Hayes et al v. 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:22-cv-00711 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Mar 07, 2022 |
Case in other court: | New York Eastern, 1:22-cv-00845 |
Last checked: Saturday Sep 03, 2022 4:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
3M Company
|
|
Defendant
W L Gore & Associates Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Ten Cate Protective Fabrics USA d/b/a Southern Mills Inc.
|
|
Defendant
StedFast USA, Inc.
800 Mountain View Dr.
Piney Flats, TN 37686 |
|
Defendant
Perimeter Solutions LP
|
|
Defendant
PBI Performance Products, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Corporation Trust Center 1209 Orange Street
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Defendant
Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Lion Group, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Kidde-Fenwal, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson Controls Inc
|
|
Defendant
Honeywell Safety Products USA Inc
|
|
Defendant
Globe Manufacturing Company LLC
|
|
Defendant
Fire Service Plus Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
E I Du Pont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment
|
|
Defendant
Archroma US Inc
|
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Plaintiff
Robert Wilday
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tara Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Raymond Somerville
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jennifer Somerville
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
John Robilotti
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Linda Metress
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Metress
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Peter Frank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joseph Hayes
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 09/16/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 09/10 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Gregory Fernandez, Alexander Mengell, Wayne Nordby, Lennie Orr, Joseph Metress, Robert Wilday, Tom Afflixio, Lacy Atkinson, Jim Carter, Janet Pearl Chapp, Dale Foster, Chuck Gluck, David Jimenez, Bob King, Keith Kjeldsen, Jim McClure, Dave Moore, Bob Naughten, Steve O'Connor, Tom Scully, John Skeen, Jr Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:21-cv-01573-RMG, 2:22-cv-00711-RMG, 2:22-cv-01589-RMG(Pritzker, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Status Report
Tue 08/27 11:51 PM
STATUS REPORT - General Denial and Statement of Affirmative Defenses by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
31 | 31
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 08/27 10:26 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 5:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 08/27 4:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, June 10, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/10 1:56 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Dominique Savinelli on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00711-RMG(Savinelli, Dominique) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 06/06 3:56 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney James L. Stengel and Paige Pavone and to substitute in their place Joseph C. Orlet, Paul A. Calfo, and Dominique Savinelli by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC. Response to Motion due by 6/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. No proposed order.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 12:09 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company identifying Corporate Parent Sag Main Holding, LLC, Other Affiliate R&Q Insurance Holdings Ltd., Other Affiliate Obra Capital, Inc. for Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
24 | 24
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 03/12 11:06 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC identifying Corporate Parent MSA Safety Inc. for Global Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Globe Manufacturing Company LLC.. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Monday, March 11, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 6:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
22 | 22
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 03/11 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by James L Stengel on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Stengel, James) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 02/09 10:33 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Mine Safety Appliances Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Co., Inc., Mine Safety Appliances Co., LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company, LLC, Mine Safety Appliances Company Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 02/05 6:43 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Paige Pavone on behalf of Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Global Manufacturing Company LLC Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Pavone, Paige) |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
19 | 19
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Fri 10/13 6:34 PM
TEXT ORDER This Order Relates to Case Nos. et al. (as listed in the motion). The motion to substitute counsel of record (Dkt. No. 3719 in case 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.) is denied without prejudice. Counsel therein is not in fact attempting to "substitute" existing counsel in any given action for new counsel. Rather it appears counsel is attempting to make an appearance in various actions currently consolidated for pretrial proceedings before this Court. Counsel is directed to CMO 1 (Dkt. No. 3 at 3) (noting that counsel who appeared in the transferor district court prior to transfer need not enter a separate appearance or apply to proceed pro hac vice). To the extent counsel desires to file a notice of appearance related to the matters for which it seeks "substitution," it may do so. AND IT IS SO ORDERED. Entered at the Direction of Honorable Richard M Gergel on 10/13/2023.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(sshe, ) |
|
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 09/22 1:56 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by PBI Performance Products Inc. Response to Motion due by 10/6/2023. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG et al.(Van Zandt, Peter) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order Granting Substitution of Attorney | ||
Thursday, August 17, 2023 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 08/17 12:51 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs as to Perimeter Solutions Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00711-RMG(Pritzker, Elizabeth) |
|
Thursday, September 29, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 09/29 3:28 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Joseph Hayes, Tara Hayes, Joseph Metress, Linda Metress, John Robilotti, Jennifer Somerville, Raymond Somerville, Robert Wilday, William Bernhard, Paul Berube, Michael Carr, Michael Clark, Paul Cotter, David Ford, Kevin Hartigan, Onslow James, Stephen Lydon, Joseph Marchetti, Michael O'Reagan, Robert Pastor, Daniel Ranahan, Jessica Ranahan, Mark Whalen, Stephen Wilder of Defendant Fire Service Plus, Inc. Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00710-RMG, 2:22-cv-00711-RMG(Pritzker, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, May 24, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/24 11:39 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by George H Buermann on behalf of Fire Service Plus Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00710-RMG, 2:22-cv-00711-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(Buermann, George) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 05/24 11:24 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Rosemarie Carmella Hebner on behalf of Fire Service Plus Inc Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:22-cv-00710-RMG, 2:22-cv-00711-RMG, 2:22-cv-01303-RMG(Hebner, Rosemarie) |
|
Monday, March 07, 2022 | ||
10 | 10 MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Eastern, 1:22-cv-00845, Hayes et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-711-RMG (sshe, ) | |
8 | 8
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Mon 03/07 2:49 PM
Case transferred in from District of New York Eastern; Case Number 1:22-cv-00845. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Mon 03/07 2:51 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: New York Eastern, 1:22-cv-00845, Hayes et al v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:22-cv-711-RMG (sshe, ) |
||
Friday, March 04, 2022 | ||
7 | 7 CERTIFIED JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-81), Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/7/2022.] | |
6 | 6 JPMDL Conditional Transfer Order (CTO-81), Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation,the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the District of South Carolina for the reasons stated in the order of December 7, 2018, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Richard M. Gergel. This order does not become effective until it is filed in the Office of the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of South Carolina. The transmittal of this order to said Clerk shall be stayed 7 days from the entry thereof. If any party files a notice of opposition with the Clerk of the Panel within this 7day period, the stay will be continued until further order of the Panel. (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/7/2022.] | |
Case transferred to District of South Carolina. Original file, certified copy of transfer order, and docket sheet sent via CM/ECF. ALL FILINGS ARE TO BE MADE IN THE TRANSFER COURT, DO NOT DOCKET TO THIS CASE. (Lee, Tiffeny) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/7/2022.] | ||
Tuesday, February 22, 2022 | ||
5 | 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against 3M Company, AGC Chemicals Americas Inc., Amerex Corporation, Archroma U.S., Inc., Arkema, Inc., Buckeye Fire Equipment, Carrier Global Corporation, Chemguard, Inc., E. I. Du Pont De Nemours & Co, Fire Service Plus, Inc., Honeywell Safety Products USA, Inc., Johnson Controls, Inc., Kidde-Fenwal, Inc., Lion Group, Inc., National Foam, Inc., PBI Performance Products, Inc., Perimeter Solutions, LP, Stedfast USA, Inc., Ten Cate Protective Fabrics USA, The Chemours Company L.L.C., Tyco Fire Products, L.P., W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc., Globe Manufacturing Company LLC, Mine Safety Appliance Company LLC, filed by Raymond Somerville, Jennifer Somerville, Joseph Hayes, Linda Metress, Tara Hayes, Peter Frank, Joseph Metress, Robert Wilday, John Robilotti. (Piper, Francine) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/7/2022.] | |
Tuesday, February 15, 2022 | ||
4 | 4 This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/7/2022.] | |
3 | 3 In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/7/2022.] | |
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/7/2022.] | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Complaint for Damages and Injunctive Relief against All Defendants filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANYEDC-15293820 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -NO,, filed by Raymond Somerville, Joseph Hayes, Peter Frank, Robert Wilday. (Levine, Jonathan) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/7/2022.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons | ||
Case Assigned to Chief Judge Margo K. Brodie and Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) [Transferred from New York Eastern on 3/7/2022.] |