Pasco County v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00049 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Notice of Removal-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Jan 06, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Florida Middle, 8:21-cv-02954 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jul 05, 2022 4:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kidde PLC, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
EI Dupont De Nemours & Company
|
|
Defendant
John Doe Defendants 1-49
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
AGC Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
Chemours Company FC LLC, The
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire, Ltd.
|
|
Plaintiff
Pasco County
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Fire Products GP Holding LLC
Terminated: 01/20/2022
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls International plc
Terminated: 01/20/2022
|
|
Defendant
Angus International Safety Group LTD
Terminated: 01/20/2022
|
|
Defendant
Central Sprinkler LLC
Terminated: 01/20/2022
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 05/17 8:53 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by Kathleen Borland, City of Eau Claire, City of Scottsdale, City of Coral Springs, City of Plant City, City of South Gate, City of Monroe, City of Ruston, City of Natchitoches, County Of Moore, City of Prescott, Sewerage and Water Board of New Orleans, California Water Service Company, City of Shreveport, Connecticut Water Company, South Adams County Water and Sanitation District, City of San Jose California, City of Benwood, City of Lake Charles, City of Burbank, City of Adelanto, City of Plantation, County of San Joaquin, City of Watertown, City of Mansfield, Town of Prescott Valley, City of Loxley, Immokalee Water & Sewer District, Sacramento County, City of Fairborn, Alameda County Water District, City of Lathrop, City of Zephyrhills, City of Pompano Beach, City of Clovis, Howard County Maryland, Pasco County, City of Toledo.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Envelope A | ||
Thursday, January 20, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 01/20 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Pasco County against Angus International Safety Group, Ltd., Central Sprinkler, LLC, Fire Products GP Holding, LLC, and Johnson Controls International, plc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00049-RMG(Taylor, Brandon) |
|
Wednesday, January 19, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
service
Summons Issued
Wed 01/19 2:30 PM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/19 12:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Philip F Cossich on behalf of City of Plantation, City of Pico Rivera, City of Bell Gardens, Pasco County Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00049-RMG, 2:22-cv-00064-RMG, 2:22-cv-00065-RMG, 2:22-cv-00066-RMG(Cossich, Philip) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/19 12:44 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christina Cossich on behalf of City of Plantation, City of Pico Rivera, City of Bell Gardens, Pasco County Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00049-RMG, 2:22-cv-00064-RMG, 2:22-cv-00065-RMG, 2:22-cv-00066-RMG(Cossich, Christina) |
|
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/19 12:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Brandon J Taylor on behalf of City of Plantation, City of Pico Rivera, City of Bell Gardens, Pasco County Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00049-RMG, 2:22-cv-00064-RMG, 2:22-cv-00065-RMG, 2:22-cv-00066-RMG(Taylor, Brandon) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Wed 01/19 12:36 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Luana N Smith on behalf of City of Plantation, City of Pico Rivera, City of Bell Gardens, Pasco County Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00049-RMG, 2:22-cv-00064-RMG, 2:22-cv-00065-RMG, 2:22-cv-00066-RMG(Smith, Luana) |
|
Tuesday, January 11, 2022 | ||
12 | 12 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Florida Middle (associated as of 1/6/2022), 8:21-cv-02954, Pasco County v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-00049-RMG (sshe, ) | |
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Tue 01/11 3:26 PM
Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 8:21-cv-02954. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Thursday, January 06, 2022 | ||
9 | 9 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION PANEL (CTO-74) Order transferring case to District of South Carolina. MDL case number: 2873. (AG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/11/2022.] | |
Tuesday, December 28, 2021 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER granting 7 --motion to extend the deadline to respond to the complaint; requiring Tyco to file a status report not later than five days after an order resolves whether to transfer the action. Signed by Judge Steven D. Merryday on 12/28/2021. (KRM) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/11/2022.] | |
Friday, December 24, 2021 | ||
7 | 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint by Chemguard, Inc., TYCO Fire Products L.P.. (Sloan, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/11/2022.] | |
6 | 6 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Chemguard, Inc., TYCO Fire Products L.P. identifying Corporate Parent Johnson Controls International plc for Chemguard, Inc., TYCO Fire Products L.P... (Sloan, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/11/2022.] | |
Wednesday, December 22, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 1.07(c) and Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) -Local Rule 1.07(c) requires lead counsel to promptly file a Notice of a Related Action that identifies and describes any related action pending in the Middle District or elsewhere. -Local Rule 3.02(a)(2) requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (DAY) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/11/2022.] | |
Tuesday, December 21, 2021 | ||
4 | 4 NOTICE to counsel Clarke G. Hobby of Local Rule 2.01(a), which requires membership or special admission in the Middle District bar to practice in the Middle District, except for the limited exceptions identified in the Rule. To apply for membership in the Middle District, visit www.flmd.uscourts.gov/for-lawyers. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/11/2022.] | |
3 | 3 NOTICE to all Counsels of Local Rule 2.02(a), which requires designation of one lead counsel who - unless the party changes the designation - remains lead counsel throughout the action. File a Notice of Lead Counsel Designation to identify lead counsel. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (BD) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/11/2022.] | |
2 | 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Steven D. Merryday and Magistrate Judge Julie S. Sneed. New case number: 8:21-cv-2954-SDM-JSS. (SJB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/11/2022.] | |
Monday, December 20, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT and NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the Sixth Judicial Circuit in and for Pasco County, Florida, case number 2021-CA-2349 filed in State Court on 10/6/2021. Filing fee $402, receipt number AFLMDC-19048654 filed by Chemguard, Inc., TYCO Fire Products L.P.(Sloan, Michael) Modified on 12/21/2021 to correct docket text (BD). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/11/2022.] | |
Att: 1 State Court COMPLAINT, | ||
Att: 2 State Court Docket Sheet, | ||
Att: 3 State Court Other Documents, | ||
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet |