Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:21-bk-50558

Virginia Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Rebecca B Connelly
Case #: 5:22-ap-05004
Nature of Suit65 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Feb 22, 2022
Terminated:Mar 29, 2023
Last checked: never
Defendant
Scotty Dwayne Sipe, Defendant
P.O. Box 56
Crimora, VA 24431
Represented By
Marshall Moore Slayton, Esq
Slayton Law, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Hunter Houff, Plaintiff
Hoover Penrod, PLC 342 S. Main Street
Harrisonburg, VA 22801
Represented By
Hannah White Hutman
Hoover Penrod, PLC
contact info
Jacob Townsend Penrod
Hoover Penrod PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/28/2025 1:11 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
26 26 court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/29 2:27 PM
Adversary Case 5:22-ap-5004 Closed (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 22, 2023
25 25 court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 03/23 8:12 AM
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Receipt Number 708418, Fee Amount $12.50 1 certification $11 and 3 copies $1.50 (Rose, Ginger)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 15, 2023
24 24 court Entry Wed 03/15 11:23 AM
Entry: Hoover Penrod PLC Check #94148 in the amount of $12.50 for certification and copies mailed to Roanoke Related [+] (Spitzer, Angelique)
Related: [-] 23 Disposition of Adversary
Tuesday, March 14, 2023
23 23 order Disposition of Adversary Tue 03/14 4:37 PM
Disposition of Adversary 5:2022-ap-5004-rbc Order Approving Settlement . Case to Be Closed if Applicable 03/28/2023. (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 17, 2022
court Returned Mail Mon 12/19 7:10 AM
Returned Mail: Mail originally sent on 11/20/2022 returned as undeliverable. Could not mail Form pdf003 to: Scotty Dwayne Sipe P.O. Box 56 Crimora, VA 24431-0056. (ADIrm adi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 15, 2022
22 22 court Returned Mail Thu 12/15 3:45 PM
Returned Mail - Scotty Dwayne Sipe - Scheduling Order Pre-Trial Related [+] (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-] 19 Scheduling Order
Wednesday, December 14, 2022
21 21 court Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Thu 12/15 7:46 AM
Receipt Number and Filing Fee - Generic Receipt Number 708356, Fee Amount $55.50 for certification and copies (James, Catherine)
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 20, 2022
20 20 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 11/21 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/20/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 19 Scheduling Order
Friday, November 18, 2022
19 19 order Scheduling Order (Trial and/or Pre-Trial) Fri 11/18 9:02 AM
Scheduling Order Pre-Trial Related [+]. Discovery due by 2/17/2023. Witness Lists and Exhibits must be filed by 3/29/2023. Exhibits not objected to in writing by 4/5/2023, will stand as admitted into evidence. Stipulation of Facts and Issues to be filed by 4/7/2023. Rule 26 Disclosures due 30 days from the date of this pre-trial order. Trial date set for 4/12/2023 at 09:30 AM at Harrisonburg, Courtroom, US Courthouse, 116 N Main St., Harrisonburg, VA 22802. (Spitzer, Angelique)
Related: [-] 11 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Scotty Dwayne Sipe
Tuesday, November 15, 2022
18 18 court Pre-Trial Conference Tue 11/15 3:46 PM
Pre-Trial Conference Held and Trial Set. Pre-Trial Order to be Issued - Discovery due by 2/17/2022, Exhibits due by 3/29/2022, Objections due by 4/5/2022, Rule 26 Disclosures due 30 days from the date of the pre-trial order, Joint Stipulation of Facts due by 4/7/2022. Trial scheduled 4/12/2023 at 09:30 AM at Harrisonburg, Courtroom, US Courthouse, 116 N Main St., Harrisonburg, VA 22802. (Spitzer, Angelique)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 11, 2022
17 17 court Hearing Not Held - Hearing Continued Tue 10/11 9:24 AM
Hearing Not Held - Hearing Continued Because Judicial Mediation Continued - No Order Required Related [+] Hearing scheduled 11/15/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Connelly. All parties connect using video conference instructions on the court website. (Spitzer, Angelique)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Scotty Dwayne Sipe
Tuesday, September 27, 2022
16 16 court Hearing Held - Hearing Continued Tue 09/27 11:38 AM
Hearing Held - Hearing Continued - No Order Required Related [+] Hearing scheduled 10/12/2022 at 01:00 PM at Judge Connelly. All parties to dial into court conference number. (Wood, Chad)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Scotty Dwayne Sipe
Tuesday, July 26, 2022
15 15 court Hearing Held - Hearing Continued Tue 07/26 11:41 AM
Telephone Conference Hearing Held - Hearing Continued - No Order Required Related [+] Telephone conference call set for 9/27/2022 at 10:00 AM with Judge Connelly. All parties to dial into court conference number. (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Scotty Dwayne Sipe
Thursday, July 21, 2022
14 14 order Entry of Order Thu 07/21 1:59 PM
Order Granting Motion for Entry of Order Related [+] (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, July 15, 2022
13 13 motion Entry of Order Fri 07/15 4:19 PM
Motion for Entry of Order Granting Joint Motion Requesting Judicial Mediation Filed by Plaintiff Hunter Houff (Penrod, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 23, 2022
12 12 misc Certificate of Mailing Thu 06/23 10:35 AM
Certificate of Mailing - Answer to Amended Complaint - CertificateOfService Filed by Marshall Moore Slayton Esq on behalf of Scotty Dwayne Sipe Related [+]. (Slayton, Marshall)
Related: [-] 11 Answer to Complaint
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 06/22 1:44 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Scotty Dwayne Sipe Related [+]. (Slayton, Marshall)
Related: [-] 10 Amended Complaint by Jacob Townsend Penrod on behalf of Hunter Houff against Scotty Dwayne Sipe. (RE: related document(s)1 Adversary case 22-05004 Complaint by Hannah White Hutman on behalf of Hunter Houff against Scotty Dwayne Sipe. Fee Amount $350. AP Service Due 04/13/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4 # 5 Exhibit 5) Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(65 (Dischargeability - other)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) filed by Plaintiff Hunter Houff). filed by Plaintiff Hunter Houff
Wednesday, June 08, 2022
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 06/08 2:46 PM
Amended Complaint by Jacob Townsend Penrod on behalf of Hunter Houff against Scotty Dwayne Sipe. Related [+]. (Penrod, Jacob)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-05004 Complaint by Hannah White Hutman on behalf of Hunter Houff against Scotty Dwayne Sipe. Fee Amount $350. AP Service Due 04/13/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4 # 5 Exhibit 5) Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(65 (Dischargeability - other)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) filed by Plaintiff Hunter Houff
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
9 9 court Hearing Held - Hearing Continued Wed 05/25 3:36 PM
Hearing Held - Hearing Continued - No Order Required Related [+] Amended Complaint due by 6/8/2022. Telephone conference call set for 7/26/2022 at 10:00 AM with Judge Connelly. All parties to dial into court conference number. (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Scotty Dwayne Sipe
Tuesday, May 10, 2022
8 8 court Hearing Held - Hearing Continued Tue 05/10 11:25 AM
Hearing Held - Hearing Continued - No Order Required Related [+] Video conference set for 5/25/2022 at 02:00 PM before Judge Connelly. All parties connect using video conference instructions on the court website. (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-] 6 Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Scotty Dwayne Sipe
Monday, March 28, 2022
7 7 order Directing Compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 Mon 03/28 12:57 PM
Order Directing Compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 26 (a) and (f) . Telephone conference call set for 5/10/2022 at 10:00 AM with Judge Connelly. All parties to dial into court conference number. (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
6 6 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/25 1:50 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Scotty Dwayne Sipe Related [+]. (Fennell, Jerry)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 22-05004 Complaint by Hannah White Hutman on behalf of Hunter Houff against Scotty Dwayne Sipe. Fee Amount $350. AP Service Due 04/13/2022. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 # 2 Exhibit 2 # 3 Exhibit 3 # 4 Exhibit 4 # 5 Exhibit 5) Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(65 (Dischargeability - other)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) filed by Plaintiff Hunter Houff
Wednesday, February 23, 2022
5 5 misc Certificate of Mailing Wed 02/23 2:42 PM
Certificate of Mailing Filed by Jacob Townsend Penrod on behalf of Hunter Houff Related [+]. (Penrod, Jacob)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,4 Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff
4 4 cmp Summons Issued Wed 02/23 1:00 PM
Summons Issued to Attorney for Plaintiff Defendant Motion or Answer Due Date 3/25/2022. (Ross, Chase)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 22, 2022
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card/Debit Card Tue 02/22 4:34 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-05004 ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A9328669. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
2 2 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 02/22 3:51 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Hunter Houff. (Penrod, Jacob)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 02/22 3:47 PM
Adversary case 22-05004 Complaint by Hannah White Hutman on behalf of Hunter Houff against Scotty Dwayne Sipe. Fee Amount $350. AP Service Due 04/13/2022. Nature of Suit: (62 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud)),(65 (Dischargeability - other)),(67 (Dischargeability - 523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny)) (Hutman, Hannah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5