Ratulowski v. PNC Bank, N.A.
Indiana Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Philip P Simon |
Referred: | Andrew P Rodovich |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00004 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Jan 07, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 06, 2022 4:26 AM EDT |
Defendant
PNC Bank, N. A.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Vincent I Ratulowski
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
91 | 91
25
pgs
order
Opinion and Order ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 07/30 10:35 AM
OPINION AND ORDER: PNC's Motion to Dismiss Counts II-IV of Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint61 is GRANTED, and Counts II-IV are DISMISSED for failure to state a claim on which relief may be granted. PNC's Motion to Strike Class Allegations from Plaintiff's Second Amended Class Action Complaint63 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 7/29/2024. (ash) |
|
Monday, July 22, 2024 | ||
90 | 90
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings 1 - Terminate Hearings
Mon 07/22 4:22 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/23/2024 09:30 AM Central Time is now RESET to 9/6/2024 10:00 AM Central time before Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich. Parties are instructed to dial 833-568-8864, enter Meeting ID 161 6723 3388 and passcode 649671 when prompted to join the conference. By Magistrate Judge Andrew P Rodovich on 07/22/2024. Text entry order. (jdb) |