New York Southern District Court
Judge:Jesse M Furman
Case #: 1:22-cv-00098
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jan 05, 2022
Terminated:Jul 11, 2022
Last checked: Monday Jul 04, 2022 5:32 AM EDT
Defendant
El Pillo Inc.
Represented By
Amy Margaret Monahan
L'Abbate Balkan Colavita & Contini
contact info
Defendant
Mochica Group Corp.
Represented By
Amy Margaret Monahan
L'Abbate Balkan Colavita & Contini
contact info
Defendant
Pio Pio 34, Inc.
Represented By
Amy Margaret Monahan
L'Abbate Balkan Colavita & Contini
contact info
Defendant
Pio Pio 85, Inc.
Represented By
Amy Margaret Monahan
L'Abbate Balkan Colavita & Contini
contact info
Defendant
Pio Pio Express, Inc.
Represented By
Amy Margaret Monahan
L'Abbate Balkan Colavita & Contini
contact info
Defendant
Pio Pio NYC, Inc.
Represented By
Amy Margaret Monahan
L'Abbate Balkan Colavita & Contini
contact info
Defendant
Pio Pio Ocho, Inc.
Represented By
Amy Margaret Monahan
L'Abbate Balkan Colavita & Contini
contact info
Defendant
Pio-Pio Restaurant, Inc.
Represented By
Amy Margaret Monahan
L'Abbate Balkan Colavita & Contini
contact info
Defendant
Pollos A La Brasa Pio, Pio, Inc.
Represented By
Amy Margaret Monahan
L'Abbate Balkan Colavita & Contini
contact info
Defendant
Sipan Restaurant of New York, Inc.
Represented By
Amy Margaret Monahan
L'Abbate Balkan Colavita & Contini
contact info
Defendant
Augusto Yallico
Represented By
Amy Margaret Monahan
L'Abbate Balkan Colavita & Contini
contact info
Defendant
Ines Yallico
Represented By
Amy Margaret Monahan
L'Abbate Balkan Colavita & Contini
contact info
Plaintiff
Ciro Mendoza Olmero
Represented By
C.K. Lee
Lee Litigation Group, PLLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Pio Pio Brooklyn Inc.
Terminated: 01/20/2022


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, July 18, 2022
55 55 misc Satisfaction of Judgment Mon 07/18 9:44 AM
SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT re:53 Judgment entered In favor of Ciro Mendoz Olmero Against Mochica Group Corp., In favor of Ciro Mendoza Olmero Against Ines Yallico, In favor of Ciro Mendoza Olmero Against Augusto Yallico, In favor of Ciro Mendoza Olmero Against Sipan Restaurant of New York, Inc., In favor of Ciro Mendoza Olmero Against El Pillo Inc., In favor of Ciro Mendoza Olmero Against Pollos A La Brasa Pio, Pio, Inc., In favor of Ciro Mendoza Olmero Against Pio Pio 34, Inc., In favor of Ciro Mendoza Olmero Against Pio-Pio Restaurant, Inc., In favor of Ciro Mendoza Olmero Against Pio Pio Ocho, Inc., In favor of Ciro Mendoza Olmero Against Pio Pio NYC, Inc., In favor of Ciro Mendoza Olmero Against Pio Pio Express, Inc., In favor of Ciro Mendoza Olmero Against Pio Pio 85, Inc. in the amount of $75,000.00. Judgment satisfied on 7/14/2022.(km)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 15, 2022
54 54 misc Proposed Satisfaction of Judgment Fri 07/15 4:51 PM
PROPOSED FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT. Satisfaction of Judgment to be Mailed by the Court. Document filed by Ciro Mendoza Olmero..(Lee, C.K.) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
53 53 order Judgment Mon 07/11 3:28 PM
RULE 68 JUDGMENT. It is ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED, that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff CIRO MENDOZA OLMERO, in the sum of Seventy-Five Thousand Dollars and No Cents ($75,000.00), in accordance with the terms and conditions of Defendants' Rule 68 Offer dated July 8, 2022 and filed as Exhibit A to Docket Number 51. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. All conferences are cancelled. All motions are moot. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 7/11/22) (yv)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment Mon 07/11 8:55 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF ACCEPTANCE WITH OFFER OF JUDGMENT. Document No. 51 Notice of Acceptance with Offer of Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Court Regarding Proposed Order Mon 07/11 8:55 AM
***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED JUDGMENT. Document No. 52 Proposed Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
Related: [-]