Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-50558

Virginia Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Rebecca B Connelly
Case #: 5:22-ap-05002
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
Case Filed:Jan 31, 2022
Terminated:Jun 22, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
A&M SUPPLY CORPORATION
250 Browns Hill Ct
Midlothian, VA 23114
Represented By
A&M SUPPLY CORPORATION
contact info
Plaintiff
Scotty Dwayne Sipe
465 Thorofare Rd.
Crimora, VA 24431
Represented By
Marshall Moore Slayton, Esq
Slayton Law, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
24 24 court Close Adversary Case Wed 06/22 8:42 AM
Adversary Case 5:22-ap-5002 Closed (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 16, 2022
23 23 misc Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/16 12:14 PM
Certificate of Mailing - Order Avoiding Lien - CertificateOfService Filed by Marshall Moore Slayton Esq on behalf of Scotty Dwayne Sipe Related [+]. (Slayton, Marshall)
Related: [-] 22 Disposition of Adversary
Tuesday, June 07, 2022
22 22 order Disposition of Adversary Tue 06/07 12:57 PM
Disposition of Adversary 5:2022-ap-5002-rbc. Judgement Avoiding Lien. Case to Be Closed if Applicable 06/21/2022. (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 02, 2022
21 21 court Hearing Held - Hearing Continued Thu 06/02 1:06 PM
Hearing Held - Hearing Continued - No Order Required Related [+] Video conference set for 7/20/2022 at 10:00 AM before Judge Connelly. All parties connect using video conference instructions on the court website. (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-] 20 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Scotty Dwayne Sipe
Tuesday, April 26, 2022
20 20 motion Default Judgment Tue 04/26 5:27 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Scotty Dwayne Sipe Hearing scheduled 6/2/2022 at 10:00 AM at before Judge Connelly. All parties connect using video conference instructions on the court website. (Slayton, Marshall)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Document/Event Entered in Error Tue 04/26 5:22 PM
Document/Event Entered in Error Filed by Marshall Moore Slayton Esq on behalf of Scotty Dwayne Sipe Related [+]. (Slayton, Marshall)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Default Judgment
Saturday, April 23, 2022
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sun 04/24 12:29 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Clerk's Entry of Default
Friday, April 22, 2022
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Sat 04/23 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/22/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Notice of Inquiry Fri 04/22 3:12 PM
Notice of Inquiry Related [+] (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Scotty Dwayne Sipe
Thursday, April 21, 2022
15 15 motion Default Judgment Thu 04/21 3:18 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Scotty Dwayne Sipe Hearing scheduled 6/2/2022 at 10:00 AM at before Judge Connelly. All parties connect using video conference instructions on the court website. (Slayton, Marshall)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Clerk's Entry of Default Thu 04/21 10:13 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-] 11 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Scotty Dwayne Sipe
Wednesday, April 20, 2022
13 13 court Clerk's Entry of Default Wed 04/20 9:35 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default Related [+] (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-] 11 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Scotty Dwayne Sipe
Monday, April 18, 2022
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing Mon 04/18 10:56 AM
Certificate of Mailing Cert Mail-Request-BC Filed by Marshall Moore Slayton Esq on behalf of Scotty Dwayne Sipe Related [+]. (Slayton, Marshall)
Related: [-] 11 Request for Entry of Default
Thursday, April 14, 2022
11 11 misc Request for Entry of Default Thu 04/14 3:58 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Marshall Moore Slayton Esq on behalf of Scotty Dwayne Sipe. (Slayton, Marshall)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Document/Event Entered in Error Thu 04/14 3:08 PM
Document/Event Entered in Error Filed by Marshall Moore Slayton Esq on behalf of Scotty Dwayne Sipe Related [+]. (Slayton, Marshall)
Related: [-] 8 Request for Entry of Default
9 9 court Notice of Inquiry Thu 04/14 11:34 AM
Notice of Inquiry Related [+] (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-] 8 Request for Entry of Default filed by Plaintiff Scotty Dwayne Sipe
Monday, April 11, 2022
8 8 misc Request for Entry of Default Mon 04/11 3:31 PM
Request for Entry of Default Filed by Marshall Moore Slayton Esq on behalf of Scotty Dwayne Sipe. (Slayton, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 16, 2022
7 7 order Set Due Date Wed 03/16 3:37 PM
Order Setting Due Date. Order setting due date by 6/14/2022. (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 15, 2022
6 6 misc Document/Event Entered in Error Tue 02/15 5:10 PM
Document/Event Entered in Error Filed by Marshall Moore Slayton Esq on behalf of Scotty Dwayne Sipe Related [+]. (Slayton, Marshall)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Mailing
Friday, February 11, 2022
5 5 court Notice of Inquiry Fri 02/11 8:15 AM
Notice of Inquiry Related [+] (Hensley, Jackie)
Related: [-] 4 Certificate of Mailing filed by Plaintiff Scotty Dwayne Sipe
Thursday, February 10, 2022
4 4 misc Certificate of Mailing Thu 02/10 4:08 PM
Certificate of Mailing Cert Mail-Summons-BC Filed by Marshall Moore Slayton Esq on behalf of Scotty Dwayne Sipe Related [+]. (Slayton, Marshall)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff
Tuesday, February 08, 2022
3 3 misc Certificate of Mailing Tue 02/08 4:53 PM
Certificate of Mailing Filed by Marshall Moore Slayton Esq on behalf of Scotty Dwayne Sipe Related [+]. (Slayton, Marshall)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff
Tuesday, February 01, 2022
2 2 cmp Summons Issued Tue 02/01 1:29 PM
Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff Defendant Motion or Answer Due Date 3/3/2022. (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 31, 2022
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 01/31 1:01 PM
Adversary case 22-05002 Complaint by Marshall Moore Slayton Esq on behalf of Scotty Dwayne Sipe against A&M SUPPLY CORPORATION. Receipt Number EXEMPT, Fee Amount $0.00. AP Service Due 03/22/2022. Nature of Suit: (02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Slayton, Marshall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A