New Jersey District Court
Case #: 1:22-cr-00063
Case Filed:Jan 27, 2022
Terminated:Aug 31, 2022
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 01, 2022 2:17 AM EST
Defendant
ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO (2)
Represented By
VINCENT JAMES LAPAGLIA
contact info
CARLOS A. MARTIR, JR.
Counsel Not Admitted To Usdc-Nj Bar
contact info
ROBERT M. GAMBURG
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
SAMANTHA CHRISTINE FASANELLO
Office Of The U.S. Attorney
contact info
ROBERT L. FRAZER
Office Of The Us Attorney
contact info

GPO Jan 28 2022
ORDER regarding use of video/teleconference as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO. Signed by Judge Noel L. Hillman on 1/27/2022. (gn )

Docket last updated: 10/26/2024 10:55 AM EDT
Monday, August 31, 2020
1 1 10 pgs COMPLAINT as to NICHOLAS BUCCIARELLI (1), ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO (2), NICHOLAS MARINO (3), MICHAEL DORAZO (4). (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
6 6 SEALING ORDER as to NICHOLAS BUCCIARELLI, ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO, NICHOLAS MARINO, MICHAEL DORAZO. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/31/2020. (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
Arrest of ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Set Hearings as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO: Preliminary Examination set for 9/15/2020 at 12:00 PM before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark. (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge James B. Clark:Initial Appearance as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO held on 9/1/2020. Defendant advised of rights. CJA appointed. Defendant consents to detention with the right to make a bail application at a later time. (Court Reporter/Recorder Zoom.) (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
12 12 CJA 20 as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO: Appointment of Attorney VINCENT JAMES LAPAGLIA for ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/1/2020. (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
52 52 ORDER OF DETENTION as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 9/1/2020. (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 09, 2020
21 21 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: CARLOS A. MARTIR, JR appearing for ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO Attorney VINCENT JAMES LAPAGLIA terminated. (MARTIR, CARLOS) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
22 22 Letter from the Government re: Potential Conflict of Interest (FASANELLO, SAMANTHA) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 23, 2020
26 26 STANDING ORDER 20-12 (COVID-19) excluding Speedy Trial time, under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A), from March 16, 2020 through January 4, 2021 in all criminal proceedings in this District under the Speedy Trial Act, including those proceedings commenced by complaint and time limits established by the Interstate Agreement of Detainers, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 9/23/2020. (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 05, 2020
29 29 First MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Carlos Martir, Esq. by USA as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO. (FASANELLO, SAMANTHA) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 09, 2020
32 32 ORDER re-appointing Vincent LaPaglia as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO re29 First MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Carlos Martir, Esq. filed by USA. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 11/9/2020. (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 10, 2020
38 38 RESPONSE to Motion by ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO re29 First MOTION to Disqualify Counsel Carlos Martir, Esq. (MARTIR, CARLOS) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
39 39 STANDING ORDER 20-12 (COVID-19) excluding Speedy Trial time, under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A), from March 16, 2020 through March 12, 2021 in all criminal proceedings in this District under the Speedy Trial Act, including those proceedings commenced by complaint and time limits established by the Interstate Agreement of Detainers, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/17/2020. (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 02, 2021
40 40 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: ROBERT M. GAMBURG appearing for ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO Attorney VINCENT JAMES LAPAGLIA and CARLOS A. MARTIR, JR terminated. (GAMBURG, ROBERT) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
41 41 MOTION for Release from Custody Pending Trial by ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO. (GAMBURG, ROBERT) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 11, 2021
42 42 STANDING ORDER 21-04 (COVID-19) excluding Speedy Trial time, under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A), from March 16, 2020 through June 1, 2021 in all criminal proceedings in this District under the Speedy Trial Act, including those proceedings commenced by complaint and time limits established by the Interstate Agreement of Detainers, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 3/11/2021. (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 30, 2021
43 43 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO Time excluded from 3/30/2021 until 6/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 3/30/2021. (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 19, 2021
53 53 ORDER terminating as moot29 Motion to Disqualify Counsel. as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO (2). Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 5/19/2021. (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 30, 2021
58 58 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO Time excluded from 6/30/2021 until 8/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 6/30/2021. (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
64 64 CONSENT ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO (2) $100,000 unsecured (Finance notified). Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 7/27/2021. (spc) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
65 65 unsecured Bond Entered as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO in amount of $ 100,000.00, (spc) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 03, 2021
66 66 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO Time excluded from 8/3/2021 until 10/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge James B. Clark on 8/3/2021. (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 23, 2021
71 71 ORDER modifying release conditions as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 9/23/2021. (spc) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 29, 2021
77 77 STANDING ORDER 2021-11 (COVID-19) excluding Speedy Trial time, under 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A), from December 29, 2021 through January 31, 2022 in all criminal proceedings in this District under the Speedy Trial Act, including those proceedings commenced by complaint and time limits established by the Interstate Agreement of Detainers, etc. Signed by Chief Judge Freda L. Wolfson on 12/29/2021. (seb) [2:20-mj-12328-JBC]
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 27, 2022
78 78 5 pgs INFORMATION as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO (2) Count 1. (gn)
Related: [-]
79 79 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO (gn )
Related: [-]
80 80 Minute Entry for video proceedings held before Judge Noel L. Hillman:Initial Appearance as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO held on 1/27/2022, Plea Agreement Hearing as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO held on 1/27/2022, Plea entered by ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO (2) Guilty Count 1-Information, ( Sentencing set for 6/1/2022 01:00 PM in Camden - Courtroom 3A before Judge Noel L. Hillman.) Ordered bail continued with modifications; Order to be entered (Court Reporter John Kurz (267-251-0474).) (gn )
Related: [-]
81 81 APPLICATION for permission to enter Plea of guilty as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO. (gn, )
Related: [-]
82 82 9 pgs PLEA AGREEMENT as to ANTHONY D'ALESSANDRO (gn, )
Related: [-]