New York Southern District Court
Judge:Paul A Engelmayer
Case #: 1:22-cv-00581
Nature of Suit850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange
Cause15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2022
Terminated:May 12, 2022
Last checked: Wednesday Jul 20, 2022 4:54 AM EDT
Defendant
Tom Bradicich
Defendant
R. Halsey Wise
Defendant
Robert M. Whelan, Jr.
Defendant
Jill Smith
Defendant
Antonio Pietri
Defendant
Georgia Keresty
Defendant
Adriana Karaboutis
Defendant
Gary E. Haroian
Defendant
Amar Hanspal
Defendant
Karen Golz
Defendant
Emersub CXI, Inc.
Defendant
Emersub CX, Inc.
Defendant
Emerson Electric Co.
Defendant
EMR Worldwide Inc.
Defendant
Don Casey
Defendant
Aspen Technology, Inc.
Plaintiff
Alex Ciccotelli
Represented By
Gina M. Serra
Rigrodsky Law, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 05/11 6:43 PM
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, against the defendant(s) Aspen Technology, Inc., Tom Bradicich, Don Casey, EMR Worldwide Inc., Emerson Electric Co., Emersub CX, Inc., Emersub CXI, Inc., Karen Golz, Amar Hanspal, Gary E. Haroian, Adriana Karaboutis, Georgia Keresty, Antonio Pietri, Jill Smith, Robert M. Whelan, Jr, R. Halsey Wise. Document filed by Alex Ciccotelli. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Serra, Gina)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
4 4 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 05/10 11:04 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: Plaintiff filed the complaint in this action on January 21, 2022. Dkt. 1. Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure requires that a defendant be served with the Summons and Complaint within 90 days after the Complaint is filed. It is hereby ORDERED that the plaintiff advise the Court in writing why plaintiff failed to serve the Summons and Complaint within the 90-day period, or, if plaintiff believes that the defendants have been served, when and in what manner such service was made. It is further ORDERED that if the Court does not receive any written communication from plaintiff by May 20, 2022, showing good cause why such service was not made within 90 days, the Court will dismiss without prejudice the claims against defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 5/10/2022) (va)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 29, 2022
notice Notice of Redesignation to Magistrate Judge Fri 04/29 3:46 PM
NOTICE OF REDESIGNATION TO ANOTHER MAGISTRATE JUDGE. The above entitled action has been redesignated to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo. Please note that this is a reassignment of the designation only. (nb)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Mon 01/24 9:31 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. .(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Mon 01/24 9:31 AM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred as Possibly Related/Similar Mon 01/24 9:31 AM
CASE REFERRED TO Judge Paul A. Engelmayer as possibly related to 1:22-cv-329. (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Accepted as Related Mon 01/24 5:19 PM
CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:22-cv-00329-PAE. Notice of Assignment to follow. (aea)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Case Assignment/Reassignment Mon 01/24 5:21 PM
NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (aea)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Mon 01/24 5:21 PM
Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (aea)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 21, 2022
3 3 misc Statement of Relatedness Fri 01/21 5:29 PM
STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:22-cv-329. Document filed by Alex Ciccotelli..(Serra, Gina)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 01/21 5:28 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Serra, Gina)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 01/21 5:27 PM
COMPLAINT against Aspen Technology, Inc., Tom Bradicich, Don Casey, EMR Worldwide Inc., Emerson Electric Co., Emersub CX, Inc., Emersub CXI, Inc., Karen Golz, Amar Hanspal, Gary E. Haroian, Adriana Karaboutis, Georgia Keresty, Antonio Pietri, Jill Smith, Robert M. Whelan, Jr, R. Halsey Wise. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-25620916)Document filed by Alex Ciccotelli..(Serra, Gina)
Related: [-]