Ratulowski v. PNC Bank, N.A.
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip P Simon |
Referred: | Andrew P Rodovich |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00004 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 07, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 06, 2022 4:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
PNC Bank, N. A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vincent I Ratulowski
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/11/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 06, 2024 | ||
100 | 100
minutes
Status Conference ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings Order on Motion to Continue
Fri 09/06 1:14 PM
TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 9/6/2024, before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Pla appeared by atty Jason M Frank PHV. Dft appeared by atty Thomas V Panoff. The Court GRANTS99 Motion to Continue for third party defendants to file their appearance in this matter. Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/1/2024 10:00 AM Central Time before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Parties are instructed to dial 833-568-8864, enter Meeting ID 161 6723 3388 and passcode 649671 when prompted to join the conference. (jdb) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
99 | 99
motion
Continue
Wed 09/04 5:51 PM
Joint MOTION to Continue September 6, 2024 Status Conference by Plaintiff Vincent I Ratulowski. (Sims PHV, Scott) |
|
98 | 98
service
Summons Returned Executed
Wed 09/04 10:24 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed (per DE96 and97 ) by PNC Bank, N. A.. Customer Service Center, Inc. served on 8/30/2024, answer due 9/20/2024; Garber Highland, Inc. d/b/a Garber Chevrolet of Highland served on 8/30/2024, answer due 9/20/2024. (sej) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
97 | 97
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 09/03 11:19 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint with Exhibits served on Customer Service Center, Inc. on 08/30/2024, filed by PNC Bank, N. A.. (Panoff, Thomas) |
|
96 | 96
service
Affidavit of Service
Tue 09/03 11:17 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint with Exhibits served on Garber Highland Inc. d/b/a Garber Chevrolet of Highland on 08/30/2024, filed by PNC Bank, N. A.. (Panoff, Thomas) |