Kim v. Halliburton Energy Services, LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:22-ap-01065 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Mar 21, 2022 |
Terminated: | Mar 06, 2023 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Halliburton Energy Services, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT |
Monday, March 06, 2023 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Mon 03/06 4:21 PM
Adversary Case Number 22-01065 EEB Closed. |
||
Wednesday, February 15, 2023 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding . THIS MATTER comes before the Court on the Joint Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice filed by the parties on February 15, 2023, and the Court being otherwise advisedin the premises, hereby ORDERS that this adversary case be and it hereby is DISMISSED. ORDERED that the hearing scheduled for February 21, 2023, at 10:00 a.m., is hereby VACATED. |
|
16 | 16
![]() Notice Re: Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) Modified to add SARD information on 2/15/2023 (pt) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 02/15 10:53 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01065 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 3/1/2023 to close AP. |
||
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Order and Notice of Telephonic Status Conference . Telephonic Hearing to be held on 2/21/2023 at 10:00 AM Courtroom F . The purpose of the status conference is to permit the parties and the court to confer regarding the status of the pending claims remaining in this adversary proceeding and procedures for going forward with those claims. |
|
Wednesday, July 06, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
![]() Scheduling Order For Pre-Trial Deadlines RE: . Discovery due by 12/30/2022 for1 , Dispositive Motion due 1/30/2023 for1 , Amended Pleadings documents due by 8/31/2022; requests to modify or amend instant order documents due by 7/20/2022; Written reports of experts documents due by 9/30/2022. |
|
Tuesday, July 05, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
![]() Joint F.R.B.P. 7026 (f) Report Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, June 27, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Order to File Status Report . Document due by 7/11/2022 for1 , (jc) |
|
Monday, May 23, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order For Compliance With Rule 7026, Fed.R.Bankr.P. (Rule 26(f), Fed.R.Civ.P.) . The parties to submit a written report to the Court, on or before June 22, 2022. |
|
Friday, May 20, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Answer to Complaint Filed by Jeffery Dayne Carruth on behalf of Halliburton Energy Services, LLC . (Carruth, Jeffery) |
|
Friday, April 22, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Order Approving Stipulation Extending Response Deadline For Defendant Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. Answer Due 5/20/2022 . (sd) |
|
8 | 8
![]() Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim . (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, April 21, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
utility
Notification of Electronic Filing Error (Public Entry)
Thu 04/21 9:43 AM
Notice of Electronic Filing Error. Christopher D. Johnson is hereby notified of the following error in docket number 6: Incorrect event . E-Filer shall refile the pleading using the "Adversary", "Motion", "Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint ". Failure to timely correct the error may result in the party not receiving the requested relief. (Text Only Entry) . Tickle Due Date 4/23/2022. |
|
Wednesday, April 20, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Stipulation Between Halliburton Energy Services, LLC and Plaintiff Re: Stipulation to Extend Response Deadline Filed by Jeffery Dayne Carruth on behalf of Halliburton Energy Services, LLC . (Carruth, Jeffery) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
5 | 5
![]() Stipulation Between Halliburton Energy Services, LLC and Plaintiff Re: Extend Response Deadline Filed by Jeffery Dayne Carruth on behalf of Halliburton Energy Services, LLC . (Carruth, Jeffery) |
|
Tuesday, April 05, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Summons Service Executed On: HALLIBURTON ENERGY SERVICES, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, March 22, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-Docket of Credit Card
Tue 03/22 12:15 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01065 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31182570. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Monday, March 21, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Halliburton Energy Services, LLC Answer Due 04/20/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 22-01065 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Halliburton Energy Services, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/19/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |