Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP v. Cecchi Gori Pictures et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:16-bk-53499
Lead BK case is: 5:16-bk-53499
California Northern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | M Elaine Hammond |
Case #: | 5:22-ap-05005 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other |
Case Filed: | Jan 26, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 30, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Cecchi Gori Pictures, a California Corporation
1100 La Avenida Street Building A
Mountain View, CA 94043 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cecchi Gori USA, Inc., a California Corporation
1100 La Avenida Street Building A
Mountain View, CA 94043 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
NTJ Venture, LLC, a Delaware limited liability company
108 Lakeland Ave.
Dover, DE 19901 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP
Four Embarcadero Center 17th Floor
San Francisco, CA 94111 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 30, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/30 12:44 PM
Adversary Case Closed 5:22-ap-5005. (ckk) |
||
Friday, March 04, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
order
Stipulation
Fri 03/04 12:22 PM
Order NOT SIGNED on Stipulation . (acr) |
|
Thursday, March 03, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
5
pgs
stip
Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thu 03/03 10:55 PM
Stipulation to Dismiss of Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Filed by Plaintiff Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP . Case Management Action due after 03/17/2022. (Katz, Ori) |
|
Tuesday, February 01, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Certificate of Service
Tue 02/01 12:14 PM
Certificate of Service . Filed by Plaintiff Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP (Kim, Jeannie) |
|
Thursday, January 27, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
order
Discovery
Thu 01/27 8:21 AM
Order Regarding Initial Disclosures and Discovery Conference. (ka) |
|
4 | 4
court
Summons Issued
Thu 01/27 8:20 AM
Summons Issued on Cecchi Gori Pictures Answer Due 2/28/2022; Cecchi Gori USA, Inc. Answer Due 2/28/2022; NTJ Venture, LLC Answer Due 2/28/2022 . Scheduling Conference scheduled for 4/5/2022 at 10:00 AM via Tele/Videoconference - www.canb.uscourts.gov/calendars. (ka) |
|
Wednesday, January 26, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Interpleader Deposit
Wed 01/26 3:27 PM
Motion for Interpleader Deposit. Motion for Leave to Deposit Interpleader Funds Filed by Plaintiff Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP. (Katz, Ori) |
|
2 | 2
cmp
Adversary Cover Sheet
Wed 01/26 3:15 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet . (Katz, Ori) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 01/26 3:05 PM
Adversary case 22-05005 02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy)) Complaint by Sheppard Mullin Richter & Hampton LLP against Cecchi Gori Pictures, Cecchi Gori USA, Inc., NTJ Venture, LLC. Fee Amount $350. (Katz, Ori) |