USA v. Porter
Texas Southern District Court | |
Case #: | 4:22-mj-00627 |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 21, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Mar 21, 2022 9:11 PM CDT |
Plaintiff
USA
|
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Nicholas Porter (1)
Terminated: 03/21/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/21/2022 9:11 PM CDT |
Tuesday, March 15, 2022 | ||
NOTICE OF SETTING as to Nicholas Porter. Initial Appearance - Rule 40 set for 3/15/2022 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 701 before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan, filed | ||
INITIAL APPEARANCE IN RULE 5(c)(3) Minute Entry for proceedings held on 3/15/2022 before Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan as to Nicholas Porter. Defendant first appearance on Complaint from the Ohio Northern District Court 3:22MJ- 5072 and advised of rights/charges. Defendant requests appointed counsel, Financial affidavit executed, Defendant appeared with counsel. Hearing to be set, Order appointing FPD for limited purpose, Order of Temporary Detention to be entered,. Identity, Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing set for 3/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo Appearances: AUSA Joe Porto f/USA; FPD Marjorie Meyers f/Deft.(ERO:Yes) (Interpreter: No) (Pretrial Officer: M. Simons and Bradley Worembke) Deft remanded to custody, filed.(MelissaMorgan, 4) | ||
1 | 1 Arrest Warrant issued 3/14/22; Returned Executed on 3/15/22 as to Nicholas Porter. Defendant was arrested in Houston, TX. Document restricted from PACER under privacy policy., filed. (Attachment: #1 Unredacted attachment) . | |
2 | 2 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Nicholas Porter, filed. | |
3 | 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER FOR LIMITED PURPOSE. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified. (MelissaMorgan, 4) | |
4 | 4 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Nicholas Porter. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified. (MelissaMorgan, 4) | |
5 | 5 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Nicholas Porter Identity, Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing set for 3/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified. (MelissaMorgan, 4) | |
6 | 6 Order of Temporary Detention Pending Hearing as to Nicholas Porter Identity, Preliminary Examination and Detention Hearing set for 3/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in by video before Magistrate Judge Dena Hanovice Palermo ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Christina A Bryan) Parties notified. (MelissaMorgan, 4) |