Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:20-bk-12377

Colorado Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Elizabeth E Brown
Case #: 1:22-ap-01069
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
Case Filed:Mar 24, 2022
Terminated:Jun 09, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Oilfield Partners Energy Services, LLC
Represented By
Oilfield Partners Energy Services, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Thomas M. Kim, Creditor Trustee
Represented By
Christopher D. Johnson
Diamond Mccarthy LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 1:05 PM MDT
Thursday, June 09, 2022
court Close Adversary Case Thu 06/09 4:25 PM
Adversary Case Number 22-01069 EEB Closed. Related [+]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 25, 2022
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 05/25 8:12 AM
Disposition of Adversary Proceeding Number 22-01069 EEB. Final Order or Judgment Has Entered. Tickle Due Date 6/8/2022 to close adversary proceeding. Related [+]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 24, 2022
11 11 notice Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (Awaiting Answer) Tue 05/24 1:27 PM
Notice of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Friday, May 06, 2022
10 10 notice Notice Fri 05/06 3:20 PM
Notice Re: Compliance with Order. Filed by Cody Carol Bailey on behalf of Oilfield Partners Energy Services, LLC Related [+]. (Bailey, Cody)
Related: [-] 7 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Attorney Certification
Saturday, April 23, 2022
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/23 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Order Regarding Compliance With Rules
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 04/23 10:13 PM
Courts Notice or Order and BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+]. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 04/23/2022. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Order on Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Thursday, April 21, 2022
7 7 order Compliance With Rules Thu 04/21 3:41 PM
Order For Compliance To Attorney Cody Bailey Related [+]. ORDERED that on or before May 5, 2022, Cody Bailey shall promptly comply with LBR 9010-1(b)(2) and file proof of such compliance with this Court, failing which, future pleadings on behalf of the Defendant Oilfield Partners Energy Services, LLC, may be stricken and he will be unable to appear in front of this Court.
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,5 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
6 6 order Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Thu 04/21 3:24 PM
Order Approving Stipulation Between Plaintiff Thomas M. Kim and Defendant Oilfield Partners Energy Services, LLC. Oilfield Partners Energy Services, LLC Answer Due 5/23/2022 Related [+].
Related: [-] 5 Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint
Tuesday, April 19, 2022
5 5 motion Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Tue 04/19 10:22 AM
Motion to Extend Time To File Answer to Complaint Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim Related [+]. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
Att: 1 Proposed/Unsigned Order
Tuesday, April 05, 2022
4 4 misc Summons Service Executed (Adversary) Tue 04/05 4:54 PM
Summons Service Executed On: OILFIELD PARTNERS ENERGY SERVICES, LLC Filed by Christopher D. Johnson on behalf of Thomas M. Kim. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 25, 2022
3 3 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Fri 03/25 9:26 AM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 22-01069 EEB] ) [cmp,cmpt] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A31189513. Fee amount 350.00 (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 24, 2022
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Thu 03/24 1:27 PM
Summons Issued on Oilfield Partners Energy Services, LLC Answer Due 04/25/2022. Government Agencies Are Allowed 35 Days From Service Of The Summons To Answer This Complaint.[LINK:Notice To Litigants] required to be served with Summons per General Procedure Order. (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 03/24 1:24 PM
Adversary case 22-01069 Complaint by Thomas M. Kim against Oilfield Partners Energy Services, LLC. Fee Paid. Adversary Status Deadline 07/22/2022 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) (Johnson, Christopher)
Related: [-]