Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 15
Judge:Robert A Mark
Case #: 1:22-bk-10311
Case Filed:Jan 14, 2022

Debtor
Moby S.p.A.
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP 711 Louisiana, Suite 500
Houston, TX 77002
Represented By
Patricia B Tomasco
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
42 42 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Wed 12/06 12:27 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Patricia B. Tomasco Related [+]. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-] 41 Order on Motion to Enforce
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
41 41 order Enforce Order Tue 12/05 2:04 PM
Order Granting The Motion of the Foreign Representative Pursuant to Sections 105, 1507, 1509, 1521, and 1525 of the Bankruptcy Code to Recognize and Enforce the Moby Sanction Order and the Moby Restructuring Filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A - Related [+]. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] # 34
Monday, December 04, 2023
40 40 notice Notice of Filing Mon 12/04 5:12 PM
Notice of Filing of Proposed Order Granting the Motion of the Foreign Representative Pursuant to Sections 105, 107, 1509, 1521, and 1525 of the Bankruptcy Code to Recognize and Enforce the Moby Sanction Order and the Moby Restructuring , Filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A. Related [+]. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-] 34 Motion to Enforce,35 Declaration
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, November 30, 2023
39 39 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 12/01 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 11/30/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 37 Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing (Re:36 Order Setting Briefing Deadline and Hearing (Re: 34 Emergency Motion of the Foreign Representative Pursuant to Sections 105, 1507, 1509, 1521, and 1525 of the Bankruptcy Code to Recognize and Enforce the Moby Sanction Order and the Moby Restructuring Filed by Debtor Moby S.P.A.) Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline) )
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
38 38 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Tue 11/28 7:27 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Patricia B. Tomasco Related [+]. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-] 34 Emergency Motion to Enforce Emergency Motion of the Foreign Representative Pursuant to Sections 105, 1507, 1509, 1521, and 1525 of the Bankruptcy Code to Recognize and Enforce the Moby Sanction Order and the Moby Restructuring filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A.,35 Declaration filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A.,36 Order Setting Hearing
37 37 court Notice of PDF Document to BNC Tue 11/28 6:17 PM
Notice of Transmittal of PDF Document to BNC for Noticing Related [+] (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 36 Order Setting Briefing Deadline and Hearing (Re: 34 Emergency Motion of the Foreign Representative Pursuant to Sections 105, 1507, 1509, 1521, and 1525 of the Bankruptcy Code to Recognize and Enforce the Moby Sanction Order and the Moby Restructuring Filed by Debtor Moby S.P.A.) Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
36 36 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Tue 11/28 6:15 PM
Order Setting Briefing Deadline and Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/05/2023 at 10:00 AM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 34 Emergency Motion of the Foreign Representative Pursuant to Sections 105, 1507, 1509, 1521, and 1525 of the Bankruptcy Code to Recognize and Enforce the Moby Sanction Order and the Moby Restructuring Filed by Debtor Moby S.P.A.
35 35 misc Declaration Tue 11/28 4:41 PM
Declaration of Mr. Luca Jeantet, Esq. of Gianni & Origoni In Support of the Emergency Motion Filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A. Related [+]. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-] 34 Emergency Motion to Enforce Emergency Motion of the Foreign Representative Pursuant to Sections 105, 1507, 1509, 1521, and 1525 of the Bankruptcy Code to Recognize and Enforce the Moby Sanction Order and the Moby Restructuring filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A.
34 34 motion Enforce Tue 11/28 4:38 PM
Emergency Motion to Enforce Emergency Motion of the Foreign Representative Pursuant to Sections 105, 1507, 1509, 1521, and 1525 of the Bankruptcy Code to Recognize and Enforce the Moby Sanction Order and the Moby Restructuring Filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 12, 2022
33 33 court Transcript Sat 03/12 10:39 AM
Transcript of 2/24/2022 Hearing. [ Transcript will be restricted for a period of 90 days. ] Related [+]. Redaction Request Due By 03/21/2022. Statement of Personal Data Identifier Redaction Request Due by 04/4/2022. Redacted Transcript Due by 04/12/2022. Transcript access will be restricted through 06/10/2022. (Ouellette and Mauldin)
Related: [-] 6 Verified Petition for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Motion for Order Granting Related Relief Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 1515, 1517, 1520 and 1521 Filed by Foreign Representative Achille Onorato. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order # 2 Exhibit Declaration of Mr. Luca Jeantet, Esq. of Gianni & Origoni in Support of Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of a Foreign Insolvency Proceeding # 3 Exhibit Declaration of Achille Onorato as Foreign Representative) (Tomasco, Patricia) Modified on 1/18/2022 to correct verbiage of incorrect event used AND party filer.
Friday, February 25, 2022
32 32 4 pgs order Order (Generic) Fri 02/25 3:37 PM
Order Granting Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Discretionary Relief - Related [+]. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 6
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
31 31 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Wed 02/23 5:53 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Patricia B Tomasco Related [+]. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-] 30 Response filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A.
30 30 answer Response Wed 02/23 5:08 PM
Response to (24 Objection filed by Creditor Morgan Stanley, Creditor Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC) Filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Wed 02/23 2:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Shana A. Elberg Filed by Interested Party The Ad Hoc Group of Holders of 300,000,000 (EUR) Senior Secured Notes. (Elberg, Shana)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 17, 2022
28 28 misc Certificate of Service Thu 02/17 11:39 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Creditors c/o David A. Samole Morgan Stanley, c/o David A. Samole Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC Related [+]. (Samole, David)
Related: [-] 25 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice,26 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice,27 Order on Motion to Appear pro hac vice
27 27 order Appear pro hac vice Order Thu 02/17 7:15 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice by Paul H. Zumbro Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #23
26 26 order Appear pro hac vice Order Thu 02/17 7:14 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice by Lauren M. Rosenberg Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #22
25 25 order Appear pro hac vice Order Thu 02/17 7:13 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice by Michael A. Paskin Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] 21
Wednesday, February 16, 2022
24 24 answer Objection Wed 02/16 7:08 PM
Limited Objection to (6 Motion to Set Hearing (Re:1 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding) Verified Petition for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Motion for Order Granting Related Relief Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 1515, 1517, 1520 and 1521< filed by Foreign Representative Achille Onorato) Filed by Creditors c/o David A. Samole Morgan Stanley, c/o David A. Samole Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (Samole, David)
Related: [-]
23 23 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 02/16 2:32 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Paul H. Zumbro [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Creditors c/o David A. Samole Morgan Stanley, c/o David A. Samole Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (Samole, David)
Related: [-]
22 22 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 02/16 2:29 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Lauren M. Rosenberg [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Creditors c/o David A. Samole Morgan Stanley, c/o David A. Samole Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC (Samole, David)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Appear pro hac vice Wed 02/16 2:24 PM
Ex Parte Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Michael A. Paskin [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Creditors c/o David A. Samole Morgan Stanley & Co. LLC, c/o David A. Samole Morgan Stanley (Samole, David)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 02/16 2:26 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice 22-10311 RAM) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40483837. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 02/16 2:30 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice 22-10311 RAM) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40483901. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Wed 02/16 2:33 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice 22-10311 RAM) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40483941. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Saturday, January 22, 2022
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/23 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 01/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Re:2 )
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/23 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 01/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Re:3 )
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/23 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 01/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Re:5 )
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 01/23 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 01/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Re:4 )
Thursday, January 20, 2022
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing-Hearing BK Fri 01/21 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Hearing Related [+] Notice Date 01/20/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Hearing (Re:1 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding and Verified Petition for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and6 Motion for Order Granting Related Relief Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 1515, 1517, 1520 and 1521 Filed by Foreign Representative Achille Onorato.) Hearing scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference.
15 15 attydoc Certificate of Service [Attorney] Thu 01/20 3:49 PM
Certificate of Service by Attorney Patricia B Tomasco Related [+]. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-] 10 Order Setting Hearing
14 14 order Appear pro hac vice Order Thu 01/20 3:12 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #2
13 13 order Appear pro hac vice Order Thu 01/20 3:11 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #3
12 12 order Appear pro hac vice Order Thu 01/20 3:10 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #5
11 11 order Appear pro hac vice Order Thu 01/20 3:04 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Valencia, Yamileth)
Related: [-] #4
Wednesday, January 19, 2022
10 10 2 pgs order Order Setting Hearing Wed 01/19 10:00 AM
Order Setting Briefing Scheduled and Hearing Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 6 Verified Petition for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Motion for Order Granting Related Relief Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 1515, 1517, 1520 and 1521 Filed by Foreign Representative Achille Onorato.
Tuesday, January 18, 2022
9 9 court Notice of Hearing by Video Conference Tue 01/18 2:59 PM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/24/2022 at 01:30 PM by Video Conference. (Antillon, Jacqueline)
Related: [-] 1 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding and Verified Petition for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Motion for Order Granting Related Relief Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 1515, 1517, 1520 and 1521 Filed by Foreign Representative Achille Onorato.
Friday, January 14, 2022
8 8 misc Chapter 15 List Fri 01/14 9:18 PM
Chapter 15 List Filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A. Related [+]. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-] 1 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A.
7 7 2 pgs misc Corporate Ownership Statement Fri 01/14 9:15 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A.. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-]
6 6 26 pgs motion Set Hearing Fri 01/14 9:12 PM
Motion to Set Hearing Related [+] Verified Petition for Recognition of Foreign Main Proceeding and Motion for Order Granting Related Relief Pursuant to Bankruptcy Code Sections 1515, 1517, 1520 and 1521 Filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-] 1 Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 11 pgs Exhibit Declaration of Mr. Luca Jeantet, Esq. of Gianni & Origoni in Support of Chapter 15 Petition for Recognition of a Foreign Insolvency Proceeding
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Achille Onorato as Foreign Representative
5 5 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 01/14 8:46 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Joanna Diane Caytas [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 01/14 8:45 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Alain Jaquet [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 01/14 8:43 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Nicoletta Malogioglio [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Appear pro hac vice Fri 01/14 8:41 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Patricia B. Tomasco [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Debtor Moby S.p.A. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs misc Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding Fri 01/14 8:12 PM
Petition for Recognition of Foreign Proceeding. Chapter 15 List per BR 1007 due 01/28/2022. (Tomasco, Patricia)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 01/14 9:19 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice 22-10311 [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40322073. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 01/14 9:19 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice 22-10311 [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40322073. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 01/14 9:19 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice 22-10311 [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40322073. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 01/14 9:19 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice 22-10311 [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 40322073. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]