Alexander v. Southern Health Partners Inc et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Brantley Starr |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00395 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 42:1983 Civil Rights Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 17, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 16, 2022 4:19 AM CDT |
Defendant
Jacob Parras
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Southern Health Partners Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Tori Taylor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Philip R Taft Psy D & Associates PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ronnie Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/15/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted
Tue 08/06 2:57 PM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 24-10663 : Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by[LINK:contacting the appeals deputy] in advance to arrange delivery. (mcrd) |