Wright v. Sanofi-Aventis US LLC et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Lead case: 9:20-md-02924
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Robin L Rosenberg |
Case #: | 9:22-cv-80152 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jan 31, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2022 |
Case in other court: | South Carolina, 2:21-cv-04205 |
Last checked: Saturday Jul 30, 2022 7:04 AM EDT |
Defendant
Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Chattem Inc.
1715 West 38th Street
Chatanooga, TN 37409 |
|
Defendant
Sanofi U.S. Services Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC 55 Corporate Drive
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 |
|
Plaintiff
Karen Yvette Wright
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, February 22, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
order
Administrative Order
Tue 02/22 4:43 PM
ORDER OF CONSOLIDATION AND ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSE-OUT. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 2/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (mc) |
|
Monday, January 31, 2022 | ||
11 | 11 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of South Carolina. Case Number 2:21-cv-04205 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:22-cv-80152-RLR Wright v. Sanofi-Aventis US LLC et al on 1/31/2022. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 89. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) | |
10 | 10 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) | |
9 | 9
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer - CV - NO FEE
Mon 01/31 3:25 PM
Case transferred in from South Carolina; Case Number 2:21-cv-04205. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc) |
|
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Mon 01/31 3:28 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg. (mc) |
||
transfer
MDL Tag-Along/Transfer In Case Receipt
Mon 01/31 4:20 PM
MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of South Carolina. Case Number 2:21-cv-04205 with documents 1-8. Assigned FLSD Case Number 9:22-cv-80152-RLR Wright v. Sanofi-Aventis US LLC et al on 1/31/2022. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 9:20-md-02924-RLR pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order 89. Clerks Note: JPML notified (mc) |
||
Friday, January 28, 2022 | ||
8 | 8 Case transferred to Southern Florida per certified copy of Conditional Transfer Order Number 89. The Transferring Clerk's Office hereby attests the record and the docket sheet available through CM/ECF to be the certified list. (sshe, ) | |
Friday, December 31, 2021 | ||
6 | 6 Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals Inc. (sshe, ) | |
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to Chattem Inc. (sshe, ) | |
4 | 4 Summons Issued as to Sanofi US Services Inc. (sshe, ) | |
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to Sanofi-Aventis US LLC. (sshe, ) | |
2 | 2 Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Karen Yvette Wright.(sshe, ) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ASCDC-10256891.), filed by Karen Yvette Wright. Service due by 3/31/2022(sshe, ) |