Huynh v. Walmart, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Jacqueline Scott Corley |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00142 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1962 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | Jan 10, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 03, 2024 8:19 AM PDT |
Defendant
William H Thompson
|
|
Defendant
The deRubertis Law Firm, APC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Robert F Ohmes
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
David deRubertis
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BOFA SECURITIES, Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Brett Biggs
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Theodore J Boutrous, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rachel Brass
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Epig Global
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Douglas Kasales
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Lighthouse Global
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Marc Lore
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doug McMillon
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tri Minh Huynh
4015 134th Avenue SE
Bellevue, WA 98006 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP
Terminated: 04/27/2022
405 Howard Street
San Francisco, CA 94105 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Payne & Fears LLP
Terminated: 04/27/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gregory B Penner
Terminated: 04/14/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Renee Quezada
Terminated: 07/01/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Valerie Ricetti
Terminated: 04/14/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Eugene Scalia
Terminated: 04/26/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Susanna G Schuemann
Terminated: 04/14/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ryan Carlton Stewart
Terminated: 04/14/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart.Com USA LLC
Terminated: 04/26/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
S. Robson Walton
Terminated: 04/14/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chris Wilson
Terminated: 04/14/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kari deRubertis
Terminated: 05/25/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Kathy von Lindern
Terminated: 04/27/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Bank of America Corporation
Terminated: 04/14/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Seth Beal
Terminated: 04/14/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Matthew Boyle
Terminated: 06/22/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rachel Brand
Terminated: 04/14/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Timothy P Flynn
Terminated: 04/14/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Melvenia Ha
Terminated: 04/14/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Audrey Au Joulina
Terminated: 04/14/2022
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mark Marchione
Terminated: 04/27/2022
|
Docket last updated: 09/08/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
265 | 265
appeal
USCA Mandate
Mon 04/01 3:40 PM
MANDATE of USCA for the Ninth Circuit as to256 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Tri Minh Huynh,243 Notice of Appeal to the Ninth Circuit, filed by Tri Minh Huynh,245 Amended Notice of Appeal, filed by Tri Minh Huynh (anj, COURT STAFF) |