Burke et al v. 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.) et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00179 |
Nature of Suit | 245 Real Property - Tort Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Property Damage |
Case Filed: | Jan 19, 2022 |
Case in other court: | Massachusetts, 4:21-cv-40137 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 18, 2022 5:38 AM EDT |
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Kidde PLC Inc
|
|
Defendant
3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.)
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Raytheon Technologies Corporation
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC, LLC
1007 Market Street
Wilmington, DE 19899 |
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
as successor-in-interest to The Ansul Company One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
AGC Chemical Americas, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AGC, INC. (f/k/a Asahi Glass Co., Ltd.)
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Archroma U.S. Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Incorporated
Agent Schok K. Moza 12321 Hatcherville
Baytown, TX 77520 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Plaintiff
Kimberley Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melisa Cunningham
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Chacko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Federico Raffa
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Gillian Price
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Melanie Dortch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ryan Dortch
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean Murphy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Christopher Kruegler
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Julia King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Brian King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Asha Chacko
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randi Burke
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Edie Huber
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Lawrence Hettinger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Suzanne Hays
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Frederick Hays, Jr.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas Burke
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, May 05, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 05/05 2:33 PM
TEXT ORDER granting 3056 (in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG; granting (175) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03432-RMG; granting (177) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:18-cv-03488-RMG; granting (10) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-02906-RMG; granting (135) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-03120-RMG; granting (103) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:19-cv-03434-RMG; granting (45) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:20-cv-02384-RMG; granting (17) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:20-cv-02812-RMG; granting (35) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-00848-RMG; granting (13) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-00851-RMG; granting (22) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-01649-RMG; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03214-RMG; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03215-RMG; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03216-RMG; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03217-RMG; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:21-cv-03218-RMG; granting (16) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-00179-RMG; granting (19) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-00919-RMG; granting (30) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-01078-RMG; granting (4) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-02221-RMG; granting (6) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-02222-RMG; granting (4) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-02823-RMG; granting (4) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03118-RMG; granting (4) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03119-RMG; granting (17) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03870-RMG; granting (15) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03871-RMG; granting (18) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 2:22-cv-03875-RMG) Motion to Withdraw M. Cristina Sanchez as Attorney for plaintiffs (as listed on Attachment A). AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 5/5/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
||
Tuesday, May 02, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 05/02 10:53 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney M. Cristina Sanchez by Bakman Water Company, City of Sioux Falls, City of Galesburg, City of San Jose California, City of Burbank, Town of Barnstable, City of Salisbury, Town of Webster, Randi Burke, Thomas Burke, Asha Chacko, Joshua Chacko, Melisa Cunningham, Melanie Dortch, Ryan Dortch, Frederick Hays, Jr, Suzanne Hays, Lawrence Hettinger, Edie Huber, Brian King, Julia King, Christopher Kruegler, Kimberley Murphy, Sean Murphy, Gillian Price, Federico Raffa, Town of Maysville, Town of Danvers, Sacramento County Water Agency, City of Taneytown, Town of Poolesville, Town of Ayer, City of Downey, CORAOPOLIS WATER AND SEWER AUTHORITY, EMERALD COAST UTILITIES AUTHORITY, California Water Service Company, Sandwich Water District, Town of Ayer, City of Whittier. Response to Motion due by 5/16/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Summy, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Attachment A | ||
Monday, April 04, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
service
Summons Reissued
Mon 04/04 10:48 AM
Summons Reissued as to All Defendants. (sshe, ) |
|
Monday, March 28, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/28 4:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott Summy on behalf of Randi Burke, Thomas Burke, Asha Chacko, Joshua Chacko, Melisa Cunningham, Melanie Dortch, Ryan Dortch, Frederick Hays, Jr, Suzanne Hays, Lawrence Hettinger, Edie Huber, Brian King, Julia King, Christopher Kruegler, Kimberley Murphy, Sean Murphy, Gillian Price, Federico Raffa Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00179-RMG(Summy, Scott) |
|
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/28 3:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Cary L McDougal on behalf of Randi Burke, Thomas Burke, Asha Chacko, Joshua Chacko, Melisa Cunningham, Melanie Dortch, Ryan Dortch, Frederick Hays, Jr, Suzanne Hays, Lawrence Hettinger, Edie Huber, Brian King, Julia King, Christopher Kruegler, Kimberley Murphy, Sean Murphy, Gillian Price, Federico Raffa Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00179-RMG(McDougal, Cary) |
|
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/28 2:07 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by M Cristina Sanchez on behalf of Randi Burke, Thomas Burke, Asha Chacko, Joshua Chacko, Melisa Cunningham, Melanie Dortch, Ryan Dortch, Frederick Hays, Jr, Suzanne Hays, Lawrence Hettinger, Edie Huber, Brian King, Julia King, Christopher Kruegler, Kimberley Murphy, Sean Murphy, Gillian Price, Federico Raffa Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00179-RMG(Sanchez, M) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/28 1:58 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Carla Burke Pickrel on behalf of Randi Burke, Thomas Burke, Asha Chacko, Joshua Chacko, Melisa Cunningham, Melanie Dortch, Ryan Dortch, Frederick Hays, Jr, Suzanne Hays, Lawrence Hettinger, Edie Huber, Brian King, Julia King, Christopher Kruegler, Kimberley Murphy, Sean Murphy, Gillian Price, Federico Raffa Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00179-RMG(Burke Pickrel, Carla) |
|
Friday, January 21, 2022 | ||
10 | 10 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Massachusetts (associated as of 1/19/2022), 4:21-cv-40137, Burke et al v. 3M Company (f/k/a Minnesota Mining and Manufacturing, Co.) et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-179-RMG (sshe, ) | |
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Fri 01/21 2:31 PM
Case transferred in from District of Massachusetts; Case Number 4:21-cv-40137. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Wednesday, January 19, 2022 | ||
7 | 7 Case electronically transferred to the District of South Carolina pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on 1/19/22. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 1/21/2022.] | |
6 | 6 Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 76 in MDL Case 2873 received from the District of South Carolina requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 1/21/2022.] | |
5 | 5 Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 76 in MDL Case 2873 received from the the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 1/21/2022.] | |
Monday, January 03, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 ELECTRONIC NOTICE TO COUNSEL: Notification forms indicating whether or not a party has consented to proceed before a U.S. Magistrate Judge have not been received in the Clerk's Office. The submission of the form is mandatory. Completed forms shall be filed promptly. Additional forms can be obtained on the Court's web page at http://www.mad.uscourts.gov. (King, Dawn) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 1/21/2022.] | |
Thursday, December 30, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 1/21/2022.] | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment. Magistrate Judge David H. Hennessy assigned to case. Plaintiff's counsel, or defendant's counsel if this case was initiated by the filing of a Notice of Removal, are directed to the Notice and Procedures regarding Consent to Proceed before the Magistrate Judge which can be downloaded [LINK:here] . These documents will be mailed to counsel not receiving notice electronically. Pursuant to General Order 09-3, until the Court receives for filing either a consent to the Magistrate Judge's jurisdiction or the reassignment of the case to a District Judge, the initial assignment of a civil case to the Magistrate Judge is a referral to the Magistrate Judge under 28 USC 636(b) for all pretrial non-dispositive matters and Report and Recommendations, but not for the Rule 16(b) scheduling conference. (Jones, Sherry) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 1/21/2022.] | |
Wednesday, December 29, 2021 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number AMADC-9116360 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by Randi Burke, Thomas Burke, Asha Chacko, Joshua Chacko, Melisa Cunningham, Melanie Dortch, Ryan Dortch, Frederick Hays, Jr, Suzanne Hays, Lawrence Hettinger, Edie Huber, Brian King, Julia King, Christopher Kruegler, Kimberley Murphy, Sean Murphy, Gillian Price, Federico Raffa.(Sandman, Richard) [Transferred from Massachusetts on 1/21/2022.] | |
Att: 1 JS44 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Local Filing Category Form |