Cash v. Durant, City of et al
Oklahoma Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | John F Heil, III |
Referred: | Jason A Robertson |
Case #: | 6:22-cv-00009 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2022 |
Re-opened: | Dec 13, 2022 |
Terminated: | May 02, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 05, 2022 3:52 AM CDT |
Defendant
Bryan County Board of County Commissioners
|
|
Defendant
Chris Cicio
|
|
Defendant
Durant, City of
|
|
Defendant
Timothy McEachern
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Officers
|
|
Plaintiff
Michael Lynn Cash
09304-078 Tucson Federal Correctional Institution Inmate Mail/Parcels PO Box 24550
Tucson, AZ 85734 |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
52 | 52
appeal
USCA Notice of Docketing ROA
Tue 04/02 8:33 AM
USCA Notice of Docketing Supplemental Record on Appeal in USCA Case Number 23-7033 (rak, Deputy Clerk) |