Ohio Northern District Court
Case #: 1:22-mj-04036
Case Filed:Jan 21, 2022
Terminated:Feb 17, 2022
Last checked: Sunday Feb 20, 2022 2:29 AM EST
Plaintiff
United States of America
Represented By
Kevin P. Pierce
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info
Robert J. Kolansky
Office Of The U.S. Attorney - Cleveland
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Hosea Lock (1)
Terminated: 02/17/2022
Represented By
Craig T. Weintraub
contact info
Mark B. Marein
Marein & Bradley
contact info


Docket last updated: 02/20/2022 2:48 AM EST
Friday, January 21, 2022
Case unsealed as to Hosea Lock (1) (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
Arrest of Hosea Lock (1) on 1/21/22. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
IMPORTANT: Notice [non-document] as to Hosea Lock (1). Initial Appearance set for 1/21/2022 at 02:30 PM in to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
Minutes of proceedings [non-document] Initial Appearance before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg as Hosea Lock (1) held on 1/21/22. All parties appeared via video conference. AUSA Kevin Pierce present for the government. Attorney Craig Weintraub present and appointed for the defendant. Defendant consented to participating via video conference, with no objection from defense counsel or government. The Court finds that consent was knowingly and voluntarily made by defendant. Pursuant to the Due Process Protections Act, the Court reminds the government of its obligations under Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), to disclose evidence favorable to the defendant and material to the defendant's guilt or punishment. The government is ordered to comply with Brady and its progeny. The failure to do so in a timely manner may result in consequences, including dismissal of the indictment or information, exclusion of government evidence or witnesses, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges, contempt proceedings, sanctions by the Court, or any other remedy that is just under the circumstances. Government moves for detention. Defendant requests a detention hearing. Detention hearing scheduled for 1/28/22 at 1:00pm before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg, via video. Waiver of preliminary hearing executed. Case is bound over to the Grand Jury. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. (ECRO K. Malley) (PTS: C. Stolarik) Time: 15 minutes. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
CJA 20 Appointment of Attorney Craig T. Weintraub for Hosea Lock. Counsel is reminded of their obligation to report significant changes in defendant's employment or financial circumstances sufficient to enable defendant to pay, in whole or in part, for legal representation. CJA Plan, Part IV (D)(2). Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 1/21/22. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
1 1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 1/21/22 filed by USA as to Hosea Lock (1). (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
4 4 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Hosea Lock (1). Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 1/21/22. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order regarding use of video conference/teleconferencing as to Hosea Lock (1). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 1/21/22. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
6 6 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing by Hosea Lock (1). (D,Ky)
Related: [-]
7 7 Order scheduling detention hearing as to Hosea Lock (1). Detention Hearing set for 1/28/2022 01:00 PM to be held by video conference (Cleveland) before Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg. Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan D. Greenberg on 1/21/22. (D,Ky)
Related: [-]