Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Referred: Derek T Gilliland
Case #: 6:22-cv-00025
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jan 07, 2022
Terminated:Nov 16, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 06, 2022 3:38 AM CDT
Defendant
WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O.
Represented By
Julia S. Choe
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
contact info
Tigran Guledjian
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Michael T. Zeller
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Evan Zachary Pearson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
contact info
Scott Florance
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Sean Damon
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Defendant
WGCZ Holding
Represented By
Julia S. Choe
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
contact info
Tigran Guledjian
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Michael T. Zeller
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Evan Zachary Pearson
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan
contact info
Scott Florance
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Sean Damon
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Preservation Technologies LLC
Represented By
Michael French
Dinovo Price LLP
contact info
Adam G. Price
Dinovo Price LLP
contact info
Nicole E. Glauser
Dinovo Price LLP
contact info
Daniel L. Schmid
Carter Arnett PLLC
contact info
Andrew G. DiNovo
Dinovo Price LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 25, 2023
40 40 1 pgs order Order Thu 05/25 2:49 PM
ORDER re38 Stipulation filed by WebGroup Czech Republic, a.s., Webprocessing s.r.o.,, Bridgemaze Partners s.r.o.,, NKL Associates s.r.o., WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O., WGCZ Holding. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 17, 2022
39 39 misc Report on Patent/Trademark (AO-120) Thu 11/17 2:20 PM
Report on Patent/Trademark sent to U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (bot2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 16, 2022
38 38 misc Stipulation Wed 11/16 7:42 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Bridgemaze Partners s.r.o.,, NKL Associates s.r.o., WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O., WebGroup Czech Republic, a.s., Webprocessing s.r.o.,.(Pearson, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, October 07, 2022
37 37 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 10/11 9:09 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Derek T. Gilliland. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. Referral Magistrate Judge: Derek T. Gilliland. (bot4)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 16, 2022
misc Remark (No Doc#) Sat 09/17 8:51 PM
Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated[LINK:standing orders] available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows: 1. [LINK:Standing Order Governing Proceedings Patent Cases] , 2. [LINK:Amended Standing Order On Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases] . (bot4)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 13, 2022
36 36 motion Dismiss Tue 09/13 11:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint for Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by Bridgemaze Partners s.r.o.,, NKL Associates s.r.o., WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O., WebGroup Czech Republic, a.s., Webprocessing s.r.o.,.(Pearson, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Seifert Declaration
Tuesday, September 06, 2022
35 35 notice Notice Tue 09/06 8:06 PM
NOTICE to Extend Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Responsive Pleading to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint by Bridgemaze Partners s.r.o.,, NKL Associates s.r.o., WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O., WebGroup Czech Republic, a.s., Webprocessing s.r.o., (Pearson, Evan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 16, 2022
34 34 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order Tue 08/16 11:12 AM
ORDER GRANTING33 Motion for Entry of Scheduling Order. Markman Hearing set for 4/3/2023 09:00 AM before Judge Alan D Albright, Joinder of Parties due by 5/15/2023, Amended Pleadings due by 7/24/2023, Dispositive/Daubert Motions due by 1/8/2024, Pretrial Conference set for 3/11/2024 before Judge Alan D Albright, Jury Selection set for 4/1/2024 before Judge Jeffrey C. Manske, Jury Trial set for 4/1/2024 before Judge Alan D Albright, Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 15, 2022
33 33 motion Entry of Scheduling Order Mon 08/15 6:49 PM
Joint MOTION for Entry of Scheduling Order Deadlines by Bridgemaze Partners s.r.o.,, NKL Associates s.r.o., WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O., WebGroup Czech Republic, a.s., Webprocessing s.r.o.,. (Pearson, Evan)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 01, 2022
32 32 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 08/01 9:59 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants amending1 Complaint,., filed by Preservation Technologies LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9
Monday, July 25, 2022
31 31 notice Notice Mon 07/25 8:56 PM
NOTICE Unopposed Notice of Filing of Amended Complaint in Response by Preservation Technologies LLC re28 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Based on Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue (DiNovo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 19, 2022
30 30 misc Status Report Tue 07/19 12:38 PM
STATUS REPORT Case Readiness Status Report by Preservation Technologies LLC. (DiNovo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 18, 2022
29 29 misc Status Report Mon 07/18 11:46 PM
STATUS REPORT by WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O.. (Pearson, Evan)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 11, 2022
28 28 motion Dismiss Mon 07/11 10:00 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint Based on Lack of Jurisdiction and Improper Venue by WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O..(Pearson, Evan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Seifert Declaration
27 27 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Mon 07/11 9:47 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O.. (Pearson, Evan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/01 2:46 PM
ORDER GRANTING25 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Scott Florance. Attorney added for WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District . Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 29, 2022
25 25 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 06/29 1:56 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Evan Zachary Pearson on behalf of Scott Florance ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16198437) by on behalf of WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O.. (Pearson, Evan) (Main Document 25 replaced on 6/29/2022) (lad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/28 12:26 PM
ORDER GRANTING23 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tigran Guledjian for WGCZ Holding and WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (lad)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 20, 2022
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/20 5:59 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Evan Zachary Pearson on behalf of Tigran Guledjian ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16160937) by on behalf of WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O.. (Pearson, Evan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
22 22 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 06/16 1:33 PM
ORDER GRANTING21 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael T. Zeller. Attorney added for WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District . Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Thu 06/16 2:46 PM
Text Order GRANTING20 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney entered by Judge Alan D Albright. It is therefore ORDERED that Daniel L. Schmid shall be withdrawn as counsel of record for Plaintiff. It is further ORDERED that Mr. Schmid be removed from the official service list in this case. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (PTlc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 14, 2022
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/14 3:03 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Evan Zachary Pearson on behalf of Michael Zeller ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16140260) by on behalf of WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O.. (Pearson, Evan)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Withdraw As Attorney Tue 06/14 2:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Preservation Technologies LLC.(Schmid, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/14 2:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Michael French. Attorney added for Preservation Technologies LLC. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District . Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
Related: [-]
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/14 2:18 PM
ORDER GRANTING14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Julia S. Choe. Attorney added for WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District . Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
Related: [-]
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 06/14 2:17 PM
ORDER GRANTING13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sean Damon. Attorney added for WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order, if he/she has not previously done so for a prior case in this District . Signed by Judge Alan D Albright. (bot1)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 06/14 11:10 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole E. Glauser on behalf of Preservation Technologies LLC. Attorney Nicole E. Glauser added to party Preservation Technologies LLC(pty:pla) (Glauser, Nicole)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 13, 2022
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/13 4:15 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Michael French ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16135487) by on behalf of Preservation Technologies LLC. (French, Michael)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/13 2:11 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Evan Zachary Pearson on behalf of Julia S. Choe ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16134262) by on behalf of WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O.. (Pearson, Evan) (Main Document 14 replaced on 6/13/2022) (lad)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/13 2:00 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Evan Zachary Pearson on behalf of Sean Damon ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number 0542-16134183) by on behalf of WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O.. (Pearson, Evan) (Main Document 13 replaced on 6/13/2022) (lad)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice Mon 06/13 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Extension of Time to File a Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O. (Pearson, Evan)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 06/13 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Evan Zachary Pearson on behalf of WGCZ Holding, WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O. (Pearson, Evan)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 06/13 3:08 PM
Reset Deadlines: WGCZ Holding and WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O. answer due 7/11/2022. (lad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 14, 2022
10 10 18 pgs order Order Thu 04/14 8:26 PM
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 06, 2022
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/06 12:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Preservation Technologies LLC as to WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O.. Waiver sent on 3/20/2022, answer due 6/20/2022. (DiNovo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 04/06 12:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Preservation Technologies LLC as to WGCZ Holding. Waiver sent on 3/20/2022, answer due 6/20/2022. (DiNovo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
misc Remark (No Doc#) Thu 03/10 4:30 PM
Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated[LINK:standing orders] and[LINK:COVID-19 standing order] available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows: 1. [LINK:Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722] , 2. [LINK:Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722] , 3. [LINK:Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722] , 4. [LINK:Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings] , 5. [LINK:Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722] , 6. [LINK:Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722] . (jkda)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
7 7 service Summons Issued Fri 01/07 4:19 PM
Summons Issued as to WGCZ Holding, as. (lad)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 01/07 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Daniel L. Schmid on behalf of Preservation Technologies LLC (Schmid, Daniel)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 01/07 4:18 PM
Summons Issued as to WGCZ Ltd., S.R.O.. (lad)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 01/07 4:14 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Adam G. Price on behalf of Preservation Technologies LLC. Attorney Adam G. Price added to party Preservation Technologies LLC(pty:pla) (Price, Adam)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 01/07 4:10 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Preservation Technologies LLC. (DiNovo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 01/07 4:06 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (DiNovo, Andrew) (Main Document 2 replaced on 1/7/2022) (lad)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 01/07 3:59 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15593949), filed by Preservation Technologies LLC.(DiNovo, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 01/07 4:20 PM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (lad)
Related: [-]
misc Remark (No Doc#) Fri 01/07 5:02 PM
All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad)
Related: [-]