Ager et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00028 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1442 Notice of Removal |
Case Filed: | Jan 04, 2022 |
Case in other court: | New York Southern, 1:21-cv-10559 |
Last checked: Sunday Jul 03, 2022 5:10 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
as successor in interest to Ciba Inc. 100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
as successor in interest to Sandoz Chemical Corporation 4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-20
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
as successor in interest to DuPont Chemical Solutions Enterprise 1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products, LP
|
|
Plaintiff
John Ager
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerry Antoine
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Elizabeth Arflin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joella Armstrong-Hudson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Atkins
5 Novatak Court
Greenville, SC 29605 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Babcock
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Benfante
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Berman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mickey Beyuka Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jerome Boykin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Bracey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Brinkley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian Brooke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Brophy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dale Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Brunson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laron Buggs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Donald Burnett
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Burnett Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Burton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Efrem Burton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Bushouse
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Byrne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charlene Cardova
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Castro
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Daryl Colbert
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eugene Cooter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Coughlin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kelsie Curry
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nancy Joy Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alton Douglas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Dossey Douglas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Glen Dunham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Laura Fernandez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jessica Fife
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Timothy Flowers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
George Franklin Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Steven Garrison
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Charles Grubbs
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
William Hall
Lieber Correctional Institution PO Box 205
Ridgeville, SC 29472 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tammy Hansen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Henderson
Surety for Ernest Jeter 300 Perrin Avenue
Union, SC 29379 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randy Holbrook
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lisa Holman
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Markham Hotze
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Ingram
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Loren Irons
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Jackson
1003 Chinquapin Rd
Greenwood, SC 29646 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tony Johnson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jamie Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Judge
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Stephen Keithline
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Iven Kennedy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gary Alan Kimber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Koskol
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Abenayaa Lane
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Larocco
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Perry Lee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tobey Leonard
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Larry Locklear
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Long
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Amanda Lopez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Madron
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frank Mareno
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kevin Marlborough
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wilburn McCoy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John McDonald
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert McGinnis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Doris Mercer
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Mercogliano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Scott Mobley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Victor Obey
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Nolverto Ojeda
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jeremy Orton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bruce Parks
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Paul Payne
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Beverly Pettit
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Phillips
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melvin Pope
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronald Pucciarelli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mark Ramirez
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lester Ranck
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Rea
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Leonard Reuter
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Michael Richards
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Myra Rivera
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Derrik Roberts
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lieutenant James Robinson
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Francisco Rom
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Juan Cruz Rosa
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 09/09 5:41 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Charles Manuel, Brett Trommler, John McDaniel, James Murray, Robert Newton, Tiffany Kibler, William King, Elois Lockhart, Drew Martin, Bridget Megela, Cynthia Nichols, Booker Nuckles, Ronald Owens, Kelly Price, Robert Redmond, James Rushing, John Schommer, James Rhodes, Maggie Rolls, Bryan Smith, Leodies Wilkins, Rene Zayas, David Atkins, Mickey Beyuka Jr., Lisa Holman, Duane Smiley, Jeffrey Allen, Simmie Ash, Danny Barrows Notice Of Partial Dismissal By Listed Plaintiffs Only, Of Particular Personal Injury Claims, Without Prejudice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41(A)(1)(A)(I) & Second Amended Case Management Order No. 28Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/22 10:11 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Wilburn McCoy, Robert McGinnis, James Mercogliano, Scott Mobley, Beverly Pettit, Michael Phillips, Melvin Pope, Ronald Pucciarelli, Thomas Rea, Leonard Reuter, Francisco Rom, John Aksterowicz, Philip Ciambriello, Dennis Bakka, Donald Forsyth, Terry Ferrill, Michael Francesconi, Thomas Fuller, Garry Dewrell, Ernest Gentile, Jon Gibson, Frederick Giordani, John Girard, Edward Golden, Richard Gould, Donald Gwynne, Harry J. Hemphill, Richard Hooper, James Csizmadia, Jon Depaolo, Allen Legatzke, Christopher Mailloux, Stephen Mikolajcik, James Norris, Anthony Poppalardo, Randy Slack, Robert Collins, Ronald McKnight, Leonard Simons, Joseph Singleton, Reginald Smith, Kathryn Spindle, Anthony Stallings, Vicki Tindall, Terry Wedgeworth, Ronald White, Frank Williams, Buddy Wolfe, Robert Woods Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00028-RMG, 2:22-cv-00029-RMG, 2:22-cv-00030-RMG, 2:22-cv-00031-RMG(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/20 5:59 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Burton, John Byrne, Kelsie Curry, Jessica Fife, Timothy Flowers, George Franklin Jr., Charles Grubbs, William Hall, Michael Henderson, Kenneth Koskol, Mark Madron, Frank Mareno, Jesse Abrams, Joseph Alosi, Todd Baran, Patricia Britt, Larry Brown, Mike Bueno Jr, Tony Carver, Gerald Crump, Ansel Everett, Joan Fludd, Robert Frost, Melvin Gilbert, Debra Gonzalez, Mark Greenberg, Louis Gutierrez, Retina Hale, Todd Hines, Charles Hunt Jr., Roger Lanning, Robert Lockridge, Samantha Martin, Colleen O'Connell, Frankie Pagan, Timmie Perdue Jr., Darrell Peterson, Marc Reyes, Kayla Parrish, Brian Polkinghorne, Christine Pollakis, Jay T. Potter, Darrell Rainwater, Donald Reese, Joseph Relaford, Nathan Saine, Charles Sawhill, Marshall W. Simmons, AJ Stabler, Michelle Wegner Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice As to Personal Injury Claims OnlyAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00025-RMG, 2:22-cv-00027-RMG, 2:22-cv-00028-RMG(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Mon 08/12 1:44 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jerry Antoine without prejudice, as to plaintiffs Antoine, Jerry C., Scharmen, Roger, Blair, Joseph, Rice, Thomas Matthew, Prush, John, Blevins, Karen, Broussard, Kerri, Byrd, Ray, Cox, Timothy, Dawson, Larry, Dudley, DirkAssociated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Mindicino, Nicholas) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Thursday, May 30, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 05/30 1:30 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mark Ramirez Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00028-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 02/20 5:10 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Kevin Marlborough Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00028-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 02/20 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Stephen Brinkley Without Prejudice Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00028-RMG(Lanciotti, Patrick) |
|
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
order
ICMS - converted docket entry Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Order on Motion to Reopen Case
Fri 05/05 7:33 PM
ORDER This Document Relates to: The Plaintiffs' motion is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART (Dkt. No. 2914 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; (15) in case 2:22-cv-00017-RMG; (14) in case 2:22-cv-00019-RMG; (15) in case 2:22-cv-00020-RMG; (19) in case 2:22-cv-00021-RMG; (14) in case 2:22-cv-00022-RMG; (14) in case 2:22-cv-00023-RMG; (15) in case 2:22-cv-00024-RMG; (14) in case 2:22-cv-00025-RMG; (10) in case 2:22-cv-00027-RMG; (11) in case 2:22-cv-00028-RMG; (12) in case 2:22-cv-00029-RMG; (10) in case 2:22-cv-00030-RMG; (16) in case 2:22-cv-00031-RMG; (10) in case 2:22-cv-00032-RMG; (15) in case 2:22-cv-00038-RMG; (10) in case 2:22-cv-00307-RMG; (8) in case 2:22-cv-00705-RMG; (6) in case 2:22-cv-00912-RMG; (15) in case 2:22-cv-01285-RMG; (13) in case 2:22-cv-01286-RMG; (11) in case 2:22-cv-01287-RMG; (13) in case 2:22-cv-01288-RMG; (12) in case 2:22-cv-01575-RMG; (10) in case 2:22-cv-01611-RMG; (6) in case 2:22-cv-01696-RMG; (13) in case 2:22-cv-01792-RMG; (14) in case 2:22-cv-01930-RMG; (12) in case 2:22-cv-02231-RMG; (12) in case 2:22-cv-02475-RMG; (11) in case 2:22-cv-02476-RMG; (15) in case 2:22-cv-02477-RMG; (17) in case 2:22-cv-02478-RMG; (10) in case 2:22-cv-02479-RMG) as detailed herein the Order. The Court grants in part and denies in part Plaintiffs' motion. The motion is denied as to the 421 plaintiffs listed at (Dkt. No. 2946-1) who have either failed to provide a PFS or have provided incomplete PFS. The motion is otherwise granted. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/5/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 11, 2023 | ||
14 | 14
4
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Seal Document
Tue 04/11 1:43 PM
ORDER This Order Relates to: Defendants' motion to seal (Dkt. No. 2947 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 17 in 2:22-cv-00017-RMG, 16 in 2:22-cv-00019-RMG, 17 in 2:22-cv-00020-RMG, 21 in 2:22-cv-00021-RMG, 16 in 2:22-cv-00022-RMG, 16 in 2:22-cv-00023-RMG, 17 in 2:22-cv-00024-RMG, 16 in 2:22-cv-00025-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-00027-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-00028-RMG, 14 in 2:22-cv-00029-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-00030-RMG, 18 in 2:22-cv-00031-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-00032-RMG, 17 in 2:22-cv-00038-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-00303-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-00305-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-00307-RMG, 10 in 2:22-cv-00705-RMG, 8 in 2:22-cv-00912-RMG, 17 in 2:22-cv-01285-RMG, 15 in 2:22-cv-01286-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-01287-RMG, 15 in 2:22-cv-01288-RMG, 14 in 2:22-cv-01575-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-01611-RMG, 8 in 2:22-cv-01696-RMG, 15 in 2:22-cv-01792-RMG, 16 in 2:22-cv-01930-RMG, 14 in 2:22-cv-02231-RMG, 14 in 2:22-cv-02475-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-02476-RMG, 17 in 2:22-cv-02477-RMG, 19 in 2:22-cv-02478-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-02479-RMG)) is GRANTED. Defendants are directed to file on the docket, under seal, an unredacted version of their motion with accompanying exhibits. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 4/11/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Tuesday, April 04, 2023 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Seal Document
Tue 04/04 5:45 PM
MOTION to Seal Document (2946 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG) Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,,,,, by Defendants. Response to Motion due by 4/18/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Non-Confidential Descriptive Index of Documents, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Compliance, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Placeholder Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Proposed Order | ||
12 | 12
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Tue 04/04 5:14 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re (6 in 2:22-cv-00912-RMG, 11 in 2:22-cv-00307-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-01286-RMG, 14 in 2:22-cv-00023-RMG, 19 in 2:22-cv-00021-RMG, 6 in 2:22-cv-01696-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-01575-RMG, 14 in 2:22-cv-00022-RMG, 16 in 2:22-cv-00031-RMG, 10 in 2:22-cv-00030-RMG, 10 in 2:22-cv-00032-RMG, 11 in 2:22-cv-01287-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-01792-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-02475-RMG, 11 in 2:22-cv-02476-RMG, 17 in 2:22-cv-02478-RMG, 11 in 2:22-cv-00028-RMG, 15 in 2:22-cv-00038-RMG, 10 in 2:22-cv-00303-RMG, 10 in 2:22-cv-00305-RMG, 8 in 2:22-cv-00705-RMG, 14 in 2:22-cv-01930-RMG, 10 in 2:22-cv-01611-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-00029-RMG, 15 in 2:22-cv-00024-RMG, 10 in 2:22-cv-02479-RMG, 15 in 2:22-cv-02477-RMG, 15 in 2:22-cv-00017-RMG, 10 in 2:22-cv-00027-RMG, 2914 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 14 in 2:22-cv-00019-RMG, 15 in 2:22-cv-00020-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-02231-RMG, 14 in 2:22-cv-00025-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-01288-RMG, 15 in 2:22-cv-01285-RMG) MOTION to Reopen Case , (8 in 2:22-cv-00027-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-00022-RMG, 8 in 2:22-cv-01611-RMG, 11 in 2:22-cv-01288-RMG, 9 in 2:22-cv-01287-RMG, 10 in 2:22-cv-00029-RMG, 4 in 2:22-cv-01696-RMG, 11 in 2:22-cv-01286-RMG, 9 in 2:22-cv-00307-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-01930-RMG, 9 in 2:22-cv-00028-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-01285-RMG, 10 in 2:22-cv-02475-RMG, 10 in 2:22-cv-02231-RMG, 9 in 2:22-cv-02476-RMG, 11 in 2:22-cv-01792-RMG, 4 in 2:22-cv-00912-RMG, 8 in 2:22-cv-00303-RMG, 8 in 2:22-cv-00030-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-00024-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-00019-RMG, 8 in 2:22-cv-00305-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-00023-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-00017-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-00020-RMG, 8 in 2:22-cv-00032-RMG, 10 in 2:22-cv-01575-RMG, 8 in 2:22-cv-02479-RMG, 12 in 2:22-cv-00025-RMG, 14 in 2:22-cv-00031-RMG, 2876 in 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 17 in 2:22-cv-00021-RMG, 15 in 2:22-cv-02478-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-00038-RMG, 13 in 2:22-cv-02477-RMG, 6 in 2:22-cv-00705-RMG) MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Serve Plaintiff Fact Sheets Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Motion to Reinstate Claims Response filed by Defendants.Reply to Response to Motion due by 4/11/2023 Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Who Failed to Provide Completed PFS, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Confidential Slip Sheet | ||
Tuesday, March 21, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Reopen Case
Tue 03/21 9:32 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by Rudolph Gasper Jr., Stephen Guevara, Cleveland McGuire, Annmarie Weimer, Donald Young, John Aksterowicz, Paul Byrne, Amy Coman, Michael Francesconi, Garry Dewrell, Richard Gillenwaters, Edward Golden, Thomas Greco, Matthew Majcherek, Joseph Rigney Sr., James Tibbs, Jan Walker, Randall L. Ware, Richard Wratchford, Joseph Blair, Robert Collins, Joseph Esposito, John Lucas, Thomas Smith, Amber Wiseman, William Rice, Kerwin Scott, Sr, Jody Thompson, Jerry Antoine, Elizabeth Arflin, David Atkins, Jerome Boykin, Stephen Brinkley, Dale Brown, Laron Buggs, Donald Burnett, David Burton, Efrem Burton, John Byrne, Charlene Cardova, Victor Castro, Daryl Colbert, Eugene Cooter, Nancy Joy Davis, Glen Dunham, Laura Fernandez, Timothy Flowers, George Franklin Jr., Charles Grubbs, William Hall, Tammy Hansen, Michael Ingram, David Jackson, Richard Judge, Stephen Keithline, Iven Kennedy, Kenneth Koskol, Abenayaa Lane, Tobey Leonard, Larry Locklear, Amanda Lopez, Mark Madron, Kevin Marlborough, John McDonald, Robert McGinnis, Doris Mercer, Victor Obey, Jeremy Orton, Paul Payne, Melvin Pope, Mark Ramirez, Michael Richards, James Robinson, Lewis Wilkins Jr, Lawana Williams, Jerry Auffet, Calvin Blythe, Patrick Brooking, Jorge Diaz Burgos, Vincent Carr, Nicholas Centenaro, Charles Collins, Jr., Joseph Corcoran, Timothy Duke, Willie Fairman, Gerald Forstater, John Grant, John Jones, Abraham Laners, Dennis Lodge, James Martin, Tracey Mobley, Thomas Nye, George Ogeron, Sr., Richard Pesotski, Timothy Allen Reddin, Michael Redecker, Angel Rodriguez, Gary Sallinger, Glenn Staley, Conrad Stutzman, Paul Tolbert, Robery Turney, Earl Waddell, Derrick Wiley, Jeffrey Allen, Kenneth Allen, Kyle Amburgey, Simmie Ash, Lisa Autry, Kerry Barnes, Danny Barrows, Kimberly Bennett, Andrew Best, Brian Blake, Karen Blevins, James Brooks, Kerri Broussard, Christopher Brown, Tony K Burgess, Charles S Burgin, Ray Byrd, Elton Calloway, John Ceballos, Howell Chiafson, Greggory Clark, Gary Clements, Linda Cochran, Paul Corley, Timothy Cox, Larry Dawson, Dirk Dudley, Neil B Dunson, Adonai Duran, Jeffery Ervin, Robert C Farmer, Julie Fielding, Roger Fields, Arthur Figard, Demille Garland, Dante Gonzalez, Catherine Groff, Christene Harris, David Henry, Toni Higgins, William Hockaday, Gary Horn, Alice Huber, Howard Jackson Jr., Lionell Johnson, Debra Jones, Loretta Jones, Keith Knox, Kevin Koontz, Dale Lam-Beddard, Tim Lintelman, Joseph Long, Alexander Lopez, Julian Mallory, Kenneth Martin, James Masterson, James D McIntosh, Pamela Meloy, Gary Mendoza, Neal Henry Mihelich, Sandra Minozzi, Ransom Moore, Cathy Neher, Kathy Neher, Richard Neher, Odes Newton, Clarence Norman Jr., Dorla Padilla, Benjamin Parks, Robert Pritchett, Diane Redd, Glasgow Rex, Carolyn Richardson, Paul Rigsby, Bobby Robertson, Mitchell Robicheaux, Michael Sanico, Sarah Sanson, Gary Wensink, Benjamin P Sanchez, Roger Scharmen, Vincent Serna, Darryl Signater, Leonard Simons, Joseph Singleton, Reginald Smith, Anthony Stallings, Karen Stewart, Jason Stuckey, Libiann Bowen Tangreen, Michael Thomas, Tracy Tiberio, Jonathan Timmons, Gilbert Turner, Robert Wanmer, Freddie Wehrmann, Ronald White, Frank Williams, Eddie Williams Jr, Robert Woods, Larry Young, Aaron Bailey, Elizabeth Bennett, Catherine Callahan, Phillip Cobb, Davie Embry, Nicholas Farro, Edward Hatfield, Patrick Jarman, Destry Sharp, James Shea, James Shelton, Randy Simon, Ernest Smith, Larry Stamper, Gerard Talmadge, Bernal Thompson, Winston Varnado, James Vickery, Peter Voisin, Timothy Wanke, Dixie White, Dolores White, Roy Wiliiams, Gary J Willard Jr., Deborah Winborne, Thomas Wolf, Glenn Worley, Ervin Wright, David Jett, Jason Meadows, Katy Brezinski, Joan Campbell, Richard Campbell, Mike Desotell, Steve Dixon, Dustin Dreifuerst, Ken Hanzel, Donna Kies, James Lemay, Mary Lemay, Gerald Lowis, Mark Marineau, Danielle Niemojuski, Bailie Plotz, Carrie Plotz, Christina Reek, Steven Reek, Dave Roland, Paul Wood, Richard Aughe, Melvin Gilbert, Debra Gonzalez, Mark Greenberg, Michael Lane, Elvia Collart, Diane Delfini, Curlie Dillard, Mark Jones, Angel Majano, Angely Majano, Jim Blue Sr., Robert Darling, David Pappas, Brian Polkinghorne, Lisa Scroggins, Edwin Waters, Donald Lewis, Billy J. Martin, Booker Nuckles, Tanya Parr, Ray Runnels, Darryl Smith, Eddie Burrow, Carl Frazier, Raymond Gilbert, Willie Goins, Henry Green, Stanley Huff, Byron Johnson, Mary Johnson, Robert Kelly, Marvin King, Paul Kuykendall, Ralph Maston, Cleveland McGuaire, Patricia Morgan, Mary Morris, Nicholas Pellegrino, Charles Powell, Brian Sanders, Alayne Smith, Robert Syphax, Edward O Thacker, Michael Vincent, Oscar Wooden, William Young, Thomas Anderson, George Bruser, Ronnie Caver, George Clarke, Angelica Courtney, Ervie Davis Jr., Richard Driscoll, Christopher Fields, Dustin Chudalla, Jeffrey Evans, Jerry Gould, Frank Saumty, Billy Schaff, Edwin Apgar, Earl Crawford, Pierre De Shaw, Brooke Denton, Steven Graham, Ross Haynes, Tyrone Kelly Jr, Kim Krawczyk, Davis Lenz, Danny Leverette, James McClanahan, Calvin Mullins, Louis Murry Jr., Marissa Pacheco, Lillie Richardson, Donald Veal, Delbert Wait, Joseph Williams, Larry Walker, Anita Nettleton, Augustine Bodenrader, Richard Cuny, Luther Davis, Benny Johnson, Gregory McBroom, Preston Lippert, Brandon Smith, Tyreese M Martinez, Brandon Aiken, Jason Armentrout, Randi Barnes, Andrew Bennett Jr., Taurus Blackmon, Frederick T. Brewster, Thomas Brown, Savedra Cain, Jeffrey Cline, Paul Dufour, Kathleen Flynn, Gary Steven Fox, William Greene, Ebony Griner, Roger Hardin, Melvineice Holloman, Diane Holmes, Robert Huey Jr., Tucker Hunt, Ralph Johnson, Bryan Kerr, Kenneth Kilgore, James Lauderdale, Ronald Ledford, Javier Longoria, David McCord, Ricky Milledge, William Miller, John W. Mills, Enrique Miranda, Edward Pacich, Jonathan Phelan, Jack Rader, Nancy Radtke, Sebastian Rice, William Rowe, Clude Rushing Jr., Matthew Sackett, Randy Salinas, James Sapp, Brandy Schafer, John Street, Terry Tate, Harold Taylor, Mary Taylor, Michael Tetlak, Gilbert Torres, Bernie Ray Underwood Jr., Douglas Williams, Christine Lanegan, Rayshawn Allen, Clinton Martin, Kevin Murphy, Randall Watts, Perry Hampton, Robin Hiatt, Clinton Higginbotham, Leon Hill, Michael House, William King, William Kunkle, Randal Larue, Kerry Lynn, Douglass Mactavish, Carl McDonald, Cody Medearis, Tracy Medearis, Luke Able, Adrian S. Collier, Richard Ashley, Bert Jenkins, Larry Bonham, Gerald Boyd, Brad Boyer, John Butler, Charles Chisler, James Coates, David Rhoades, Jennifer Dean, Derriel Martin, Michael Devitt, Dion Edwards Sr, Dominick Nigra, Donald James Lasher Jr., Elfego Gabaldon, April Ford, Barbara Freeman, Michael Galloway, Grayson Papierski, Gregory Dean Anderson, Gregory Pappas, Guenevere Coursey, David Gunter, Richard Hayes, Natalie Henderson, Herbert Vance, Eddie Jackson, Billie James, James Landreth, James Parnell, James Van Skiver, Jay McMillian, Jeffrey Massey, Joey Short, John Spurgeon, Melissa Jones, Kathryn Medlin, Keith Jason Gough, Kenneth Queen, Kyle Jayne, Kyle Yaple, Dawn Lucas, Margaret A. Brannon, Mark Louden, Gregory Martin, Mary A Jones, Mary Ann Bryant, Michael Deveau, Tony Muhammad, Julius Murray, David Myers, Ramon Navarro, Dennis Olson, Parke Peterson, Patrick O'Dowd, Paul Hoehn, Perry Duncan, Peter Metz, Randall Proffitt, Dale Richardson, Anne Riggs, Robert A. Jett, Rodrigo Ordonez, Ron Folds, Ronald Paffumi, Ronald Paquette, Shenay Bennett, David Smallwood, Kenneth Smith, James Spears, Charles Sutter, Clarence Thompson, George Thompson, Timothy Stencel, Tyrone Underwood, Valerie Ling, Edward Wales, Bruce Wallace, Wayne Mallory, Chester Whittaker, Willard Wright Jr, Steven Young, Daniel Lawrence, Corbett Litteral, Richard Queen, Cory Shaw, Bruce Smith, Horace Smith, Sueanne Thomas, Lashonda McCoy, Carol Moore, Stephen Rice, Robert Schultz, Patrina Smith, Gary Stout, Joseph Thomas Tindell, Janet Fowler, Robert Gates, Debra Mason, Jackie Pernell, Glenn Bozant, Quincy Cormier, Gary Eller, Glenn A Ellis, Antonio Flores, James L Ford Jr., Robert Herring, Cecil Ingram, Yavette Johnson, Jessica Kansupda, Sidonna Kuhn, Ralph D Lake, Gregory Manning, Frank Marigny, Elnora Miller, William Milton, Eliot Nelson, Robert Nethery, Victor Osorio, William G Parker Sr., Rick Rigney, Jeff Robenalt, Christopher Strobel, Daniel A Tressler, Ian Walton, Maclarry Williams. Response to Motion due by 4/4/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Croner, Andrew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Tuesday, March 07, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 03/07 1:52 PM
ORDER This Order Relates to: The Member Cases Listed in Exhibit A. The Defense Leadership's motion to dismiss (Dkt. No. 2876 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al) is GRANTED. The claims of the plaintiffs listed in Exhibit A (Dkt. No. 2876-1) are dismissed without prejudice and subject to reinstatement pursuant to the procedure set forth in CMO No. 5. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Honorable Richard M Gergel on 3/7/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Thursday, February 16, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Dismiss
Thu 02/16 7:35 PM
MOTION to Dismiss For Failure to Serve Plaintiff Fact Sheets by Defendants. Response to Motion due by 3/2/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Dukes, David) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiffs Who Failed to Serve Executed Plaintiff Fact Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - 8.18.22 Notice of Non-Compliance, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - 10.12.22 Notice of Non-Compliance, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - 1.20.23 Notice of Non-Compliance | ||
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
8 | 8 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Southern (associated as of 1/4/2022), 1:21-cv-10559, Ager et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-00028-RMG (sshe, ) | |
6 | 6
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 01/11 12:45 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Southern; Case Number 1:21-cv-10559. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, January 04, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 CERTIFIED TRUE COPY OF CONDITIONAL MDL TRANSFER OUT ORDER FROM THE MDL PANEL...transferring this action from the U.S.D.C. - S.D.N.Y to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (Signed by MDL Panel on 12/28/2021) (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/11/2022.] | |
MDL TRANSFER OUT ELECTRONICALLY: to the United States District Court - District of South Carolina. (sjo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/11/2022.] | ||
Monday, January 03, 2022 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: The telephonic initial pretrial conference previously scheduled before Judge Rakoff for January 4, 2022, is cancelled.. (Kotowski, Linda) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/11/2022.] | ||
Wednesday, December 22, 2021 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff:. The initial pretrial Conference will be held via Telephone Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff and can be accessed by the public and parties by dialing :USA toll free 888-363-4735, international caller paid 215-446-3657, Access code 1086415. (Kotowski, Linda) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/11/2022.] | ||
Wednesday, December 15, 2021 | ||
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Jed S. Rakoff: Telephone Conference held on 12/15/2021, ( Initial Conference set for 1/4/2022 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff.). (Kotowski, Linda) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/11/2022.] | ||
Monday, December 13, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: DATE AND PLACE OF CONFERENCE: 12 17-2021 ON A TELECONFERENCE LINE AT 11:00 am. The dial-in information for the call will be as follows: USA Toll-Free (888) 363-4735; USA Caller Paid/International Toll: (215) 446-3657; Access Code: 1086415. Initial Conference set for 12/17/2021 at 11:00 AM before Judge Jed S. Rakoff. (Signed by Judge Jed S. Rakoff on 12/13/2021) (kv) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/11/2022.] | |
Friday, December 10, 2021 | ||
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Jed S. Rakoff. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/11/2022.] | ||
Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/11/2022.] | ||
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/11/2022.] | ||
Thursday, December 09, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/11/2022.] | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/11/2022.] | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 160599/2021. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25449349).Document filed by 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co)..(Sagalowsky, Jordan) [Transferred from New York Southern on 1/11/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Summons and Complaint |