for an extension of time to comply with the Court's20 Order, which the Court shall grant only upon good cause shown. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/11/22. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Continue Wed 05/11 4:06 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of the parties'21 Joint Motion to Extend the Initial Scheduling Conference ("ISC"), in which the parties report that they have agreed to enter into mediation before discovery. The Court GRANTS the parties'21 motion and ORDERS that the ISC currently scheduled for May 17, 2022 is CONTINUED to AUGUST 24, 2022 at 11:00 am by Zoom videoconference. The parties shall file their Joint Statement addressing the topics indicated in LCvR 16.3 and the Court's20 Order by no later than AUGUST 17, 2022. As proposed by the parties, the Court further ORDERS that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before August 1, 2022 updating the Court on the status of mediation and the parties' settlement discussions. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 5/11/22. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/12 10:17 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings: Meet & Confer Statement due by 8/17/2022. Joint Status Report due by 8/1/2022 updating the Court on the status of mediation and the parties' settlement discussions. Initial Scheduling Conference reset for 8/24/2022 at 11:00 AM via Telephonic/VTC before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
20 20 order .Order Thu 04/14 4:17 PM
ORDER FOR INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE on MAY 17, 2022 at 3:00pm by Zoom videoconference. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/14/22. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
19 19 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Thu 04/14 4:15 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER denying Plaintiffs'15 Renewed Motion to Remand to State Court. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 4/14/22. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Thu 04/14 9:16 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/17/2022 at 3:00 PM via Telephonic/VTC before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 25, 2022
18 18 respm Reply to opposition to motion Fri 02/25 4:21 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JOSE ABEL ALVARADO SANCHEZ, JOSE ANTONIO COREAS, JOSE ELVARADO, PAZ GARCIA, GERMAN GUARDADO, CARLOS LIMA, JR, RONIS E. MENDOZA PEREZ, EFRAIN MARCIA PORTILLO, NARCISO RAMIREZ, ELIAS REQUENO, JUAN F. RUBIO, NOE PAZ SALINAS, ALBERT E. TAPIA. (Bohn, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 18, 2022
16 16 7 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Fri 02/18 2:43 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP., FLORENTINO GREGORIO.(Bassan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B.
Thursday, February 17, 2022
17 17 misc Receipt of Superior Court Transfer Documents Fri 02/18 3:38 PM
Receipt on 2/17/2022 of ORIGINAL FILE, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet from Superior Court. Superior Court Number 2019 CA 006118 B.(znmw)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Part 2,
Att: 2 Part 3
Friday, February 11, 2022
15 15 motion Remand to State Court Fri 02/11 3:50 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by JOSE ABEL ALVARADO SANCHEZ, JOSE ANTONIO COREAS, JOSE ELVARADO, PAZ GARCIA, GERMAN GUARDADO, CARLOS LIMA, JR, RONIS E. MENDOZA PEREZ, EFRAIN MARCIA PORTILLO, NARCISO RAMIREZ, ELIAS REQUENO, JUAN F. RUBIO, NOE PAZ SALINAS, ALBERT E. TAPIA.(Bohn, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
order .Order Fri 02/11 4:51 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court ORDERS Defendants to file a response to Plaintiffs'15 Renewed Motion to Remand by no later than FEBRUARY 25, 2022 and Plaintiffs to file a reply by no later than MARCH 4, 2022. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/11/22. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 02/11 9:24 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Defendants' Response to15 due by 2/25/2022. Plaintiffs' Reply to15 due by 3/4/2022. (dot)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 02, 2022
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 02/02 3:23 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice Plaintiffs'11 Motion to Remand to State Court; granting Defendants'13 Motion for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal. Please see Order for details. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/2/2022. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
order .Order Wed 02/02 4:33 PM
MINUTE ORDER. In light of the Court's14 Order denying without prejudice Plaintiffs'11 Motion to Remand, the Court ORDERS that the briefing deadlines on that motion set forth in the Court's January 26, 2022 Minute Order are VACATED. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 2/2/2022. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
13 13 motion Leave to File Document Mon 01/31 6:45 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Notice of Removal to Correct Typographical Error in Paragraph 11 by ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP., FLORENTINO GREGORIO.(Bassan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Wednesday, January 26, 2022
12 12 misc Errata Wed 01/26 3:39 PM
ERRATA Correcting Filing Omission Related to Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' Motion for Remand by JOSE ABEL ALVARADO SANCHEZ, JOSE ANTONIO COREAS, JOSE ELVARADO, PAZ GARCIA, GERMAN GUARDADO, CARLOS LIMA, JR, RONIS E. MENDOZA PEREZ, EFRAIN MARCIA PORTILLO, NARCISO RAMIREZ, ELIAS REQUENO, JUAN F. RUBIO, NOE PAZ SALINAS, ALBERT E. TAPIA re11 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by PAZ GARCIA, JOSE ELVARADO, JOSE ANTONIO COREAS, ALBERT E. TAPIA, CARLOS LIMA, JR., JUAN F. RUBIO, NARCISO RAMIREZ, RONIS E. MENDOZA PEREZ, GERMAN GUARDADO, EFRAIN MARCIA PORTILLO, NOE PAZ SALINAS, JOSE ABEL ALVARADO SANCHEZ, ELIAS REQUENO. (Bohn, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Remand to State Court Wed 01/26 3:00 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by JOSE ABEL ALVARADO SANCHEZ, JOSE ANTONIO COREAS, JOSE ELVARADO, PAZ GARCIA, GERMAN GUARDADO, CARLOS LIMA, JR, RONIS E. MENDOZA PEREZ, EFRAIN MARCIA PORTILLO, NARCISO RAMIREZ, ELIAS REQUENO, JUAN F. RUBIO, NOE PAZ SALINAS, ALBERT E. TAPIA.(Bohn, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order .Order Wed 01/26 4:13 PM
MINUTE ORDER. The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs'11 Motion to Remand to State Court. The Court ORDERS Defendants to file a response to the motion by no later than FEBRUARY 9, 2022 and Plaintiffs to file a reply by no later than FEBRUARY 16, 2022. The Court further VACATES the Initial Scheduling Conference currently scheduled for February 17, 2022 and VACATES the deadlines contained in the Court's7 Order for the parties to meet and confer and file a joint statement. The Court shall set a new ISC date and associated deadlines, if appropriate, upon resolution of the pending11 Motion to Remand. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/26/22. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 25, 2022
10 10 2 pgs notice LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests Tue 01/25 4:54 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP., FLORENTINO GREGORIO (Bassan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
9 9 18 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/25 4:46 PM
Amended ANSWER to Complaint by ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP., FLORENTINO GREGORIO.(Bassan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
8 8 order .Order Wed 01/19 3:35 PM
ORDER ESTABLISHING PROCEDURES FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE COLLEEN KOLLAR-KOTELLY. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/19/22. (DM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 13, 2022
7 7 order .Order Thu 01/13 2:49 PM
ORDER FOR INITIAL SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly on 1/13/22. (lcckk3)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Hearings Fri 01/14 10:20 AM
Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/17/2022 at 2:00 PM via Telephonic/VTC before Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (dot)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
6 6 notice Notice to Counsel/Party Wed 01/12 3:33 PM
NOTICE to Counsel/Party re1 : Notice of Removal. (znmg)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 01/12 3:31 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Colleen Kollar-Kotelly. (znmg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 11, 2022
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/11 3:10 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP., FLORENTINO GREGORIO.(Bassan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 10, 2022
4 4 misc Errata Mon 01/10 3:18 PM
ERRATA Correcting Filing Error by ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP., FLORENTINO GREGORIO re Notice of QC- New Case,,.(Bassan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 01/10 3:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alan S. Block on behalf of ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP., FLORENTINO GREGORIO (Block, Alan)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of QC- New Case Mon 01/10 12:23 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Notice of Removal; emailed to abassan@kiernantrebach.com, cc'd 7 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. No signature. Please file the signed document using the event Errata. All filings must have an original signature or '/s/ Attorney Name' to represent an electronic signature of the filer., 2. The Civil Cover Sheet was not electronically signed., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, )
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
2 2 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 01/07 4:31 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William H. White, Jr on behalf of All Defendants (White, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 05, 2022
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Wed 01/05 3:08 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the District of Columbia, case number 2019 CA 006118 B (Fee Status:Filing Fee Waived) filed by FLORENTINO GREGORIO, ANCHOR CONSTRUCTION CORP..(Bassan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit Original Complaint and Summonses,
Att: 4 Exhibit First Amended Complaint,
Att: 5 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal
misc Payment of Fee - Complaint Wed 01/05 3:12 PM
Payment for1 Notice of Removal,. ($402; Receipt number ADCDC-8961998). (Bassan, Andrew)
Related: [-]