KENT v. DENISE et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Julien Xavier Neals |
Referred: | Stacey D Adams |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00388 |
Nature of Suit | 850 Other Statutes - Securities/Commodities/Exchange |
Cause | 28:754 Receiver of Property in Different Districts |
Case Filed: | Jan 26, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jul 25, 2022 4:39 AM EDT |
Defendant
ENTERCORE, INC.
|
|
Defendant
ORANGE SPLENDOR, INC.
|
|
Defendant
JORDAN DENISE
5000 BIRCH STREET SUITE 3000
NEWPORT BEACH, CA 19102 |
|
Plaintiff
KEVIN DOOLEY KENT
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/20/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, September 09, 2024 | ||
93 | 93
order
Order
Mon 09/09 1:58 PM
TEXT ORDER: ECF No. 92 rescheduling the settlement conference for October 10, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. is corrected to provide that the settlement conference shall proceed via video conference. Microsoft Teams login credentials will be provided So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 9/9/2024. (smf) |
|
Tuesday, September 03, 2024 | ||
92 | 92
order
1 - Terminate Hearings Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 09/03 11:51 AM
TEXT ORDER: Due to a scheduling conflict, the in-person settlement conference currently scheduled for 09/24/24 is hereby rescheduled for October 10, 2024 at 1:30 p.m. IN PERSON at the Frank R. Lautenberg Post Office and U.S. Courthouse, 2 Federal Square, Courtroom 9, Newark, NJ 07102. Trial counsel as well as parties/persons with full settlement authority must attend the settlement conference. Each party shall submit, by email to SDA_orders@njd.uscourts.gov, a confidential settlement memorandum of no more than ten double spaced pages no later than five business days before the conference. Voluminous exhibits to settlement letters (exceeding 20 pages) will not be reviewed by the Court unless submitted in hard copy that is received by Chambers no later than five business days in advance of the settlement conference. (Settlement Conference set for 10/10/2024 at 01:30 PM in Newark - PO Courtroom 9 before Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams.) So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacey D. Adams on 9/3/2024. (smf) |